Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/14/2016 at 08:39:16 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA DENTAL ARTS VS. ANGELA BAYAT DR et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 CALIFORNIA DENTAL ARTS filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANGELA BAYAT DR. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3070

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA DENTAL ARTS

20421 Pacifica Drive

Cupertino, CA 95014

Defendants

BAYAT DR, ANGELA - DR. ANGELA BAYAT DDS

San Francisco, CA 94104

OGAWA DR, THOMAS

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (SERVICE FEE $35.00) SERVED MAR-19-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BAYAT DR, ANGELA - DR. ANGELA BAYAT DDS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (SERVICE FEE $72.50) SERVED MAR-14-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT OGAWA DR, THOMAS

Notice of Entry of Judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALIFORNIA DENTAL ARTS AS TO DEFENDANT OGAWA DR, THOMAS

THE CLAIM OF EXEMPTION SET FOR OCT-24-2013 IS DENIED. APPEARANCE BY

THE CLAIM OF EXEMPTION SET FOR OCT-24-2013 IS DENIED. " THE LEVYING OFFICER IS DIRECTED TO RELEASE ANY EARNINGS HELD TO THE JUDGMENT CREDITOR FOR PAYMENT ON THE JUDGMENT", PER JUDGE MITCHELL. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF, ONLY. PLAINTIFF WAS REPRESENTED BY REGINA TURNER--ACCOUNTING/COLLECTIONS. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506)

ORDER

ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL *GRANTED PER JPT JEAN MILEFF

Claim of Exemption Continued Order

THE HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION OF AUG-22-2013, PER REQUEST OF DEFENDANT, IS CONTINUED TO SEP-26-2013 AT 11:00 AM IN 506

JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM

THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CALIFORNIA DENTAL ARTS RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT BAYAT DR, ANGELA - DR. ANGELA BAYAT DDS $5,000.00 PRINCIPAL, $157.50 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $5,157.50 STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $5,000.00 FILED BY CALIFORNIA DENTAL ARTS AS TO DEFENDANT BAYAT DR, ANGELA - DR. ANGELA BAYAT DDS OGAWA DR, THOMAS ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAR-22-2013 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:50.00)

Claim of Exemption Continued Order

THE HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION OF SEP-26-2013 IS CONTINUED TO OCT-24-2013 AT 11:00 AM IN 506. "HEARING ON JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S CLAIM OF EXEMPTION CONTINUED 10/24/13", PER JUDGE MITCHELL. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF, ONLY. PLAINTIFF WAS REPRESENTED BY REGINA TURNER--BILLING/ACCOUNTS/COLLECTIONS. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2013
  • CORRESPONDENCE FROM CONTRA COSTA SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT (RE:ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION) AS TO DEFENDANT BAYAT DR, ANGELA - DR. ANGELA BAYAT DDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • THE CLAIM OF EXEMPTION SET FOR OCT-24-2013 IS DENIED. " THE LEVYING OFFICER IS DIRECTED TO RELEASE ANY EARNINGS HELD TO THE JUDGMENT CREDITOR FOR PAYMENT ON THE JUDGMENT", PER JUDGE MITCHELL. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF, ONLY. PLAINTIFF WAS REPRESENTED BY REGINA TURNER--ACCOUNTING/COLLECTIONS. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • DECLARATION OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CORPORATION PURSUANT TO CCP 116.540 (B)-(H) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALIFORNIA DENTAL ARTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2013
  • DECLARATION OF ANGELA BAYAT DR. FILED BY DEFENDANT BAYAT DR, ANGELA - DR. ANGELA BAYAT DDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • THE HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION OF SEP-26-2013 IS CONTINUED TO OCT-24-2013 AT 11:00 AM IN 506. "HEARING ON JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S CLAIM OF EXEMPTION CONTINUED 10/24/13", PER JUDGE MITCHELL. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF, ONLY. PLAINTIFF WAS REPRESENTED BY REGINA TURNER--BILLING/ACCOUNTS/COLLECTIONS. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • DECLARATION OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CORPORATION PURSUANT TO CCP 116.540 (B)-(H) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALIFORNIA DENTAL ARTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • RETURN MAIL RE: CLAIM OF EXEMPTION CONTINUED ORDER SENT TO DEFENDANT (ANGELA BAYAT DR) ENVELOPE MARKED: RETURN TO SENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • THE HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION OF AUG-22-2013, PER REQUEST OF DEFENDANT, IS CONTINUED TO SEP-26-2013 AT 11:00 AM IN 506

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL *GRANTED PER JPT JEAN MILEFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY DEFENDANT BAYAT DR, ANGELA - DR. ANGELA BAYAT DDS OGAWA DR, THOMAS (Fee:10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2013
  • DECLARATION OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CORPORATION PURSUANT TO CCP 116.540 (B)-(H) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAYAT DR, ANGELA - DR. ANGELA BAYAT DDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • DECLARATION OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CORPORATION PURSUANT TO CCP 116.540 (B)-(H) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALIFORNIA DENTAL ARTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALIFORNIA DENTAL ARTS AS TO DEFENDANT OGAWA DR, THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (SERVICE FEE $72.50) SERVED MAR-14-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT OGAWA DR, THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (SERVICE FEE $35.00) SERVED MAR-19-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BAYAT DR, ANGELA - DR. ANGELA BAYAT DDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • 2ND REQUEST TO AMEND PARTY NAME BEFORE HEARING RECEIVED VIA MAIL FROM PLAINTIFF, RETURNED WITH REJECT LETTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • REQUEST TO AMEND PARTY NAME BEFORE HEARING RECEIVED VIA MAIL FROM PLAINTIFF, RETURNED WITH REJECT LETTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • TRIAL RESET TO APR-11-2013 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT 506 TRIAL OF MAR-22-2013 IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • LETTER 2/13/2013 RECEIVED REQUESTING TO RESET HEARING DATE - DEFENDANT HAVE NOT BEEN SERVED. FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALIFORNIA DENTAL ARTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $5,000.00 FILED BY CALIFORNIA DENTAL ARTS AS TO DEFENDANT BAYAT DR, ANGELA - DR. ANGELA BAYAT DDS OGAWA DR, THOMAS ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAR-22-2013 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:50.00)

    Read MoreRead Less