This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/11/2016 at 11:33:27 (UTC).

CAHILL CONTRACTORS, INC. VS. A&B PAINTING, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 03/28/2012 CAHILL CONTRACTORS, INC filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against A B PAINTING, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9574

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Defendant

CHURCH STREET HOUSING ASSOCIATES A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CGC-12-519631)

Defendants and Cross Defendants

DELTA BAY WATERPROOFING

MILGARD MANUFACTURING, INC

A&B PAINTING, INC.

CHURCH STREET HOUSING ASSOCIATES A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CGC-12-519631)

A&B PAINTING, INC., (DEFENDANT FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CGC-12-519631)

ALCAL ARCADE CONTRACTORS, INC. (SUED HEREIN AS ALCAL ROOFING AND INSULATION)

DOES 1 TO 250, INCLUSIVE

DOES 1-250, INCLUSIVE

O'BRIEN MECHANICAL, INC. II ERRONEOUSLY SUED AND SERVED AS O'BRIEN MECHANICAL, INC. DEFENDANT FROM CASE NUMBER CGC-12-519631

JOHNSON WESTERN GUNITE COMPANY (DEFENDANT FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CGC--12-519631)

Cross Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

MILGARD MANUFACTURING INCORPORATED DBA MILGARD WINDOWS & DOORS

ALCAL ROOFING & INSULATION

LANDAVAZO BROS., INC.

O'BRIEN MECHANICAL, INC.

ADVANCED EXTERIOR SYSTEMS, INC.

KWAN WO IRONWORKS INC.

MAYER ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC.

SNC PLUMBING & FIRE PROTECTION (DEFENDANT FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CGC--12-519631)

DELTA BAY WATERPROOFING

A&B PAINTING, INC., (DEFENDANT FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CGC-12-519631)

ALCAL ARCADE CONTRACTORS, INC. (SUED HEREIN AS ALCAL ROOFING AND INSULATION)

JOHNSON WESTERN GUNITE COMPANY (DEFENDANT FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CGC--12-519631)

BAUMAN LANDSCAPE, INC.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

O'BRIEN MECHANICAL, INC. II ERRONEOUSLY SUED AND SERVED AS O'BRIEN MECHANICAL, INC. DEFENDANT FROM CASE NUMBER CGC-12-519631

Intervenor

FIRST SPECIALITY INSURANCE COMPANY ON BEHALF OF DEFT AND CROSS-DEFT ALL HEATING & SHEET METAL, INC.

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUNN, PATRICK P.

Attorney at COOLEY LLP

101 California Street,, 5Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-5800

Defendant Attorneys

PARK, JULYN M

Attorney at LOCKHART PARK, LLP

1230 Oakmead Parkway, Ste 306

Sunnyvale, CA 94085

LOCKHART, ROBERT DOUGLAS

Cross Defendant Attorneys

MARX, MICHAEL LEE

Attorney at JENKINS GOODMAN NEUMAN & HAMILTON LLP

417 Montgomery Street, 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

TAYLOR, PATRICK ELSWORTH

Attorney at BRADY, VORWERCK, RYDER & CASPINO

1855 Gateway Blvd, Ste 650

Concord, CA 94520

CROWLEY, DANIEL FRANCIS

Attorney at DANIEL CROWLEY & ASSOCIATES

37 Old Courthouse Square, Suite 200

Santa Rosa, CA 95404

MACMILLIN, JULIET

Attorney at STONE & ASSOCIATES

2125 Ygnacio Valley Road, Suite 101

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

Intervenor Attorneys

HARRIS, DAVID ANDREW

Attorney at HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL, LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94111

JESSICA, LASSERE

Attorney at HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, Ste. 200

San Francisco, CA 94111

Other Attorneys

DAY, MATTHEW R.

Porter Scott, 350 University Avenue, Ste 200

Sacramento, CA 95825

ROCHA, CRUZ

SCRIBNER, KRISTINE MICHELLE

Porter Scott, 350 University Ave Ste 200

Sacramento, CA 95825

EGAN, CHRISTOPHER M.

