This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 12/06/2017 at 04:34:24 (UTC).

CARLOS SEGURA VS. CENTURY SCAFFOLDING CONSTRUCTION, INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/11/2017 CARLOS SEGURA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CENTURY SCAFFOLDING CONSTRUCTION, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERI L. JACKSON. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0668

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

TERI L. JACKSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEGURA, CARLOS

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE

CENTURY SCAFFOLDING CONSTRUCTION, INC

CAL PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION, INC.

BAY CITY MECHANICAL, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIRHOSSEINI, ALI R

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MIRHOSSEINI

1502 N. Broadway

Santa Ana, CA 92706

Defendant Attorneys

CUMMISKEY, CHRIS J.

Attorney at BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O'MEARA, LLP

21215 Burbank Blvd, Suite 500

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

LIFTER, JILL JAYE

Attorney at RYAN & LIFTER

2000 Crow Canyon Pl., Ste. 400

San Ramon, CA 94583-1367

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SEGURA, CARLOS AS TO DEFENDANT CENTURY SCAFFOLDING CONSTRUCTION, INC BAY CITY MECHANICAL, INC CAL PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION, INC. DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-10-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-10-2017 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-18-2017

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100029980), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SEGURA, CARLOS SERVED OCT-10-2017, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION, MAILING DATE OCT-11-2017 AS TO DEFENDANT CAL PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION, INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100030077), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SEGURA, CARLOS SERVED OCT-09-2017, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE OCT-11-2017 AS TO DEFENDANT BAY CITY MECHANICAL, INC

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 61358665) FILED BY DEFENDANT CENTURY SCAFFOLDING CONSTRUCTION, INC ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

PROOF OF SERVICE RE: CENTURY SCAFFOLDING CONSTRUCTION, INC.

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100030767), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SEGURA, CARLOS SERVED OCT-12-2017, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE OCT-13-2017 AS TO DEFENDANT CENTURY SCAFFOLDING CONSTRUCTION, INC

Bay City Mechanical, Inc.s and Cal Pacific Construction, Inc.s Answer

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100027110) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY CITY MECHANICAL, INC CAL PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Answer of Defendant Century Scaffolding Construction, Inc. to Plaintif

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61404274) FILED BY DEFENDANT CENTURY SCAFFOLDING CONSTRUCTION, INC

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2017
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $900; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B4917B30F006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R4917B14F002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1017811F009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61404274) FILED BY DEFENDANT CENTURY SCAFFOLDING CONSTRUCTION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100027110) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAY CITY MECHANICAL, INC CAL PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Fee:$900.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100030767), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SEGURA, CARLOS SERVED OCT-12-2017, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE OCT-13-2017 AS TO DEFENDANT CENTURY SCAFFOLDING CONSTRUCTION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 61358665) FILED BY DEFENDANT CENTURY SCAFFOLDING CONSTRUCTION, INC ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100030077), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SEGURA, CARLOS SERVED OCT-09-2017, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE OCT-11-2017 AS TO DEFENDANT BAY CITY MECHANICAL, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100029980), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SEGURA, CARLOS SERVED OCT-10-2017, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION, MAILING DATE OCT-11-2017 AS TO DEFENDANT CAL PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SEGURA, CARLOS AS TO DEFENDANT CENTURY SCAFFOLDING CONSTRUCTION, INC BAY CITY MECHANICAL, INC CAL PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION, INC. DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-10-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-10-2017 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-18-2017 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******0668
Case Title:CARLOS SEGURA VS. CENTURY SCAFFOLDING CONSTRUCTION, INC ET AL
Court Date:AUG-31-2018 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion To Compel Defendant Cal Pacific Construction Inc.S Further Responses To Requests For Production Of Documents, Set One; Request For Monetary Sanctions Against Cal Pacific Construction And Its Attorneys Of Record; [Proposed]Order
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Friday, August 31, 2018, Line 4, DEFENDANT CENTURY SCAFFOLDING CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S Motion To Compel Defendant Cal Pacific Construction Inc.S Further Responses To Requests For Production Of Documents, Set One; Request For Monetary Sanctions Against Cal Pacific Construction And Its Attorneys Of Record. Pro Tem Judge Bruce Highman, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling: Off calendar.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to bruce.highman@highmanlaw.com with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem hearing the motion and the Pro Tem will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/JPT)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hi-Tech Construction, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BAY CITY MECHANICAL, INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIRHOSSEINI ALI R.