Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:50:47 (UTC).

CARTER WATERS et al VS. MCKESSON CORPORATION, A CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 CARTER WATERS filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against MCKESSON CORPORATION, A CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8489

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALLEN, KERRY AS HEIR OF PATRICIA WATERS, DECEASED

BONER, PATRIAL AS HEIR OF PATRICIA WATERS, DECEASED

CARRINGTON, MONA

CARRINGTON, WAYNE

CARY, LINDA

WATERS JR., CARTER AS HEIR OF PATRICIA WATERS DECEASED

WATERS, CARTER INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF PATRIC

WATERS, CARTER INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF PATRICIA WATERS, DECEASED

Defendants

MCKESSON CORPORATION, A CORPORATION

SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION D/B/A GLAXOSMITHKLINE

GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC (FKA SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION DBA GLAXOSMITHKLINE)

DOES 1 THRU 100, INCL.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANGHOFF, MARISSA

Attorney at NAPOLI BERN RIPKA SHKOLNIK & ASSOCIATES LLP

111 Corporate Drive, Suite 225

Ladera Ranch, CA 92694

Defendant Attorney

BROWN, MICHAEL K

Attorney at REED SMITH LLP

355 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

PRODUCTS LIABILITY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WATERS, CARTER INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF PATRICIA WATERS, DECEASED ALLEN, KERRY AS HEIR OF PATRICIA WATERS, DECEASED BONER, PATRIAL AS HEIR OF PATRICIA WATERS, DECEASED WATERS JR., CARTER AS HEIR OF PATRICIA WATERS DECEASED CARRINGTON, WAYNE CARRINGTON, MONA CARY, LINDA AS TO DEFENDANT MCKESSON CORPORATION, A CORPORATION SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION D/B/A GLAXOSMITHKLINE DOES 1 THRU 100, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-10-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2013 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:1450.00)

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-10-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. COORDINATED WITH JCCP #4578. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT MCKESSON CORPORATION, A CORPORATION JURY DEMANDED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WATERS, CARTER INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF PATRICIA WATERS, DECEASED ALLEN, KERRY AS HEIR OF PATRICIA WATERS, DECEASED BONER, PATRIAL AS HEIR OF PATRICIA WATERS, DECEASED WATERS JR., CARTER AS HEIR OF PATRICIA WATERS DECEASED CARRINGTON, WAYNE CARRINGTON, MONA CARY, LINDA SERVED FEB-05-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT MCKESSON CORPORATION, A CORPORATION

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC (FKA SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION DBA GLAXOSMITHKLINE) (Fee:1450.00)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MCKESSON CORPORATION, A CORPORATION (Fee:1450.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT & COMPLT; ADR PKG; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; AND NTC TO PLTF, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF WATERS, CARTER INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF PATRICIA WATERS, DECEASED ALLEN, KERRY AS HEIR OF PATRICIA WATERS, DECEASED BONER, PATRIAL AS HEIR OF PATRICIA WATERS, DECEASED WATERS JR., CARTER AS HEIR OF PATRICIA WATERS DECEASED CARRINGTON, WAYNE CARRINGTON, MONA CARY, LINDA SERVED MAR-06-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION ON DEFENDANT SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION D/B/A GLAXOSMITHKLINE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-10-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. COORDINATED WITH JCCP #4578. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT MCKESSON CORPORATION, A CORPORATION JURY DEMANDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • NOTICE OF ORDER COORDINATING CASE WITH JCCP 4578 FILED BY DEFENDANT MCKESSON CORPORATION, A CORPORATION GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC (FKA SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION DBA GLAXOSMITHKLINE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC (FKA SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION DBA GLAXOSMITHKLINE) (Fee:1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • (AMENDED) NTC OF RELATED CASE FILED BY DEFENDANT MCKESSON CORPORATION, A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY DEFENDANT MCKESSON CORPORATION, A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT & COMPLT; ADR PKG; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; AND NTC TO PLTF, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF WATERS, CARTER INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF PATRICIA WATERS, DECEASED ALLEN, KERRY AS HEIR OF PATRICIA WATERS, DECEASED BONER, PATRIAL AS HEIR OF PATRICIA WATERS, DECEASED WATERS JR., CARTER AS HEIR OF PATRICIA WATERS DECEASED CARRINGTON, WAYNE CARRINGTON, MONA CARY, LINDA SERVED MAR-06-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION ON DEFENDANT SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION D/B/A GLAXOSMITHKLINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MCKESSON CORPORATION, A CORPORATION (Fee:1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WATERS, CARTER INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF PATRICIA WATERS, DECEASED ALLEN, KERRY AS HEIR OF PATRICIA WATERS, DECEASED BONER, PATRIAL AS HEIR OF PATRICIA WATERS, DECEASED WATERS JR., CARTER AS HEIR OF PATRICIA WATERS DECEASED CARRINGTON, WAYNE CARRINGTON, MONA CARY, LINDA SERVED FEB-05-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT MCKESSON CORPORATION, A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PRODUCTS LIABILITY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WATERS, CARTER INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO THE ESTATE OF PATRICIA WATERS, DECEASED ALLEN, KERRY AS HEIR OF PATRICIA WATERS, DECEASED BONER, PATRIAL AS HEIR OF PATRICIA WATERS, DECEASED WATERS JR., CARTER AS HEIR OF PATRICIA WATERS DECEASED CARRINGTON, WAYNE CARRINGTON, MONA CARY, LINDA AS TO DEFENDANT MCKESSON CORPORATION, A CORPORATION SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION D/B/A GLAXOSMITHKLINE DOES 1 THRU 100, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-10-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2013 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less