This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/23/2016 at 18:22:24 (UTC).

CARL MCCURTIS VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 10/29/2008 CARL MCCURTIS filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4904

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2008

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCCURTIS, CARL

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

NAVISTAR, INC., FORMERLY KNOWN AS INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

DANA COMPANIES, LLC FKA DANA CORPORATION

STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC.

EMSCO ASBESTOS COMPANY

NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.

BUCYRUS INTERNATIONAL, INC.

MACK TRUCKS, INC.

AUTO SPECIALTIES MANUFACTURING COMPANY

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

AMERICAN CONFERENCE OF GOVERNMENT INDUSTRIAL HYGEN AMERICAN CONFERENCE OF GOVERNMENT INDUSTRIAL HYGENISTS, INC.

LEAR SIEGLER DIVIERSIFIED HOLDINGS CORP.

STUART-WESTERN, INC.

BRASSBESTOS BRAKE LINING COMPANY

U.S. SPRING & BUMPER COMPANY

SILVER LINE PRODUCTS, INC

BORG-WARNER CORPORATION BY ITS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BORGWARNERMORSE TEC, INC.

TOYOTA MOTORS SALES, U.S.A., INC.

55 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON & PURCELL LLP; ATTORNEYS AT LAW

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O. Box 6169

Novato, CA 94948-6169

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

KELLY, DANIEL J.

Attorney at HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP

71 Stevenson St., 2Oth Flr

Sf, CA 94105-2981

THOMAS, ANTHONY S.

Attorney at BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP

879 West 190Th Street, Suite 700

Gardena, CA 90248

OSTERTAG, JAMES J

Attorney at NIXON PEABODY LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER

Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94111

LANKFORD, PAUL V

Attorney at LANKFORD & CRAWFORD, LLP

2 Theatre Square, Suite 240

Orinda, CA 94563

POLLACK, DEAN

Attorney at BURNHAM BROWN

P.O. Box 119 (Zip Code 94604), 1901 Harrison St, 11Th Flr

Oakland, CA 94612

Other Attorneys

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

GORDON, MICHAEL SCOT

AMES, RICHARD

Attorney at CARROL, BURDICK & MCDONOUGH LLP

44 Montgomery Street, Ste 400

San Francisco, CA 94104

BUTY, MADELINE L

Attorney at BUTY & CURLIANO LLP

555 City Center, 555 12Th Street, Suite 1280

Oakland, CA 94607

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

KELLEY, SHEILA D

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

1255 Powell St.

Emeryville, CA 94608-2604

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

1255 Powell St

Emeryville, CA 94608-2604

GRANIEZ, JOHN A.

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

221 North Figueroa St. #1200

Los Angeles, CA 90012

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, AMARO, GOETZ, HILLYARD, BARNES & REINHOLTZ LLP

369 Pine Street, Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

SPANOS, EVANTHIA M

Attorney at BERRY & BERRYA PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

2930 Lakeshore Ave

Oakland, CA 94610

GAMBINO, MARY ELLEN

GAMBA, PAUL JOSEPH

Attorney at SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

33 New Montgomery St, 6Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94105

LOVE, MARK A

Attorney at SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

33 New Montgomery, Sixth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT DANA COMPANIES LLC?S (formerly known as DANA CORPORATION) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 32648449) FILED BY DEFENDANT DANA COMPANIES, LLC FKA DANA CORPORATION HEARING SET FOR DEC-02-2010 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 220 (Fee:200.00)

DEFENDANT DANA COMPANIES LLC?S (formerly known as DANA CORPORATION) SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 32648449) FILED BY DEFENDANT DANA COMPANIES, LLC FKA DANA CORPORATION

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT DANA COMPANIES, LLC (formerly known as DANA CORPORATION)

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 32648449) FILED BY DEFENDANT DANA COMPANIES, LLC FKA DANA CORPORATION

DECLARATION OF TINA M. GLEZAKOS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DANA COMPANIES LLC?S (formerly known as DANA CORPORATION) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF TINA M. GLEZAKOS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DANA COMPANIES LLCS (FORMERLY KNOWN AS DANA CORPORATION) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 32648449) FILED BY DEFENDANT DANA COMPANIES, LLC FKA DANA CORPORATION

PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DANA COMPANIES, LLCS (formerly known as DANA CORPORATION) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DANA COMPANIES, LLCS (FORMERLY KNOWN AS DANA CORPORATION) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 34427568) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MCCURTIS, CARL

DECLARATION OF GEOFF T. SLONIKER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DANA COMPANIES, LLCS (formerly known as DANA CORPORATION) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF GEOFF T. SLONIKER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DANA COMPANIES, LLCS (FORMERLY KNOWN AS DANA CORPORATION) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 34427568) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MCCURTIS, CARL

PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT DANA COMPANIES, LLCS (formerly known as DANA CORPORATION) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT DANA COMPANIES, LLCS (FORMERLY KNOWN AS DANA CORPORATION) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 34427568) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MCCURTIS, CARL

Defendants Motion in Limine for Order Requiring Plaintiff to Produce His Responses to Co-Defendants Written Discovery Requests and his Oppositions to Co-Defendants Summary Judgment and Other Motions

MOTION IN LIMINE FOR ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO PRODUCE HIS RESPONSES TO CO-DEFENDANTS WRITTEN DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND HIS OPPOSITIONS TO CO-DEFENDANTS SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OTHER MOTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 35336167) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY MEGGITT AIRCRAFT BRAKING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, F/N/A AIRCRAFT BRAKING SYSTEMS CORPORATION LOCKHEED MARTIN TACTICAL SYSTEMS, INC.

