Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:47:42 (UTC).

CALVIN BOLTON et al VS. SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 CALVIN BOLTON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8445

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOLTON, CALVIN

FLOWER, LAWRENCE

GITCHUWAY, LADEEN

JAMOC, JULIUS

MARSH JR., JAMES

MCCLINDON, DANNY

PATTERSON, HATTIE

POLLARD, SYLVESTER

RICE, LYNN

ROBINSON, FREDDIE

San Francisco, CA 94102

SCURRY, SUSAN

Defendants

SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY A PUBLIC ENTITY

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WIEDERHOLD, MARY CATHERINE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MARY CATHERINE WIEDERHOLD

1458 Sutter Street

San Francisco, CA 94109

Defendant Attorney

LEE, RANDALL JAYMAN

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Flr

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

ORDER

ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAIN ON THE JURY TRIAL CALENDAR

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO FILE A MOTION FOR TERMINATING AND FURTHER SANCTIONS AND A HEARING ON AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING CONTEMPT AGAINST DEFT SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY AND ITS COUNSEL OF RECORD, ANNE GRITZER, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOLTON, CALVIN FLOWER, LAWRENCE GITCHUWAY, LADEEN JAMOC, JULIUS MARSH JR., JAMES (Fee:60.00)

Order Setting Mandatory Settlement Conference

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR JAN-17-2014 AT 01:00 PM IN DEPT. 210 WITH CONFERENCE OFFICER JAMES F. LYNCH.

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO MOVE FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE.

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ALLOWING ITS INSURANCE CARRIER REPRESENTATIVE TO APPEAR VIA TELEPHONE AT THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: PRO PER SUBSTITUTED FOR WIEDERHOLD, MARY CATHERINE AS ATTORNEY FOR ROBINSON, FREDDIE

Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR FEB-03-2014. THE COURT ORDERED THE COMPLAINT DISMISSED ONLY AS TO THE PLAINTIFF FREDDIE ROBINSON FOR NO APPEARANCE. THE MATTER SETTLED AS TO ALL OTHER PLAINTIFFS. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON APR-08-2014 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. JUDGE: MARY E. WISS; CLERK: EBURA; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

OBJECTION TO PLTF'S REQ. FOR A CONTINUANCE OF THE HEARING REAGARDING AN OSC WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY A PUBLIC ENTITY

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT

CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOLTON, CALVIN FLOWER, LAWRENCE GITCHUWAY, LADEEN JAMOC, JULIUS MARSH JR., JAMES MCCLINDON, DANNY PATTERSON, HATTIE POLLARD, SYLVESTER RICE, LYNN ROBINSON, FREDDIE SCURRY, SUSAN AS TO DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY A PUBLIC ENTITY DOES 1 TO 100 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-10-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2013 (Fee:450.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

NTC OF MTN AND MTN FOR CASE TO REAMIN ON THE JURY TRIAL CALENDAR, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOLTON, CALVIN FLOWER, LAWRENCE GITCHUWAY, LADEEN JAMOC, JULIUS HEARING SET FOR DEC-12-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206 (Fee:60.00)

ORDER

ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION TO MTN FOR PLTF'S CASE TO REMAIN ON THE JURY TRIAL CALENDAR FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY A PUBLIC ENTITY

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR TERMINATING AND FURTHER SANCTIONS AND A HEARING ON AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING CONTEMPT AGAINST DEFT SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY AND ITS COUNSEL OF RECORD FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY A PUBLIC ENTITY

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

OBJECTION TO DEFT'S REQ. TO ALLOW THE INSURANCE REPRESENTATIVE TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT THE JAN 17 MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOLTON, CALVIN FLOWER, LAWRENCE GITCHUWAY, LADEEN JAMOC, JULIUS MARSH JR., JAMES

ORDER

ORDER - PROTECTIVE ORDER (NO SASE, COPY IN D501 OUTGOING BOX)

Case Ordered Off Calendar

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUN-10-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUN-10-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING THE EX PARTE APP FOR THE ADMIN OF THE COURTS PROTECTIVE ORDER. FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY A PUBLIC ENTITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR THE ADMINISTRATION OF THE COURT'S PROTECTIVE ORDER SIGNED JANUARY 22, 2014 AND FOR THE RETURN OF PRIVILEGED DOCUMENTS LODGED WITH THE COURT FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY A PUBLIC ENTITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY A PUBLIC ENTITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2014
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER ADMINSTRATION OF THE COURT'S PROTECTIVE ORDER SIGNED JAN-22-2014 AND FOR THE RETURN OF PRIVILEGED DDOCUMENTS LODGED WITH THE COURT FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY A PUBLIC ENTITY (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF ANNE C GRITZER IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTION TO PLTF'S REQ. FOR A CONTINUANCE OF THE HEARING REGARDING AN OSC WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY A PUBLIC ENTITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO PLTF'S REQ. FOR A CONTINUANCE OF THE HEARING REAGARDING AN OSC WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY A PUBLIC ENTITY

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2013
  • DECLARATION OF ANNE C. GRITZER IN SUPPORT OF OPPOS FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY A PUBLIC ENTITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • OPPOSITION TO PLTF'S MOTION TO COMPEL TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY A PUBLIC ENTITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOLTON, CALVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOLTON, CALVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • MTN TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOLTON, CALVIN HEARING SET FOR NOV-18-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR FEB-03-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUL-10-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY A PUBLIC ENTITY (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOLTON, CALVIN FLOWER, LAWRENCE GITCHUWAY, LADEEN JAMOC, JULIUS MARSH JR., JAMES MCCLINDON, DANNY PATTERSON, HATTIE POLLARD, SYLVESTER RICE, LYNN ROBINSON, FREDDIE SCURRY, SUSAN AS TO DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY A PUBLIC ENTITY DOES 1 TO 100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOLTON, CALVIN FLOWER, LAWRENCE GITCHUWAY, LADEEN JAMOC, JULIUS MARSH JR., JAMES MCCLINDON, DANNY PATTERSON, HATTIE POLLARD, SYLVESTER RICE, LYNN ROBINSON, FREDDIE SCURRY, SUSAN AS TO DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO HOUSING AUTHORITY A PUBLIC ENTITY DOES 1 TO 100 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-10-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less