Porter | Scott, 350 University Ave, Suite 200

Sacramento, CA 95825

ALEXANDER, STEPHANIE

MCELROY, JULIE D

Attorney at JACOBSEN & MCELROY

2401 American River Drive, Suite 100

Sacramento, CA 95825

YEN, THOMAS

BELLAGAMBA, ROBERT ARTHUR

Attorney at CLAPP, MORONEY, BELLAGAMBA, VUCINICH, BEEMAN AND SCHELEY; A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

6130 Stoneridge Mall Road, Suite 275

Pleasanton, CA 94588

BURNS, THOMAS JOSEPH

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF THOMAS J. BURNS

5250 North Palm Avenue, Suite 201

Fresno, CA 93704

KENNEDY, KEVIN P.

Attorney at KENNEDY & SOUZA, APC

1230 Columbia Street, Suite 600

San Deigo, CA 92101

AGUILERA, ABEL ERIC

Attorney at THE AGUILERA LAW GROUP, APLC

650 Town Center Drive, Suite 100

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

15 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

CONSTRUCTION, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAHILL CONTRACTORS, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT A&B PAINTING, INC. ADVANCED EXTERIOR SYSTEMS, INC. ALCAL ROOFING & INSULATION ALL HEATING & SHEET METAL, INC. DELTA BAY WATERPROOFING FRAMCO CONSTRUCTION COMPANY JOHNSON WESTERN GRANITE COMPANY KWAN WO IRONWORKS INC. LANDAVAZO BROS., INC. MAYER ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC. MILGARD MANUFACTURING INCORPORATED DBA MILGARD WINDOWS & DOORS NORTH BAY DRYWALL & PLASTERING, INC. O'BRIEN MECHANICAL, INC. SHOOTER & BUTTS, INC. DOES 1 TO 250, INCLUSIVE SNC PLUMBING & FIRE PROTECTION (DEFENDANT FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CGC--12-519631) SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-29-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-29-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-14-2012 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:960.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAHILL CONTRACTORS, INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAHILL CONTRACTORS, INC. SERVED MAR-30-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ALCAL ROOFING & INSULATION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAHILL CONTRACTORS, INC. SERVED MAR-30-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT FRAMCO CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAHILL CONTRACTORS, INC. SERVED MAR-30-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT NORTH BAY DRYWALL & PLASTERING, INC.

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SHOOTER & BUTTS, INC. (Fee:960.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAHILL CONTRACTORS, INC. SERVED APR-07-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ALL HEATING & SHEET METAL, INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAHILL CONTRACTORS, INC. SERVED APR-05-2012, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT A&B PAINTING, INC.

Declaration of JuLyn M. Park in Response to OSC re Dismissal

DECLARATION OF JULYN M. PARK IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE DISMISSAL (TRANSACTION ID # 58694944) FILED BY DEFENDANT MILGARD MANUFACTURING, INC

DECLARATION OF LORENA MATEI IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISM

DECLARATION OF LORENA MATEI IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (TRANSACTION ID # 58695811) FILED BY DEFENDANT NORTH BAY DRYWALL & PLASTERING, INC.

Declaration of David A. Harris Regarding Order to Show Cause Re Dismis

DECLARATION OF DAVID A. HARRIS REGARDING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL; (TRANSACTION ID # 58709860) FILED BY INTERVENOR ONEBEACON INSURANCE COMPANY, TRANSFEREE OF PENNSYLVANIA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (ON BEHALF OF ITS INSURED, DEFENDANT/CROSS-DEFENDANT ALL HEATING & SHEET METAL, INC., A SUSPENDED CORPORATION)

Continued Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAR-15-2016 CONTINUED TO JUN-21-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Supplemental Declaration of Abigail Pringle in Support of Response to

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ABIGAIL PRINGLE IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (TRANSACTION ID # 58718160) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHURCH STREET HOUSING ASSOCIATES A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CGC-12-519631)

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION BY DEFENDANT MILGARD MANUFACTURING INC.

