Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 08/31/2019 at 11:46:37 (UTC).

CAROLYN SMALL VS. DR. IRINA KHIDEKEL ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/18/2018 CAROLYN SMALL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DR IRINA KHIDEKEL. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERI L. JACKSON and GARRETT L. WONG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7375

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

TERI L. JACKSON

GARRETT L. WONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMALL, CAROLYN

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1 TO 50

KHIDEKEL, DR. IRINA

CALIFORNIA STREET ASSOCIATES

ROES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE

ROES 1 TO 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOGAARDS, DEBRA FINK

Attorney at BOGAARDS LAW

177 Post Street, Suite 750

San Francisco, CA 94108

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

FINN, BRIAN J

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOHN A. HAUSER

P.O. Box 2282

Brea, CA 928222282

HILLIER, ERIC R

Attorney at WOOD, SMITH, HENNING & BERMAN LLP

1401 Willow Pass Road, Ste 700

Concord, CA 94520

 

Court Documents

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE

DECLARATION OF ERIC R. HILLIER IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLI

DECLARATION OF ERIC R. HILLIER IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 63496204) FILED BY DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA STREET ASSOCIATES

Notice of Change of Address

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 100063187) FILED BY ATTORNEY FINN, BRIAN J

Answer to Cross-Complant of Dr. Irina Khidekel

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62767765) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA STREET ASSOCIATES

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR SEP-03-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206.

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT KHIDEKEL, DR. IRINA

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100052317) FILED BY DEFENDANT KHIDEKEL, DR. IRINA JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62601788) FILED BY DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA STREET ASSOCIATES ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

Answer of Cross-defendant, Dr. Irina Khidekel, to the Unverified Cross

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100050915) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT KHIDEKEL, DR. IRINA

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT CALIFORNIA STREET ASSOCIATES

Cross-Complaint

CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62441600) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT CALIFORNIA STREET ASSOCIATES AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT KHIDEKEL, DR. IRINA ROES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE

Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62441600) FILED BY DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA STREET ASSOCIATES

Cross Complaint for Implied Indemnification - Negligence and Comparati

CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100047041) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT KHIDEKEL, DR. IRINA AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA STREET ASSOCIATES ROES 1 TO 20

Answer to Unverified Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100047041) FILED BY DEFENDANT KHIDEKEL, DR. IRINA

Notice and Acknowledgement of Reciept

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, SIGNED AUG-02-2018, SERVED JUL-17-2018 (TRANSACTION ID # 100044388) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SMALL, CAROLYN AS TO DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA STREET ASSOCIATES

Proof of Service

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100041938), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SMALL, CAROLYN SERVED JUN-25-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT KHIDEKEL, DR. IRINA

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SMALL, CAROLYN AS TO DEFENDANT KHIDEKEL, DR. IRINA CALIFORNIA STREET ASSOCIATES DOES 1 TO 50 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR NOV-21-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-17-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON OCT-29-2018

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B5219701M014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R7818C12J002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R4918921F001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W2118910J007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W2118910F006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W0918618F030

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100079864) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SMALL, CAROLYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 63505682) FILED BY DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA STREET ASSOCIATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR SEP-03-2019 CONTINUED TO MASTER CALENDAR JURY ON JAN-21-2020 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206 PER STIPULATED EX PARTE ORDER FILED 7/2/19. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT CALIFORNIA STREET ASSOCIATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62441600) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT CALIFORNIA STREET ASSOCIATES AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT KHIDEKEL, DR. IRINA ROES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62441600) FILED BY DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA STREET ASSOCIATES (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100047041) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT KHIDEKEL, DR. IRINA AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA STREET ASSOCIATES ROES 1 TO 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 100047041) DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT KHIDEKEL, DR. IRINA (Fee:$150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100047041) FILED BY DEFENDANT KHIDEKEL, DR. IRINA (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, SIGNED AUG-02-2018, SERVED JUL-17-2018 (TRANSACTION ID # 100044388) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SMALL, CAROLYN AS TO DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA STREET ASSOCIATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100041938), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SMALL, CAROLYN SERVED JUN-25-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT KHIDEKEL, DR. IRINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SMALL, CAROLYN AS TO DEFENDANT KHIDEKEL, DR. IRINA CALIFORNIA STREET ASSOCIATES DOES 1 TO 50 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR NOV-21-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-17-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON OCT-29-2018 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HILLIER, ERIC R

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FINN BRIAN J.