This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 09/11/2023 at 02:01:26 (UTC).

VICTORIA SANCHEZ ET AL VS. CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/09/2023 VICTORIA SANCHEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD B. ULMER and ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6373

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

RICHARD B. ULMER

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LIEU, KEVIN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU

PHAM, HENRY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM

Defendants

AHMC HEALTHCARE INC.

AHMC HEALTHCARE, LP

AHMC SETON MEDICAL CENTER, LLC DBA AHMC SETON MEDICAL CENTER COASTSIDE D/P SNF

AHMC, INC.

ARMADA, ANTHONY

BOARDWALK WEST FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC

BRIUS, LLC

CALIGUIRE, KERIANNE

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

COUNTY OF SAN MATEO DBA BURLINGAME SKILLED NURSING D/P SNF

DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE

KUNNAPPILLY, CHESTER

LAGUNA HONDA HOSPITAL AND REHABILITATION CENTER

LIEU, KENNETH

LIEU, KIN KINH

LIEU, LOI

MOCHI GROUP, LP

OLIVIA JOY INVESTMENT CORP

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FISH, KIRSTEN M.

GUADAGNI, KARMAN

Defendant Attorneys

GRAY, THOMAS M

LIPTON, MARK DAVID

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Damages

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100199411) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SANCHEZ, VICTORIA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF EDWARD SANCHEZ VONG, TSAN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU VONG, ANH INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU LIEU, KEVIN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU PHAM, LAN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, QUYEN JENNIFER INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, MAI INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM RIVERA, LY PHAM INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, HENRY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, LINDA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO SAN FRANCISCO DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH LAGUNA HONDA HOSPITAL AND REHABILITATION CENTER SAN FRANCISCO MEDICAL RESPITE & SOBERING CENTER COUNTY OF SAN MATEO DBA BURLINGAME SKILLED NURSING D/P SNF BRIUS, LLC BOARDWALK WEST FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ROCKPORT ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC RECHNITZ, SHLOMO KUNNAPPILLY, CHESTER AHMC SETON MEDICAL CENTER, LLC DBA AHMC SETON MEDICAL CENTER COASTSIDE D/P SNF AHMC HEALTHCARE INC. AHMC HEALTHCARE, LP MOCHI GROUP, LP OLIVIA JOY INVESTMENT CORP AHMC, INC. ARMADA, ANTHONY CALIGUIRE, KERIANNE LIEU, KENNETH LIEU, KIN KINH LIEU, LOI PHAM, PHONG PHAMILY, HOA AS NOMAINAL DEFENDANTS DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-11-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-10-2023 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-18-2023

DECLARATION OF THOMAS M. GRAY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS AHMC SETON MEDI

DECLARATION OF THOMAS M. GRAY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS AHMC SETON MEDICAL CENTER, LLC AND AHMC HEALTHCARE, INC.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210044682) FILED BY DEFENDANT AHMC HEALTHCARE INC. AHMC SETON MEDICAL CENTER, LLC

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS AHMC SET

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS AHMC SETON MEDICAL CENTER, LLC AND AHMC HEALTHCARE, INC.'S DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210044682) FILED BY DEFENDANT AHMC HEALTHCARE INC. AHMC SETON MEDICAL CENTER, LLC

DEFENDANTS AHMC SETON MEDICAL CENTER, LLC AND AHMC HEALTHCARE, INC.???

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 210044682) FILED BY DEFENDANT AHMC HEALTHCARE INC. AHMC SETON MEDICAL CENTER, LLC HEARING SET FOR SEP-25-2023 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT ONLY. EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OWN COST AND ATTORNEYS FEES. (TRANSACTION ID # 100209062) AS TO DEFENDANT ARMADA, ANTHONY

Request for Dismissal [PARTIAL]

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ONLY. EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS AND ATTORNEYS FEES. (TRANSACTION ID # 100208929) AS TO DEFENDANT AHMC HEALTHCARE, LP MOCHI GROUP, LP OLIVIA JOY INVESTMENT CORP AHMC, INC. CALIGUIRE, KERIANNE

CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS

CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 70571299) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO?S OBJECTION TO JUDGE PRO TE

OBJECTION TO HEARING BY COMMISSIONER/PRO TEM ACTING AS JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 70571299) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO?S REQUEST FOR TRIAL BY JURY

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 70571299) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO?S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 70571299) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100207736), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SANCHEZ, VICTORIA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF EDWARD SANCHEZ VONG, TSAN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU VONG, ANH INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU LIEU, KEVIN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU PHAM, LAN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, QUYEN JENNIFER INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, MAI INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM RIVERA, LY PHAM INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, HENRY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, LINDA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM SERVED JUN-28-2023, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE JUN-28-2023 AS TO DEFENDANT AHMC HEALTHCARE INC.

