Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/06/2016 at 19:40:06 (UTC).

CAROL WALKER VS. CHRISTOFLE SILVER, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2010 CAROL WALKER filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CHRISTOFLE SILVER, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7320

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALKER, CAROL

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 20

CHRISTOFLE SILVER, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRADEN, JAMES MCCARTY

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JAMES BRADEN

44 Montgomery St, Ste. 1210

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALKER, CAROL AS TO DEFENDANT CHRISTOFLE SILVER, INC. DOES 1 TO 20 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-30-2010 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-03-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-15-2010 (Fee:370.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF SERVICE

ADDED TO PROOF OF SERVICE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR HEARING SET FOR JUN-15-2010 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 212

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PROOF OF SERVICE ON JUN-15-2010 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR SEP-13-2010 IN DEPARTMENT 212 AT 1:30 PM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE JUL-30-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR SEP-13-2010 CONTINUED TO NOV-15-2010 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 212 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE SEP-13-2010 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR NOV-15-2010 CONTINUED TO JAN-18-2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 212 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE NOV-15-2010 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JAN-18-2011 CONTINUED TO APR-18-2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE JAN-18-2011 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Setting Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR JUL-15-2011 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS REPORT RE BANKRUPTCY. THE APR-18-2011 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR AUG-29-2011 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 1:30 PM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) OR FILE DISMISSAL FOLLOWING TERMINATION OF BANKRUPTCY. THE JUL-15-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR AUG-29-2011 CONTINUED TO OCT-31-2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) OR DISMISS AFTER TERMINATION OF BANKRUPTCY. THE AUG-29-2011 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR OCT-31-2011 CONTINUED TO DEC-12-2011 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) OR DISMISS AFTER TERMINATION OF BANKRUPTCY. THE OCT-31-2011 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

RESPONSE TO OSC RE: POS FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALKER, CAROL

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR DEC-12-2011 CONTINUED TO FEB-27-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE DEC-12-2011 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE POS FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALKER, CAROL

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR FEB-27-2012 CONTINUED TO APR-30-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE FEB-27-2012 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE EACH SIDE TO BEAR ITS OR HER OWN COSTS OF ATTY FEES

Case Ordered Off Calendar

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF APR-30-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF APR-30-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE EACH SIDE TO BEAR ITS OR HER OWN COSTS OF ATTY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR FEB-27-2012 CONTINUED TO APR-30-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE FEB-27-2012 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE POS FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALKER, CAROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR DEC-12-2011 CONTINUED TO FEB-27-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE DEC-12-2011 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO OSC RE: POS FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALKER, CAROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR OCT-31-2011 CONTINUED TO DEC-12-2011 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) OR DISMISS AFTER TERMINATION OF BANKRUPTCY. THE OCT-31-2011 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR AUG-29-2011 CONTINUED TO OCT-31-2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) OR DISMISS AFTER TERMINATION OF BANKRUPTCY. THE AUG-29-2011 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • RESPONSE TO OSC RE POS FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALKER, CAROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR AUG-29-2011 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 1:30 PM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) OR FILE DISMISSAL FOLLOWING TERMINATION OF BANKRUPTCY. THE JUL-15-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR NOV-15-2010 CONTINUED TO JAN-18-2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 212 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE NOV-15-2010 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2010
  • RESPONSE TO OSC RE: POS FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALKER, CAROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR SEP-13-2010 CONTINUED TO NOV-15-2010 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 212 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE SEP-13-2010 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2010
  • RESPONSE TO OSC RE: POS FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALKER, CAROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR SEP-13-2010 IN DEPARTMENT 212 AT 1:30 PM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE JUL-30-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PROOF OF SERVICE ON JUN-15-2010 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2010
  • RESPONSE TO OSC RE POS FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALKER, CAROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ADDED TO PROOF OF SERVICE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR HEARING SET FOR JUN-15-2010 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 212

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALKER, CAROL AS TO DEFENDANT CHRISTOFLE SILVER, INC. DOES 1 TO 20 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-30-2010 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-03-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-15-2010 (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRADEN, JAMES M.