Request for Dismissal as to North Bay Drywall and Plastering, Inc.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT EACH PARTY TO BEAR OWN FEES AND COSTS(TRANSACTION ID # 58721987) AS TO DEFENDANT NORTH BAY DRYWALL & PLASTERING, INC.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal as to North Bay Drywall and Plastering, I

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58728974) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHURCH STREET HOUSING ASSOCIATES A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CGC-12-519631)

Notice of Entry of Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 58737754) FILED BY DEFENDANT MILGARD MANUFACTURING, INC

482 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 58737754) FILED BY DEFENDANT MILGARD MANUFACTURING, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58728974) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHURCH STREET HOUSING ASSOCIATES A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CGC-12-519631)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT EACH PARTY TO BEAR OWN FEES AND COSTS(TRANSACTION ID # 58721987) AS TO DEFENDANT NORTH BAY DRYWALL & PLASTERING, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION BY DEFENDANT MILGARD MANUFACTURING INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ABIGAIL PRINGLE IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (TRANSACTION ID # 58718160) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHURCH STREET HOUSING ASSOCIATES A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CGC-12-519631)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAR-15-2016 CONTINUED TO JUN-21-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF DAVID A. HARRIS REGARDING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL; (TRANSACTION ID # 58709860) FILED BY INTERVENOR ONEBEACON INSURANCE COMPANY, TRANSFEREE OF PENNSYLVANIA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (ON BEHALF OF ITS INSURED, DEFENDANT/CROSS-DEFENDANT ALL HEATING & SHEET METAL, INC., A SUSPENDED CORPORATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF LORENA MATEI IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (TRANSACTION ID # 58695811) FILED BY DEFENDANT NORTH BAY DRYWALL & PLASTERING, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF JULYN M. PARK IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE DISMISSAL (TRANSACTION ID # 58694944) FILED BY DEFENDANT MILGARD MANUFACTURING, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF ANGELA ZANIN-WOG AS TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (CRC 3.1385) (TRANSACTION ID # 58690365) FILED BY INTERVENOR ST. PAUL FIRE & MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
765 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAHILL CONTRACTORS, INC. SERVED APR-02-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT JOHNSON WESTERN GRANITE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAHILL CONTRACTORS, INC. SERVED APR-05-2012, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT A&B PAINTING, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAHILL CONTRACTORS, INC. SERVED APR-07-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ALL HEATING & SHEET METAL, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SHOOTER & BUTTS, INC. (Fee:960.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAHILL CONTRACTORS, INC. SERVED MAR-30-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT NORTH BAY DRYWALL & PLASTERING, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAHILL CONTRACTORS, INC. SERVED MAR-30-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT FRAMCO CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAHILL CONTRACTORS, INC. SERVED MAR-30-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ALCAL ROOFING & INSULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAHILL CONTRACTORS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CONSTRUCTION, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CAHILL CONTRACTORS, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT A&B PAINTING, INC. ADVANCED EXTERIOR SYSTEMS, INC. ALCAL ROOFING & INSULATION ALL HEATING & SHEET METAL, INC. DELTA BAY WATERPROOFING FRAMCO CONSTRUCTION COMPANY JOHNSON WESTERN GRANITE COMPANY KWAN WO IRONWORKS INC. LANDAVAZO BROS., INC. MAYER ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC. MILGARD MANUFACTURING INCORPORATED DBA MILGARD WINDOWS & DOORS NORTH BAY DRYWALL & PLASTERING, INC. O'BRIEN MECHANICAL, INC. SHOOTER & BUTTS, INC. DOES 1 TO 250, INCLUSIVE SNC PLUMBING & FIRE PROTECTION (DEFENDANT FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #CGC--12-519631) SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-29-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-29-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-14-2012 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:960.00)

    Read MoreRead Less