Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/03/2016 at 16:53:01 (UTC).

CALVIN BENSTON VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B*P, AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2005 CALVIN BENSTON filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B P, AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1789

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2005

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MAAS, LORI AS LEGAL HEIR OF CALVIN BENSTON, DECEASED

DENNIS, ANDREA AS LEGAL HEIR OF CALVIN BENSTON, DECEASED

BENSTON, HEATHER AS LEGAL HEIR OF CALVIN BENSTON, DECEASED

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

VIKING PUMP, INC.

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.

THORPE INSULATION COMPANY

ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B*P, AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B,B-I,C,H,I:

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

CRANE CO.

RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION

DOES 1-8500

TERRY STEAM TURBINE CO.

ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

RHI HOLDINGS, INC.

BLACK BALL TRANSPORT, INC.

QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

19 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON PURCELL

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O. Box 6169

Novato, CA 94948-6169

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

JACKSON, GABRIEL ANNE

Attorney at JACKSON & WALLACE LLP

55 Francisco Street, 6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94133

BERTRAND, JEAN LYNNE

Attorney at SCHIFF HARDIN LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower, 32Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at KIRKPATRICK & LOCKHART PRESTON GATES ELLIS LLP

55 Second Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

SAMSON, IVOR ELIAS

Attorney at SONNENSCHEIN NATH & ROSENTHAL LLP

525 Market Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2708

ROBINSON, RALPH WELLS

Attorney at WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER LLP

525 Market Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2725

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

REYNOLDS, RICHARD LEROY

Attorney at BENNETT, SAMUELSEN, REYNOLDS & ALLARD

1301 Marina Village Parkway, Suite 300

Alameda, CA 94501-1084

VACCHINA, LEONARDO J

Attorney at BERRY & BERRY

2930 Lakeshore Ave., P.O. Box 16070

Oakland, CA 94610

MA, LILLIAN C

Attorney at TUCKER ELLIS & WEST LLP

One Market Street, Steuart Tower, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94105

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

550 Montgomery Street, Eighth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

OBERG, LISA L

Attorney at MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

101 California St. 41St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Other Attorneys

CUNNINGHAM, JAMES PATRICK

Attorney at CARROLL, BURDICK & MCDONOUGH

44 Montgomery Street, Suite 400

San Francisco, CA 94104

POND, FRANK D

Pond North Llp, 350 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2850

Los Angeles, CA 90071

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

ROME, HENRY DAVID

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Road, Suite 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

SPAULDING, STEVEN SCOTT

Attorney at JEDEIKEN, SPAULDING, MEADOWS & SCHNEIDER

333 Pine Street, 5Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94104

1 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

CRANE CO.???S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 17545165) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO. HEARING SET FOR FEB-22-2008 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:200.00)

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CRANE CO.???S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 17545165) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF CRANE CO.???S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 17545165) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

DECLARATION OF JAS DHILLON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CRANE CO.???S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DECLARATION OF JAS DHILLON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 17545165) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

EXHIBITS A THROUGH D TO DECLARATION OF JAS DHILLON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CRANE CO.???S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

EXHIBITS A THROUGH D TO DECLARATION OF JAS DHILLON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 17545165) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

EXHIBITS E THROUGH F TO DECLARATION OF JAS DHILLON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CRANE CO.???S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

EXHIBITS E THROUGH F TO DECLARATION OF JAS DHILLON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 17545165) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

EXHIBITS G THROUGH M TO DECLARATION OF JAS DHILLON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CRANE CO.???S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

EXHIBITS G THROUGH M TO DECLARATION OF JAS DHILLON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 17545165) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

EXHIBITS N THROUGH U TO DECLARATION OF JAS DHILLON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CRANE CO.???S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

EXHIBITS N THROUGH U TO DECLARATION OF JAS DHILLON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 17545165) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

PROOF OF SERVICE - MSJ

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 17545165) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY (Fee:292.20)

ORDER

ORDER AND STIPULATION RE: RELEASE OF RECORDS

ORDER

ORDER SUBSTITUTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE NANCY HARRISON-HOLMES FOR DECEASED PLAINTIFF AND GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 12752194) FILED BY DEFENDANT BLACK BALL TRANSPORT, INC.

