This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:47:08 (UTC).

CANAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION VS. DARYIS MACKEY et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 CANAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DARYIS MACKEY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8438

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CANAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION

Defendants

MACKEY, DARYIAS JAMES INCORRECTLY SUED AS DARYIS MACKEY

1030 Fillmore St #804

San Francisco, CA 94115

MACKEY, DARYIS

MACKEY, LYNETTE

San Francisco, CA 94115

DOES 1 THRU 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAINES, TODD F.

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF TODD F. HAINES

30495 Canwood Street, Suite 100

Agoura Hills, CA 91301

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CANAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT MACKEY, DARYIS MACKEY, LYNETTE DOES 1 THRU 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-31-2013 (Fee:225.00)

ORDER

ORDER MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO FORM INTERROGATORES SERVED ON DARYIS MACKEY AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CANAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 2.0 HOURS

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DEEM ADMITTED THE FIRST SET OF REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR JAN-21-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON SEP-18-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CANAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION SERVED FEB-10-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT MACKEY, LYNETTE

GENERAL DENIAL

GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT MACKEY, LYNETTE MACKEY, DARYIAS JAMES INCORRECTLY SUED AS DARYIS MACKEY (Fee:IFP)

Order Setting Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR SEP-18-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MACKEY, LYNETTE MACKEY, DARYIAS JAMES INCORRECTLY SUED AS DARYIS MACKEY

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR MOTION TO BE HEARD BY MEMBER OF THE CALIFORNIA BAR SERVING AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE

Entry of Default Reject

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF CANAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT MACKEY, DARYIS MACKEY, LYNETTE

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT MACKEY, LYNETTE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CANAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION SERVED FEB-12-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT MACKEY, DARYIS

COURT JUDGMENT - GENERAL

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CANAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT MACKEY, DARYIS $3,047.93 PRINCIPAL, $580.36 INTEREST, $288.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $3,916.29, SEE SCANNED DOC

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2015
  • CERTIFY COPY OF JUDGMENT FACT RE UNSATISFIED JUDGMENT TO DMV FILED BY PLAINTIFF CANAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • COPYING FEES (2 PAGE, 1 CERTIFIED COPY) PAID BY PLAINTIFF CANAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION (Fee:26.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • CERTIFY COPY OF JUDGMENT FACT RE UNSATISFIED JUDGMENT TO DMV FILED BY PLAINTIFF CANAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF CANAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CANAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT MACKEY, DARYIS $3,047.93 PRINCIPAL, $580.36 INTEREST, $288.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $3,916.29, SEE SCANNED DOC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • SHORT CAUSE TRIAL ON JAN-21-2014 OFF CALENDAR - JUDGMENT ENTERED. PROCEEDINGS REPORTED BY: MITCH LYON , CSR#6840. (514)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • MINI MINUTES FOR JAN-21-2014 10:13 AM FOR DEPT 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY PLAINTIFF CANAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • MASTER COURT CALENDAR OF JAN-21-2014 ASSIGNED TO SHORT CAUSE TRIAL CALENDAR ON JAN-21-2014 AT 10:13 AM IN DEPT. 514, JUDGE HARRY DORFMAN, FOR PROVE-UP HEARING. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF. NO OTHER APPEARANCES ON THIS MATTER. JUDGE: CYNTHIA M. LEE; CLERK: EBURA; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR MOTION TO BE HEARD BY MEMBER OF THE CALIFORNIA BAR SERVING AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CANAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT MACKEY, DARYIS MACKEY, LYNETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF JURY FEES AND EXPENSES PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY DEFENDANT MACKEY, DARYIAS JAMES INCORRECTLY SUED AS DARYIS MACKEY ORDER FOR WAIVER OF JURY FEES AND EXPENSES GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MACKEY, LYNETTE MACKEY, DARYIAS JAMES INCORRECTLY SUED AS DARYIS MACKEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT MACKEY, LYNETTE MACKEY, DARYIAS JAMES INCORRECTLY SUED AS DARYIS MACKEY (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY DEFENDANT MACKEY, DARYIAS JAMES INCORRECTLY SUED AS DARYIS MACKEY ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • COPYING FEES (8 PAGE) PAID BY DEFENDANT MACKEY, LYNETTE (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY DEFENDANT MACKEY, LYNETTE ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CANAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION SERVED FEB-10-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT MACKEY, LYNETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CANAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION SERVED FEB-12-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT MACKEY, DARYIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CANAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT MACKEY, DARYIS MACKEY, LYNETTE DOES 1 THRU 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-31-2013 (Fee:225.00)

    Read MoreRead Less