This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 10/29/2023 at 02:08:51 (UTC).

KRISTIN NOEL DENVER VS. CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/06/2023 KRISTIN NOEL DENVER filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7335

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DENVER, KRISTIN NOEL

Defendants

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO 1 DR. CARLTON B. GOODLETT PLACE, #200 SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94102

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $10,000.00 FILED BY DENVER, KRISTIN NOEL AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR OCT-27-2023 AT 03:30 PM IN DEPT 506

PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (FEE FOR SERVICE:$40.00) SERVED SEP-07-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVED SEP-11-2023, COURT CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED SERVED AS TO DEFENDANT MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC

DECLARATION OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CORPORATION

DECLARATION OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CORPORATION PURSUANT TO CCP 116.540 (B)-(H) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

DECLARATION OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CORPORATION

DECLARATION OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CORPORATION PURSUANT TO CCP 116.540 (B)-(H) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC

STIPULATION TO USE JUDGE PRO TEM AND ORDER

STIPULATION TO USE JUDGE PRO TEM AND ORDER FILED BY DENVER, KRISTIN NOEL CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC

Small Claims - Continue Order

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF OCT-27-2023 - PARTIES REACHED SETTLEMENT AND CASE SET FOR PROGRESS REPORT FOR FEB. 2, 2024 AT 3:30PM. IF NO APPEARANCES, CASE WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFF KRISTIN NOEL DENVER APPEARED. DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO APPEARED, REPRESENTED BY REMY WEILAND, CLAIMS ADJUSTER, AND WAIVED SERVICE. DEFENDANT MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL APPEARED, REPRESENTED BY JOHN ANDERSON, GENERAL MANAGER, AND WAIVED SERVICE. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE PRO TEM: PANG LY; CLERK: J. BERTELSEN; NOT REPORTED. (506)

ORDER

ORDER RE CONTINUANCE

 

Docket Entries

02/02/2024

HearingMatter(s): PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 506; Judge Name: JUDGE PRO TEM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER RE CONTINUANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF OCT-27-2023 - PARTIES REACHED SETTLEMENT AND CASE SET FOR PROGRESS REPORT FOR FEB. 2, 2024 AT 3:30PM. IF NO APPEARANCES, CASE WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFF KRISTIN NOEL DENVER APPEARED. DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO APPEARED, REPRESENTED BY REMY WEILAND, CLAIMS ADJUSTER, AND WAIVED SERVICE. DEFENDANT MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL APPEARED, REPRESENTED BY JOHN ANDERSON, GENERAL MANAGER, AND WAIVED SERVICE. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE PRO TEM: PANG LY; CLERK: J. BERTELSEN; NOT REPORTED. (506)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSTIPULATION TO USE JUDGE PRO TEM AND ORDER FILED BY DENVER, KRISTIN NOEL CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDECLARATION OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CORPORATION PURSUANT TO CCP 116.540 (B)-(H) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDECLARATION OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CORPORATION PURSUANT TO CCP 116.540 (B)-(H) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023

HearingMatter(s): PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM Off Calendar Oct-27-2023 Continued To Feb-02-24 At 03:30 P.M. In Dept 506; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 506; Judge Name: JUDGE PRO TEM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVED SEP-11-2023, COURT CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED SERVED AS TO DEFENDANT MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (FEE FOR SERVICE:$40.00) SERVED SEP-07-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

FinancialPayment: SERVICE BY MAIL; Amount: $15; Payment Type: CREDIT CARD; Receipt Number: W0523906S007

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketSERVICE OF COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL FILED BY PLAINTIFF DENVER, KRISTIN NOEL AS TO DEFENDANT MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC; Fee: $15.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

FinancialPayment: SMALL CLAIMS > 5000; Amount: $75; Payment Type: CREDIT CARD; Receipt Number: W0523906S006

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $10,000.00 FILED BY DENVER, KRISTIN NOEL AS TO DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR OCT-27-2023 AT 03:30 PM IN DEPT 506; Fee: $75.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less