This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 06/24/2023 at 01:03:16 (UTC).

CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC VS. RAHIM JIWA

Case Summary

On 04/04/2023 CHARLES SCHWAB CO , INC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against RAHIM JIWA. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD B. ULMER. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7999

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD B. ULMER

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC

Respondent

JIWA, RAHIM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

YOUNG, GORDON C

 

Court Documents

PETITION TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD (Case Initiation)

PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD (TRANSACTION ID # 210032985) FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC AS TO RESPONDENT JIWA, RAHIM

Civil Case Coversheet (Cover Sheets)

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 210032985) FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC

DECLARATION OF JOSEPH L. SIDERS, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER CHARLES

DECLARATION OF JOSEPH L. SIDERS, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.'S PETITION AND MOTION TO CONFIRM FINRA-DR ARBITRATION AWARD (TRANSACTION ID # 210032985) FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER CHARLES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.'S MOTION ON PETITION TO CONFIRM FINRA-DR ARBITRATION AWARD (TRANSACTION ID # 210032985) FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC

PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.???S NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITIO

PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.'S NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION AND MOTION TO CONFIRM FINRA-DR ARBITRATION AWARD (TRANSACTION ID # 210032985) FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC HEARING SET FOR JUN-22-2023 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302

Issued Summons (Summons)

SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 210032985) TO PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC

Notice (Other) (Notices)

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, SIGNED APR-18-2023, SERVED APR-14-2023 (TRANSACTION ID # 210034311) FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC AS TO RESPONDENT JIWA, RAHIM

Declaration (Declarations)

DECLARATION OF RESPONDENT'S COUNSEL RE: NON-OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER'S PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND ENTER JUDGMENT THEREON (TRANSACTION ID # 210034311) FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND ENTER JUDGMENT THEREON

TEXT JUDGMENT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND ENTER JUDGMENT THEREON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • DocketLAW AND MOTION 302, PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.'S PETITION AND MOTION TO CONFIRM FINRA-DR ARBITRATION AWARD. NO APPEARANCE WAS MADE BY ANY PARTY, COUNSEL OR INTERESTED PERSON. THE COURT ADOPTS THE FOLLOWING TENTATIVE RULING: PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.'S UNOPPOSED "PETITION AND MOTION TO CONFIRM FINRA-DR ARBITRATION AWARD" IS GRANTED. COUNSEL FOR THE PREVAILING PARTY IS REQUIRED TO PREPARE A PROPOSED ORDER WHICH STATES THAT THE MOTION WAS NOT OPPOSED AND IN COMPLIANCE WITH CRC 3.1312. JUDGE: RICHARD B, ULMER JR., CLERK: R. WOODS, NOT REPORTED. (302/RBU) ***AFTER HEARING: ORDERS ARE SIGNED. (SEE SCANNED ORDERS FOR DETAILS)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR JUN-22-2023 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): Petitioner Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.'S Notice Of Hearing On Petition And Motion To Confirm Finra-Dr Arbitration Award Off Calendar Jun-22-2023 Text Ruling MINI MINUTES: Petitioner Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.'s Motion To Confirm Finra-Dr Arbitration Award. No appearance was made by any Party, Counsel or Interested Person. The court adopts the following tentative ruling: Petitioner Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.'s unopposed "petition and motion to confirm FINRA-DR arbitration award" is granted. Counsel for the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order which states that the motion was not opposed and in compliance with CRC 3.1312. Judge: Richard B, Ulmer Jr., Clerk: R. Woods, Not Reported. (302\/RBU) ***After hearing: orders are signed. (see scanned orders for details); Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 302; Judge Name: RICHARD B. ULMER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF RESPONDENT'S COUNSEL RE: NON-OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER'S PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND ENTER JUDGMENT THEREON (TRANSACTION ID # 210034311) FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, SIGNED APR-18-2023, SERVED APR-14-2023 (TRANSACTION ID # 210034311) FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC AS TO RESPONDENT JIWA, RAHIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • FinancialPayment: MOTION; Amount: $60; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: R5223405M014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 210032985) TO PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: R5223405F013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.'S NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION AND MOTION TO CONFIRM FINRA-DR ARBITRATION AWARD (TRANSACTION ID # 210032985) FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC HEARING SET FOR JUN-22-2023 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302; Fee: $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.'S MOTION ON PETITION TO CONFIRM FINRA-DR ARBITRATION AWARD (TRANSACTION ID # 210032985) FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF JOSEPH L. SIDERS, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC.'S PETITION AND MOTION TO CONFIRM FINRA-DR ARBITRATION AWARD (TRANSACTION ID # 210032985) FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 210032985) FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD (TRANSACTION ID # 210032985) FILED BY PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC AS TO RESPONDENT JIWA, RAHIM; Fee: $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:CPF23517999
Case Title:CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC VS. RAHIM JIWA
Court Date:JUN-22-2023 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Petitioner Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.'S Notice Of Hearing On Petition And Motion To Confirm Finra-Dr Arbitration Award
Rulings:Set for Law and Motion Calendar on Thursday, June 22, 2023 Line 2,PETITIONER CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC's Hearing On Petition And Motion To Confirm Finra-Dr Arbitration Award.Petitioner's unopposed "petition and motion to confirm FINRA-DR arbitration award" is granted.For the 9:30 a.m. Law & Motion calendar, all attorneys and parties may appear in Department 302 remotely. Remote hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear remotely at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link, or dial the corresponding phone number.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The text of the email shall include the name and contact information, including email address, of the attorney or party who will appear at the hearing. Counsel for the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order which states that the motion was not opposed and must email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing.The court no longer provides a court reporter in the Law & Motion Department. Parties may retain their own reporter, who may appear in the courtroom or remotely. A retained reporter must be a California certified court reporter (CSR), for only a CSR's transcript may be used in California courts. If a CSR is being retained, include in your email all of the following: their name, CSR and telephone numbers, and their individual work email address.=(302/RBU)