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100207736), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SANCHEZ, VICTORIA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF EDWARD SANCHEZ VONG, TSAN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU VONG, ANH INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU LIEU, KEVIN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU PHAM, LAN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, QUYEN JENNIFER INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, MAI INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM RIVERA, LY PHAM INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, HENRY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, LINDA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM SERVED JUN-28-2023, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE JUN-28-2023 AS TO DEFENDANT AHMC HEALTHCARE, LP

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100207736), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SANCHEZ, VICTORIA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF EDWARD SANCHEZ VONG, TSAN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU VONG, ANH INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU LIEU, KEVIN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU PHAM, LAN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, QUYEN JENNIFER INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, MAI INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM RIVERA, LY PHAM INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, HENRY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, LINDA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM SERVED JUN-28-2023, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE JUN-28-2023 AS TO DEFENDANT AHMC SETON MEDICAL CENTER, LLC DBA AHMC SETON MEDICAL CENTER COASTSIDE D/P SNF

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100207736), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SANCHEZ, VICTORIA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF EDWARD SANCHEZ VONG, TSAN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU VONG, ANH INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU LIEU, KEVIN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU PHAM, LAN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, QUYEN JENNIFER INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, MAI INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM RIVERA, LY PHAM INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, HENRY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, LINDA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM SERVED JUN-28-2023, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE JUN-28-2023 AS TO DEFENDANT AHMC, INC.

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100207736), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SANCHEZ, VICTORIA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF EDWARD SANCHEZ VONG, TSAN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU VONG, ANH INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU LIEU, KEVIN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU PHAM, LAN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, QUYEN JENNIFER INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, MAI INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM RIVERA, LY PHAM INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, HENRY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, LINDA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM SERVED JUN-27-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SANCHEZ, VICTORIA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF EDWARD SANCHEZ VONG, TSAN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU VONG, ANH INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU LIEU, KEVIN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU PHAM, LAN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, QUYEN JENNIFER INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, MAI INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM RIVERA, LY PHAM INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, HENRY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, LINDA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM SERVED JUN-29-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT COUNTY OF SAN MATEO DBA BURLINGAME SKILLED NURSING D/P SNF

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SANCHEZ, VICTORIA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF EDWARD SANCHEZ VONG, TSAN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU VONG, ANH INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU LIEU, KEVIN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU PHAM, LAN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, QUYEN JENNIFER INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, MAI INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM RIVERA, LY PHAM INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, HENRY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, LINDA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM SERVED JUN-27-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT LAGUNA HONDA HOSPITAL AND REHABILITATION CENTER

