This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 12/01/2023 at 05:06:20 (UTC).

JORGE CALIXTO VS. ROB CASSIL ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/28/2023 JORGE CALIXTO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ROB CASSIL. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6189

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIXTO, JORGE AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

CASSIL, ROB TRUSTEE OF THE HS TRUST VII

DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AZIZI, DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint (first appearance fee) (Case Initiation)

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210035433) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALIXTO, JORGE AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT CASSIL, ROB TRUSTEE OF THE HS TRUST VII DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-27-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-27-2023 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-05-2023

Civil Case Coversheet (Cover Sheets)

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 210035433) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALIXTO, JORGE AN INDIVIDUAL

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Issued Summons (Summons)

SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 210035433) TO PLAINTIFF CALIXTO, JORGE AN INDIVIDUAL

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEP-27-2023 CONTINUED TO NOV-29-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JAN-09-2024 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE NOV-29-2023 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

 

Docket Entries

01/09/2024

HearingMatter(s): ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2023

HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Nov-06-2023 Set For Order To Show Cause On Jan-09-24 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JAN-09-2024 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE NOV-29-2023 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Sep-01-2023 Continued To Nov-29-23 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEP-27-2023 CONTINUED TO NOV-29-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 210035433) TO PLAINTIFF CALIXTO, JORGE AN INDIVIDUAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2023

FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: H4823502F007

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 210035433) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALIXTO, JORGE AN INDIVIDUAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210035433) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALIXTO, JORGE AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT CASSIL, ROB TRUSTEE OF THE HS TRUST VII DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-27-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-27-2023 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-05-2023; Fee: $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less