This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/17/2016 at 02:51:03 (UTC).

CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. VS. RUBEN PEREZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/06/2015 CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RUBEN PEREZ. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8855

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

PACIFIC OFFICE AUTOMATION, INC.

ZEUSS, GEORGE

ROES 1 TO 20

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE

PEREZ, RUBEN AN INDIVIDUAL DBA ALBERTO'S PRINTING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

GUERRINI, JOHN D

Attorney at THE GUERRINI LAW FIRM

106 South Mentor Ave, Ste 150

Pasadena, CA 91106

BRAND, DAVID

4715 Bentree Ave.

Long Beach, CA 90807

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA, ROBERT PAUL

Attorney at ROBERT P. GARCIA

12 Geary St., #708

San Francisco, CA 94108-5718

 

Court Documents

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-06-2016 CONTINUED TO JUN-22-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Proof of Service By First Class Mail - Civil

PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS MAIL OF NOTICE OF CMC (TRANSACTION ID # 16076011) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID # 16076011) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS, (TRANSACTION ID # 16076011): BRAND, DAVID ADDED AS ATTORNEY FOR CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 16076011) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 1.0 DAYS

proof of service by mail

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 16070027) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

memorandum of Points and Authorities

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES ISO DEMURRER TO X-COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16070027) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Cross Complaint

DEMURRER TO CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16070027) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. HEARING SET FOR MAY-04-2016 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF RUBEN PEREZ AN INDIVIDUAL DBA ALBERTOS PRINTING FO

CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58396027) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT PEREZ, RUBEN AN INDIVIDUAL DBA ALBERTO'S PRINTING AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ZEUSS, GEORGE PACIFIC OFFICE AUTOMATION, INC. ROES 1 TO 20

ANSWER OF RUBEN PEREZ AN INDIVIDUAL dba ALBERTOS PRINTING TO COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58396355) FILED BY DEFENDANT PEREZ, RUBEN AN INDIVIDUAL DBA ALBERTO'S PRINTING (Fee:450.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15349011), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. SERVED NOV-14-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT PEREZ, RUBEN AN INDIVIDUAL DBA ALBERTO'S PRINTING

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT PEREZ, RUBEN AN INDIVIDUAL DBA ALBERTO'S PRINTING DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-06-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-05-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-14-2016 (Fee:450.00)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-06-2016 CONTINUED TO JUN-22-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS MAIL OF NOTICE OF CMC (TRANSACTION ID # 16076011) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID # 16076011) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS, (TRANSACTION ID # 16076011): BRAND, DAVID ADDED AS ATTORNEY FOR CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 16076011) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 1.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 16070027) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES ISO DEMURRER TO X-COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16070027) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16070027) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. HEARING SET FOR MAY-04-2016 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR (TRANSACTION ID # 16070027) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58396027) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT PEREZ, RUBEN AN INDIVIDUAL DBA ALBERTO'S PRINTING AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. ZEUSS, GEORGE PACIFIC OFFICE AUTOMATION, INC. ROES 1 TO 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58396355) FILED BY DEFENDANT PEREZ, RUBEN AN INDIVIDUAL DBA ALBERTO'S PRINTING (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15349011), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. SERVED NOV-14-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT PEREZ, RUBEN AN INDIVIDUAL DBA ALBERTO'S PRINTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMMON COUNTS/OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT/COLLECTIONS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT PEREZ, RUBEN AN INDIVIDUAL DBA ALBERTO'S PRINTING DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-06-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-05-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-14-2016 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******8855
Case Title:CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. VS. RUBEN PEREZ ET AL
Court Date:MAY-04-2016 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER TO CROSS COMPLAINT
Rulings:SET FOR HEARING ON WEDNESDAY, MAY 4, 2016, LINE 11CROSS-DEFENDANT CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES INC's DEMURRER TO CROSS COMPLAINTOverruled as to the first cause of action for cancellation of an instrument, sustained with twenty days leave to amend as to the second cause of action for fraud, and sustained without leave to amend as to the third cause of action for unfair business practices. The first claim is adequately pled based on alleged forgery. The second cause of action fails to allege fraud with the required particularity and Mr. Perez is given leave to correct this deficiency if he can do so in good faith. Mr. Perez has acknowledged that his third claim is deficient as a matter of law and not applicable to this case. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. Counsel for Cannon Financial Services is required to prepare a proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the tentative ruling is not contested. =302/HK


Case Number:*******8855
Case Title:CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. VS. RUBEN PEREZ ET AL
Court Date:JUL-28-2016 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT
Rulings:Set for hearing on Thursday, July 28, 2016, Line 9, CROSS-DEFENDANT CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.'S DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT.Cross-defendant Canon Financial Service, Inc.'s demurrer to the second cause of action in the first amended cross-complaint is overruled. The allegation in paragraph 5 that Mr. Zeuss was the agent or employee of Canon when he prepared a writing with Canon as a proposed signatory is adequate to withstand a demurrer challenging the sufficiency of an agency/employment allegation. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. Counsel for plaintiff is required to prepare a proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/HK)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CANON FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA, ROBERT P