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100207736), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SANCHEZ, VICTORIA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF EDWARD SANCHEZ VONG, TSAN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU VONG, ANH INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU LIEU, KEVIN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU PHAM, LAN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, QUYEN JENNIFER INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, MAI INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM RIVERA, LY PHAM INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, HENRY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, LINDA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM SERVED JUL-05-2023, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE JUL-05-2023 AS TO DEFENDANT ROCKPORT ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): DEMURRER to COMPLAINT; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 302; Judge Name: RICHARD B. ULMER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2023
  • FinancialPayment: JURY FEES; Amount: $150; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: H2423901J009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • DocketJURY FEES DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO; Fee: $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2023
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $870; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: W2223812F022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF THOMAS M. GRAY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS AHMC SETON MEDICAL CENTER, LLC AND AHMC HEALTHCARE, INC.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210044682) FILED BY DEFENDANT AHMC HEALTHCARE INC. AHMC SETON MEDICAL CENTER, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS AHMC SETON MEDICAL CENTER, LLC AND AHMC HEALTHCARE, INC.'S DEMURRER TO THE COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210044682) FILED BY DEFENDANT AHMC HEALTHCARE INC. AHMC SETON MEDICAL CENTER, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 210044682) FILED BY DEFENDANT AHMC HEALTHCARE INC. AHMC SETON MEDICAL CENTER, LLC HEARING SET FOR SEP-25-2023 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302; Fee: $870.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT ONLY. EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OWN COST AND ATTORNEYS FEES. (TRANSACTION ID # 100209062) AS TO DEFENDANT ARMADA, ANTHONY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ONLY. EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS AND ATTORNEYS FEES. (TRANSACTION ID # 100208929) AS TO DEFENDANT AHMC HEALTHCARE, LP MOCHI GROUP, LP OLIVIA JOY INVESTMENT CORP AHMC, INC. CALIGUIRE, KERIANNE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT PER ORDER DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1 TO BE LOS ANGELES NURSING HOMES, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • FinancialPayment: EX PARTE MOTION; Amount: $60; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: R5223609E008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketFILING FEE ONLY PAID FOR AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT AND PROPOSED ORDER FOR DOE 1/LOS ANGELES NURSING HOMES, LLC. PAPER COPIES MUST BE SUBMITTED TO DEPARTMENT 302 FOR THE JUDGE'S REVIEW AND SIGNATURE. (TRANSACTION ID # 100202111) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SANCHEZ, VICTORIA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF EDWARD SANCHEZ VONG, TSAN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU VONG, ANH INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU LIEU, KEVIN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU PHAM, LAN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, QUYEN JENNIFER INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, MAI INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM RIVERA, LY PHAM INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, HENRY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, LINDA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM; Fee: $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 100199411) TO PLAINTIFF SANCHEZ, VICTORIA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF EDWARD SANCHEZ VONG, TSAN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU VONG, ANH INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU LIEU, KEVIN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU PHAM, LAN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, QUYEN JENNIFER INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, MAI INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM RIVERA, LY PHAM INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, HENRY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, LINDA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • FinancialPayment: JURY FEES; Amount: $150; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: H4823510J022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: H4823510F021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketJURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 100199411) DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF SANCHEZ, VICTORIA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF EDWARD SANCHEZ VONG, TSAN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU VONG, ANH INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU LIEU, KEVIN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU PHAM, LAN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, QUYEN JENNIFER INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, MAI INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM RIVERA, LY PHAM INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, HENRY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, LINDA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM; Fee: $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 100199411) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SANCHEZ, VICTORIA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF EDWARD SANCHEZ VONG, TSAN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU VONG, ANH INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU LIEU, KEVIN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU PHAM, LAN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, QUYEN JENNIFER INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, MAI INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM RIVERA, LY PHAM INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, HENRY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, LINDA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100199411) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SANCHEZ, VICTORIA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF EDWARD SANCHEZ VONG, TSAN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU VONG, ANH INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU LIEU, KEVIN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF NGO VI LIEU PHAM, LAN INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, QUYEN JENNIFER INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, MAI INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM RIVERA, LY PHAM INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, HENRY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM PHAM, LINDA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF QUY PHAM AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO SAN FRANCISCO DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH LAGUNA HONDA HOSPITAL AND REHABILITATION CENTER SAN FRANCISCO MEDICAL RESPITE & SOBERING CENTER COUNTY OF SAN MATEO DBA BURLINGAME SKILLED NURSING D/P SNF BRIUS, LLC BOARDWALK WEST FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC ROCKPORT ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC RECHNITZ, SHLOMO KUNNAPPILLY, CHESTER AHMC SETON MEDICAL CENTER, LLC DBA AHMC SETON MEDICAL CENTER COASTSIDE D/P SNF AHMC HEALTHCARE INC. AHMC HEALTHCARE, LP MOCHI GROUP, LP OLIVIA JOY INVESTMENT CORP AHMC, INC. ARMADA, ANTHONY CALIGUIRE, KERIANNE LIEU, KENNETH LIEU, KIN KINH LIEU, LOI PHAM, PHONG PHAMILY, HOA AS NOMAINAL DEFENDANTS DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-11-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-10-2023 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-18-2023; Fee: $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less