This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 11/13/2023 at 01:01:42 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA TRUCKERS SAFETY ASSOCIATION VS. ALLIANCE GROUND INTERNATIONAL, LLC, A FOREIGN ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/29/2022 CALIFORNIA TRUCKERS SAFETY ASSOCIATION filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALLIANCE GROUND INTERNATIONAL, LLC, A FOREIGN. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1471

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA TRUCKERS SAFETY ASSOCIATION

Defendants

ALLIANCE GROUND INTERNATIONAL, LLC, A FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DOES 1 THROUGH 25, INCLUSIVE

ALLIANCE GROUND INTERNATIONAL, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOLEIMANPOUR, MATTHEW

Defendant Attorney

BRUCE, KATHRYN E.

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Subrogation Reimbursement

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100174326) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALIFORNIA TRUCKERS SAFETY ASSOCIATION AS TO DEFENDANT ALLIANCE GROUND INTERNATIONAL, LLC, A FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOES 1 THROUGH 25, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-01-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-28-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-09-2023

Civil Case Cover Sheet

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 100174326) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALIFORNIA TRUCKERS SAFETY ASSOCIATION

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Summons

SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 100174326) TO PLAINTIFF CALIFORNIA TRUCKERS SAFETY ASSOCIATION

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF FEB-01-2023 CONTINUED TO APR-05-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAY-16-2023 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE APR-05-2023 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Alliance Ground International, LLCs Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100193812) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLIANCE GROUND INTERNATIONAL, LLC

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100194667) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALIFORNIA TRUCKERS SAFETY ASSOCIATION SERVED SEP-20-2022, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT ALLIANCE GROUND INTERNATIONAL, LLC

Response to Order to Show Cause re: Failure to File Proof of Service o

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 100194952) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALIFORNIA TRUCKERS SAFETY ASSOCIATION

Order Setting Case Management Conference from Order to Show Cause

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR JUN-14-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR THE SUBMISSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS. THE MAY-16-2023 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Case Management Statement (Statements)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 210038216) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLIANCE GROUND INTERNATIONAL, LLC ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100201591) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALIFORNIA TRUCKERS SAFETY ASSOCIATION ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-14-2023 CONTINUED TO DEC-13-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS AND TRIAL SETTING. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Substitution of Attorney (Comment)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 210043865): BRUCE, KATHRYN E. SUBSTITUTED FOR SUTHERLAND, KEVIN R. AS ATTORNEY FOR ALLIANCE GROUND INTERNATIONAL, LLC

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/13/2023

HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 210043865): BRUCE, KATHRYN E. SUBSTITUTED FOR SUTHERLAND, KEVIN R. AS ATTORNEY FOR ALLIANCE GROUND INTERNATIONAL, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023

HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Jun-01-2023 Continued To Dec-13-23 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-14-2023 CONTINUED TO DEC-13-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS AND TRIAL SETTING. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100201591) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALIFORNIA TRUCKERS SAFETY ASSOCIATION ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 210038216) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLIANCE GROUND INTERNATIONAL, LLC ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023

HearingMatter(s): ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar May-04-2023 Continued To Jun-14-23 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR JUN-14-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR THE SUBMISSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS. THE MAY-16-2023 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2023

HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Mar-14-2023 Set For Order To Show Cause On May-16-23 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION ID # 100194952) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALIFORNIA TRUCKERS SAFETY ASSOCIATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
03/19/2023

FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: W2223319F009

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100193812) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLIANCE GROUND INTERNATIONAL, LLC; Fee: $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAY-16-2023 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE APR-05-2023 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2023

HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Jan-11-2023 Continued To Apr-05-23 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF FEB-01-2023 CONTINUED TO APR-05-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 100174326) TO PLAINTIFF CALIFORNIA TRUCKERS SAFETY ASSOCIATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2022

FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: C7122830F023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 100174326) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALIFORNIA TRUCKERS SAFETY ASSOCIATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100174326) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALIFORNIA TRUCKERS SAFETY ASSOCIATION AS TO DEFENDANT ALLIANCE GROUND INTERNATIONAL, LLC, A FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOES 1 THROUGH 25, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-01-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-28-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-09-2023; Fee: $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less