Request for Dismissal - as to defendant General Electric Company only,

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13998355) AS TO DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ALL CASES IN BRAYTON GROUP 426 FOR TRIAL

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ALL CASES IN BRAYTON GROUP 426 FOR TRIAL, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 22763471) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BENSTON, CALVIN HARRISON-HOLMES, NANCY AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF CALVIN BENSTON, DECEASED BENSTON, WILLIAM AS LEGAL HEIR OF CALVIN BENSTON, DECEASED MAAS, LORI AS LEGAL HEIR OF CALVIN BENSTON, DECEASED DENNIS, ANDREA AS LEGAL HEIR OF CALVIN BENSTON, DECEASED BENSTON, HEATHER AS LEGAL HEIR OF CALVIN BENSTON, DECEASED HEARING SET FOR JAN-08-2009 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206 (Fee:40.00)

DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER W. WOOD IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY?S MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND OR SEVER PLANT INSULATION, AND REFER CASE TO SPECIALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE OR MASTER TO DETERMINE IF PLAINTIFF HAS A PRIMA FACIE CLAIM AGAINST PLANT INSULATION AND EXHIBITS A THROUG

DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER W. WOOD IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANYS MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND OR SEVER PLANT INSULATION, AND REFER CASE TO SPECIALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE OR MASTER TO DETERMINE IF PLAINTIFF HAS A PRIMA FACIE CLAIM AGAINST PLANT INSULATION AND EXHIBITS A THROUGH F (TRANSACTION ID # 24188509) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

Request for Dismissal as to defendant Foster Wheeler, LLC only, with a mutual waiver of costs.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 52406461) AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

77 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 52406461) AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2011
  • REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $150.00 RE 20331 FOR TRANSACTION W2108227J007 (JURY FEES), PAYABLE TO BRAYTON, DOC #1903431707, WARRANT #38200475, DATED FEB-03-2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2010
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAY-27-2010. DISMISSAL FILED 5/10/10. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 31013529)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2010
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER CALENDAR JURY ASBESTOS OF JAN-25-2010 AND SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION ON MAY-27-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. MATTER REPORTED TO DEPT. 603 THAT THE CASE SETTLED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE EXAMINATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES REGARDING BUT FOR PROXIMATE CAUSE(TRANSACTION ID # 29842474) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BENSTON, CALVIN HARRISON-HOLMES, NANCY AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF CALVIN BENSTON, DECEASED BENSTON, WILLIAM AS LEGAL HEIR OF CALVIN BENSTON, DECEASED MAAS, LORI AS LEGAL HEIR OF CALVIN BENSTON, DECEASED DENNIS, ANDREA AS LEGAL HEIR OF CALVIN BENSTON, DECEASED BENSTON, HEATHER AS LEGAL HEIR OF CALVIN BENSTON, DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ALL REFERENCE AND TESTIMONY REGARDING OSTENSIBLE BACKGROUND OR AMBIENT EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS(TRANSACTION ID # 29842474) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BENSTON, CALVIN HARRISON-HOLMES, NANCY AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF CALVIN BENSTON, DECEASED BENSTON, WILLIAM AS LEGAL HEIR OF CALVIN BENSTON, DECEASED MAAS, LORI AS LEGAL HEIR OF CALVIN BENSTON, DECEASED DENNIS, ANDREA AS LEGAL HEIR OF CALVIN BENSTON, DECEASED BENSTON, HEATHER AS LEGAL HEIR OF CALVIN BENSTON, DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • MASTER JURY ASBESTOS CALENDAR SET FOR AUG-10-2009 CONTINUED TO MASTER CALENDAR JURY ASBESTOS ON JAN-25-2010 AT 11:15 AM IN 206 DUE TO UNAVAILABILITY OF COURTROOM. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2009
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR AUG-12-2009 - SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE NOT HELD. MATTER OFF CALENDAR. NEW TRIAL DATE OF 1/25/10. JUDGE ROBERTSON; CLERK: V. MU; MATTER WAS NOT REPORTED (502)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2009
  • ASBESTOS SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR AUG-11-2009 CONTINUED TO AUG-12-2009 AT 10:30 AM IN 502 (D-502).

    Read MoreRead Less
120 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2005
  • OBJECTION TO COURT COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE AT TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2005
  • DEMAND FOR JURY AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL (SIX TO EIGHT WEEKS) FILED BY DEFENDANT VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION (Fee:292.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY (Fee:292.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT IMO INDUSTRIES INC. (Fee:292.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2005
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2005
  • OBJECTION OF IMO INDUSTRIES INC. TO JUDGE PRO TEM AND/OR COMMISSIONER ASSIGNMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT IMO INDUSTRIES INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2005
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET,NEW FILING ASBESTOS LITIGATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF BENSTON, CALVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BENSTON, CALVIN AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B*P, AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B,B-I,C,H,I: DOES 1-8500 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-15-2006 (Fee:295.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PLANT INSULATION, LLC, DBA/AKA PLANT INSULATION COMPANY, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where THORPE INSULATION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where RAPID AMERICAN CORP is a litigant