OBJECTION TO COURT COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRE TEMPORE AT TRIAL

OBJECTION TO HEARING BY COMMISSIONER/PRO TEM ACTING AS JUDGE / OBJECTION TO COURT COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE AT TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 22852475) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

ORDER

ORDER STIPULATION RE: RELEASE OF RECORDS

Substitution of Attorney

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 29933990): GAMBA, PAUL JOSEPH SUBSTITUTED FOR DUMONT, RICHARD DANA AS ATTORNEY FOR LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING PERMISSION FOR MICHAEL SCOT GORDON TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS CO-COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY.

Defendants The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Meggitt Aircraft Braking Systems Corporation and Lockheed Martin Tactical Systems, Inc. Index of Motions in Limine

INDEX OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE (TRANSACTION ID # 35336167) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY MEGGITT AIRCRAFT BRAKING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, F/N/A AIRCRAFT BRAKING SYSTEMS CORPORATION LOCKHEED MARTIN TACTICAL SYSTEMS, INC.

Defendants Motion in Limine on Admissibility of State of The Art Evidence to Determine the Existence of a Warning Defect

MOTION IN LIMINE ON ADMISSIBILITY OF STATE OF THE ART EVIDENCE TO DETERMINE THE EXISTENCE OF A WARNING DEFECT (TRANSACTION ID # 35336167) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY MEGGITT AIRCRAFT BRAKING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, F/N/A AIRCRAFT BRAKING SYSTEMS CORPORATION LOCKHEED MARTIN TACTICAL SYSTEMS, INC.

Proof of Electronic Service

PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ON MTN IN LIMINE (TRANSACTION ID # 35336167) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY MEGGITT AIRCRAFT BRAKING SYSTEMS CORPORATION, F/N/A AIRCRAFT BRAKING SYSTEMS CORPORATION LOCKHEED MARTIN TACTICAL SYSTEMS, INC.

GROUPED FOR TRIAL WITH BRAYTON GROUP 547 - DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE UNDISCLOSED WITNESSES AND EXPERT WITNESSES NOT MADE AVAILABLE FOR DEPOSITION [MIL #21]

MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE UNDISCLOSED WITNESSES AND EXPERT WITNESSES NOT MADE AVAILABLE FOR DEPOSITION [MIL #21] (TRANSACTION ID # 35361160) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY

GROUPED FOR TRIAL WITH BRAYTON GROUP 547 - DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT RELATING TO ANY CLAIM OF POST-SALE DUTY TO WARN [MIL #34]

MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT RELATING TO ANY CLAIM OF POST-SALE DUTY TO WARN [MIL #34] (TRANSACTION ID # 35361160) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY

GROUPED FOR TRIAL WITH BRAYTON GROUP 547 - EXHIBIT A THROUGH D TO THE DECLARATION OF PAUL LANNUS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF, VIDEOTAPES PRODUCED BY, AND EXPERIMENTS CONDUCTED BY PLAINTIFFS EXPERTS, RICHARD HATFIELD, WILLIAM LONGO AND JOHN

EXHIBIT A THROUGH D TO THE DECLARATION OF PAUL LANNUS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF, VIDEOTAPES PRODUCED BY, AND EXPERIMENTS CONDUCTED BY PLAINTIFFS EXPERTS, RICHARD HATFIELD, WILLIAM LONGO AND JOHN TEMPLIN [MIL #29] (TRANSACTION ID # 35361160) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY

224 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2014
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON NOV-06-2014. DISMISSAL FILED 10/22/14. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56234934)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE OF APR-17-2014 AND SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON NOV-06-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: CINDY GARIS, CSR#9402 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-19-2013 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON APR-17-2014 AT 1:30PM IN DEPT. 503, PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, CHRIS HERSOM. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • TIME EXTENDED OR TOLLED TO APR-27-2017 TIME TOLLED AS TO PLANT INSULATION ONLY PER CHART PROVIDED BY BRAYTON PURCELL. FILED BY PLAINTIFF MCCURTIS, CARL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-20-2013 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-19-2013 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, MR. OREN NOAH. THE BRAYTON'S LAW FIRM HAS PROVIDED A COLOR CODED CHART TO THE COURT REGARDING THE STATUS OF DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION CASES. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR OF DEC-11-2012 TO ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-20-2013 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 FOR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO REPORT TO THE COURT HOW MUCH TIME TOLLED AND DATES IN WHICH THE 5-YEAR STATUTE OF LIMITATION HAS BEEN EXTENDED. OREN NOAH APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY AND BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 47276794) AS TO DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • ATTORNEY MICHAEL SCOT GORDON INACTIVATED FOR FAILURE TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • ATTORNEY MICHAEL SCOT GORDON INACTIVATED FOR FAILURE TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
265 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION BY DEFENDANT THE PEP BOYS MANNY, MOE JACK OF CALIFORNIA TO ASSIGNMENT TO COMMISSIONER FOR TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 22837813) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE PEP BOYS MANNY, MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 22837813) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE PEP BOYS MANNY, MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22837813) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE PEP BOYS MANNY, MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22757379) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION CO. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22750440) FILED BY DEFENDANT AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT BORG-WARNER CORPORATIONS DECLINATION OF STIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER AT TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 22644149) FILED BY DEFENDANT BORG-WARNER CORPORATION BY ITS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BORGWARNERMORSE TEC, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22644149) FILED BY DEFENDANT BORG-WARNER CORPORATION BY ITS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BORGWARNERMORSE TEC, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2008
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF MCCURTIS, CARL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MCCURTIS, CARL AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-15-2009 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less