Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/03/2016 at 13:53:00 (UTC).

CARNELL GAINES et al VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B*P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2005 CARNELL GAINES filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1146

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2005

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GAINES, SHARON AS LEGAL HEIR OF CARNELL GAINES DECEASED

GAINES, CARNELL

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

AMERICAN MOTORS CORPORATION

BRIDGESTONE/FIRESTONE NORTH AMERICAN TIRE, LLC, SUCCESSOR TO BRIDGESTONE / FIRESTONE, INC.

THORPE INSULATION COMPANY

NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.

NISSAN FORKLIFT CORPORATION, NORTH AMERICA

DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION

K-M INDUSTRIES HOLDING COMPANY INC

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.

RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION

ALLIED SIGNAL SII TO BENDIX CORP SUED AS HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

RILEY POWER, INC.

LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

FLOUR CORPORATION

E. & J. GALLO WINERY

DOES 1-8500

WESTERN BUILDING MATERIALS CO.

53 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON PURCELL

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O. Box 6169

Novato, CA 94948-6169

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

GILBERT, PETER RAY

Attorney at BERRY & BERRY

2930 Lakeshore Ave

Oakland, CA 94610-3614

YARON, GEORGE DIMITRI

Attorney at YARON & ASSOCIATES

601 California St. 21St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

2200 Powell St., Suite 805

Emeryville, CA 94608

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

1111 Broadway, 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

FOLEY, STEPHEN J.

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

1111 Broadway 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

SAMSON, IVOR ELIAS

Attorney at SONNENSCHEIN NATH & ROSENTHAL LLP

525 Market Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2708

SHARP, GARY D

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

1111 Broadway 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

BUTY, MADELINE L

Attorney at BUTY & CURLIANO LLP

555 12Th Street, Suite 1280

Oakland, CA 94607

Other Attorneys

GLASPY, DAVID MICHAEL

Attorney at GLASPY & GLASPY INC

100 Pringle Avenue, Ste 750

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

GOETZ, ANDY J.

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO

310 Golden Shore, 4Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90801-5511

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

WALLACE, JOHN ROBERT

Attorney at JACKSON & WALLACE

55 Francisco Street, 6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94133

KRAUSE, NANDOR BURTON

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main St. - Ste. 800, P.O. Box 8035

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

KELLEY, SHEILA D

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

2200 Powell St, Suite 805

Emeryville, CA 94608

WOOD, CHRISTOPHE WETHERILL

Attorney at MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

101 California St. 41St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

17 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

ORDER

ORDER ON OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED ON OBJECTIONS TO PLTFS' EVIDENCE IN OPPOS TO DEFT FOSTER WHEELER LLC'S MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 20959783) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

FURTHER REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 20977884) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MICHELLE M. CLOWSER, IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MICHELLE M. CLOWSER, IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 20977884) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

EXHIBITS I-K TO SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MICHELLE M. CLOWSER, IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

EXHIBITS I-K TO SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MICHELLE M. CLOWSER, IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 20977884) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

EXHIBITS L-M TO SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MICHELLE M. CLOWSER, IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

EXHIBITS L-M TO SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MICHELLE M. CLOWSER, IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 20977884) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF REGARDING THE USE WITNESSES NOT IDENTIFIED IN INTERROGATORIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER, LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION)?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF REGARDING THE USE WITNESSES NOT IDENTIFIED IN INTERROGATORIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER, LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION)S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 20986622) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GAINES, CARNELL GAINES, PEARLEAN GAINES, PEARLEAN, INDIVIDUALLY, AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO CARNELL GAINES, DECEASED GAINES, SHARON AS LEGAL HEIR OF CARNELL GAINES DECEASED GAINES, VINDELL AS LEGAL HEIR OF CARNELL GAINES, DECEASED GAINES, ANTHONY AS LEGAL HEIR OF CARNELL GAINES, DECEASED

SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF REGARDING THE USE WITNESSES NOT IDENTIFIED IN INTERROGATORIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER, LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION)?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF REGARDING THE USE WITNESSES NOT IDENTIFIED IN INTERROGATORIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER, LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION)S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 20986896) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GAINES, CARNELL GAINES, PEARLEAN GAINES, PEARLEAN, INDIVIDUALLY, AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO CARNELL GAINES, DECEASED GAINES, SHARON AS LEGAL HEIR OF CARNELL GAINES DECEASED GAINES, VINDELL AS LEGAL HEIR OF CARNELL GAINES, DECEASED GAINES, ANTHONY AS LEGAL HEIR OF CARNELL GAINES, DECEASED

