This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/12/2016 at 19:51:38 (UTC).

CATHERINE WESTBROOKS VS. WINE,COM, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2012 CATHERINE WESTBROOKS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against WINE,COM, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6238

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTBROOKS, CATHERINE

Defendants

WINE,COM, INC.

WINE.COM

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SUBBOTIN KYRA A

SUBBOTIN, KYRA ALEXIS

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF KYRA SUBBOTIN

2625 Alcatraz Avenue No.152

Berkeley, CA 94705

Defendant Attorney

CARROL, ROBERT KELTON

Attorney at NIXON PEABODY

One Embarcadero Center, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WINE.COM (Fee:450.00)

ORDER

ORDER RE: SIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

OBJECTION TO CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND REQ. FOR CONTINUANCE FILED BY DEFENDANT WINE.COM

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION TO REQ FOR TRIAL CONT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WESTBROOKS, CATHERINE

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF ROBERT K. CARROL IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR EX PARTE APPLICATION / MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT WINE,COM, INC.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF MOTION / EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR MOTION/ EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT WINE,COM, INC.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN OST TO HEAR DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION/ MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT WINE,COM, INC.

ORDER

ORDER DENYING WINE.COM'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

Case Ordered Off Calendar

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JAN-07-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WESTBROOKS, CATHERINE SERVED NOV-20-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT WINE,COM, INC.

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR OCT-28-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON APR-24-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Rescheduling Hearing

THE APR-24-2013 OBJECTION HEARING IS RESCHEDULED TO MAY-01-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610.

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE; MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE (AMENDED) FILED BY DEFENDANT WINE,COM, INC. (Fee:NO FEE)

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY DEFENDANT WINE,COM, INC.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR EX PARTE APPLICATION / MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT WINE,COM, INC.

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF RICH BERGSUND IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION / MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION / MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT WINE,COM, INC.

Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR OCT-28-2013 - CASE SETTLED WITH PANG LY IN DEPT. 603. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON JAN-07-2014 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (206)

ORDER

ORDER DENYING WINE.COM, INC.'S MOTION FOR A CONTINUANCE AND GRANTING WINE.COM INC.'S APPLICATION FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JAN-07-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DENYING WINE.COM, INC.'S MOTION FOR A CONTINUANCE AND GRANTING WINE.COM INC.'S APPLICATION FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR OCT-28-2013 - CASE SETTLED WITH PANG LY IN DEPT. 603. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON JAN-07-2014 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • JOINT STATEMENT RE TRIAL TIME LIMTS FILED BY DEFENDANT WINE.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • JOINT STATEMENT RE TRIAL TIME LIMITS FILED BY DEFENDANT WINE.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2013
  • MASTER MOTION CALENDAR ON OCT-22-2013 IN 206, DEFENDANT WINE.COM, INC'S MOTION TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL IS DENIED. THE TRIAL DATE OF 10/28/13 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206 IS MAINTAINED. ALL PARTIES INCLUDING SOMEONE WITH AUTHORITY TO SETTLE FROM THE INSURANCE CARRIER ARE TO BE PRESENT IN PERSON AT THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON 10/24/13 AT 2:30 PM WITH PANG LY IN DEPT. 603, AND WINE.COM INC IS TO GIVE NOTICE TO THE INSURANCE CARRIER. WRITTEN ORDER PENDING. JUDGE: CYNTHIA M. LEE; CLERK: EBURA; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DENYING WINE.COM'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • DECLARATION OF ALISON B. TORBITT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT WINE,COM, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • DECLARATION OF RICH BERGSUND IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONT. TR FILED BY DEFENDANT WINE,COM, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT WINE.COM JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WESTBROOKS, CATHERINE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 15.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED OF PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED BY DEFENDANT WINE.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER RE: SIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2013
  • FEE PAID ON STIPULATED [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED BY DEFENDANT WINE.COM (Fee:20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WINE.COM (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • JURY FEES DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF WESTBROOKS, CATHERINE (Fee:150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WESTBROOKS, CATHERINE SERVED NOV-20-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT WINE,COM, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WESTBROOKS, CATHERINE AS TO DEFENDANT WINE,COM, INC. DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-24-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-18-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-09-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less