ORDER

ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER, LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION)'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF DEFT OSCAR E. ERICKSON, INC. TO PLTFS' COMPLT FOR PERSONAL INJURY & LOSS OF CONSORTIUM-ASBESTOS FILED BY DEFENDANT OSCAR E. ERICKSON, INC. (Fee:292.20)

Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion Adding Case to October 18, 2007 Status Conference

OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION ADDING CASE TO OCTOBER 18, 2007 STATUS CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID # 15912620) FILED BY DEFENDANT DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL

DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC TO PRODUCE ITS CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS AND PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE FOR DEPOSITION AND TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS

DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC TO PRODUCE ITS CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS AND PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE FOR DEPOSITION AND TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS (TRANSACTION ID # 20009461) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

PROOF OF E-SERVICE

PROOF OF E-SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 20688272) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GAINES, CARNELL GAINES, PEARLEAN GAINES, ANTHONY AS LEGAL HEIR OF CARNELL GAINES, DECEASED

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 21141927) FILED BY DEFENDANT NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC.

FLUOR CORPORATIONS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF CALIFORNIA INDUSTRIAL SAFETY ORDERS ON THE ISSUE OF STATE OF THE ART [MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3]

MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF CALIFORNIA INDUSTRIAL SAFETY ORDERS ON THE ISSUE OF STATE OF THE ART [MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3] (TRANSACTION ID # 21283324) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLOUR CORPORATION

DEFENDANT FLUOR CORPORATIONS MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING EVIDENCE OF MEDICAL COSTS [MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4]

MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING EVIDENCE OF MEDICAL COSTS [MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4] (TRANSACTION ID # 21283324) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLOUR CORPORATION

Request for Dismissal as to defendant Foster Wheeler LLC only. Each party to bear its own costs.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 36901035) AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

223 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2014
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON APR-17-2014 - ***CASE IS DISMISSED.*** THE COURT ORDERD THE CASE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: CINDY GARIS, CSR#9402 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-19-2013 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON APR-17-2014 AT 1:30PM IN DEPT. 503, PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, CHRIS HERSOM. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • TIME EXTENDED OR TOLLED TO NOV-06-2013 TIME TOLLED AS TO PLANT INSULATION ONLY PER CHART PROVIDED BY BRAYTON PURCELL. FILED BY PLAINTIFF GAINES, PEARLEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-20-2013 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-19-2013 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, MR. OREN NOAH. THE BRAYTON'S LAW FIRM HAS PROVIDED A COLOR CODED CHART TO THE COURT REGARDING THE STATUS OF DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION CASES. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR OF DEC-11-2012 TO ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-20-2013 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 FOR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO REPORT TO THE COURT HOW MUCH TIME TOLLED AND DATES IN WHICH THE 5-YEAR STATUTE OF LIMITATION HAS BEEN EXTENDED. OREN NOAH APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY AND BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2011
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-15-2011 TO ASBESTOS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-13-2012 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 FOR THE STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY STAY AS TO THE ONLY REMAINING DEFENDANT, PLANT INSULATION. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY AND BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 38948493) AS TO DEFENDANT TOSCO REFINING COMPANY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 36901035) AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-16-2010 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-15-2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 206 FOR STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY STAY AS TO DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; COURT REPORTER DIANA L. GONZALEZ, CSR #7935, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL, BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2010
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY ASBESTOS CALENDAR ON MAY-24-2010. ASSIGNED TO PRETRIAL DEPT. 206 ON DEC-16-2010 AT 1:30 PM FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY STAY AS TO THE REMAINING DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
456 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY,INC. (Fee:292.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2005
  • OBJECTION TO STIP OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER FILED BY DEFENDANT HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT,INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2005
  • OBJECTION TO STIP OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER FILED BY DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY,INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT DILLINGHAM CONSTRUCTION N.A., INC. (Fee:292.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1001 TO BE CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT LEHIGH SOUTHWEST CEMENT COMPANY (Fee:292.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY (Fee:292.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2005
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET/NEW FILING ASBESTOS LITIGATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF GAINES, CARNELL GAINES, PEARLEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GAINES, CARNELL GAINES, PEARLEAN AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B*P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B,B-I,C,H,I; DOES 1-8500 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-20-2006 (Fee:295.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where K-M INDUSTRIES HOLDING CO., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where E. & J. Gallo Winery is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN MOTORS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTERN BUILDING MATERIALS CO. is a litigant