Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:49:46 (UTC).

CACH, LLC VS. CHARLES E HARRIS et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 CACH, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHARLES E HARRIS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8474

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH, LLC

Defendants

HARRIS, CHARLES E AN INDIVIDUAL

San Francisco, CA 94121

DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDARICH, CHRIS D

Attorney at MANDARICH LAW GROUP, LLP

9200 Oakdlae Avenue, Suite 601

Chatsworth, CA 91311

 

Court Documents

GENERAL DENIAL

GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT HARRIS, CHARLES E AN INDIVIDUAL (Fee:IFP)

COURT JUDGMENT - GENERAL

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CACH, LLC RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT HARRIS, CHARLES E AN INDIVIDUAL $6,285.22 PRINCIPAL, $975.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $285.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $7,545.22, SEE SCANNED DOC

Notice of Change of Address

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 15035058) FILED BY ATTORNEY MANDARICH, CHRIS D

Order Setting Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR SEP-25-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF IN LIEU OF DIRECT TESTIMONY AND AUTHENTICATING DOCUMENTARY EVIDENCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF CACH, LLC

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR JAN-21-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON SEP-25-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

RULING ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES

ORDER DENYING WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 AS TO DEFENDANT HARRIS, CHARLES E AN INDIVIDUAL

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY PLAINTIFF CACH, LLC

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CACH, LLC ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 2.0 HOURS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CACH, LLC SERVED FEB-27-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT HARRIS, CHARLES E AN INDIVIDUAL

COMPLAINT

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT AND DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED BY PLAINTIFF CACH, LLC AS TO DEFENDANT HARRIS, CHARLES E AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-05-2013 (Fee:225.00)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 15035058) FILED BY ATTORNEY MANDARICH, CHRIS D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CACH, LLC RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT HARRIS, CHARLES E AN INDIVIDUAL $6,285.22 PRINCIPAL, $975.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $285.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $7,545.22, SEE SCANNED DOC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY PLAINTIFF CACH, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • SHORT CAUSE TRIAL ON JAN-21-2014 OFF CALENDAR - JUDGMENT ENTERED. PROCEEDINGS REPORTED BY: MITCH LYON , CSR#6840. (514)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • MINI MINUTES FOR JAN-21-2014 10:14 AM FOR DEPT 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY PLAINTIFF CACH, LLC (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • MASTER COURT CALENDAR OF JAN-21-2014 ASSIGNED TO SHORT CAUSE TRIAL CALENDAR ON JAN-21-2014 AT 10:14 AM IN DEPT. 514, HARRY DORFMAN, FOR PROVE-UP HEARING. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF. NO OTHER APPEARANCES ON THIS MATTER. JUDGE: CYNTHIA M. LEE; CLERK: EBURA; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF IN LIEU OF DIRECT TESTIMONY AND AUTHENTICATING DOCUMENTARY EVIDENCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF CACH, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CACH, LLC ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 2.0 HOURS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR JAN-21-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON SEP-25-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR SEP-25-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2013
  • REMOVED FROM DENIED FEE WAIVER PAID CALENDAR: FEES PAID BY CHARLES HARRIS ON 5/15/13. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • PAYMENT OF WAIVED FEES (CONFIDENTIAL) PAID BY DEFENDANT HARRIS, CHARLES E AN INDIVIDUAL (Fee:225.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DENYING WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 AS TO DEFENDANT HARRIS, CHARLES E AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • MASTER CALENDAR MOTION ON MAY-08-2013 IN DEPT. 206, HEARING ON APPLICANT/DEFENDANT CHARLES HARRIS' WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS. APPEARANCE BY APPLICANT. THE COURT DENIED THE APPLICATION IN WHOLE. ORDER SIGNED, AND ENDORSED-FILED COPY MAILED TO APPLICANT. JUDGE: CYNTHIA M. LEE; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT HARRIS, CHARLES E AN INDIVIDUAL (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • APPLICATION PENDING FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARRIS, CHARLES E AN INDIVIDUAL HEARING SET FOR MAY-08-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 206

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CACH, LLC SERVED FEB-27-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT HARRIS, CHARLES E AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT AND DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED BY PLAINTIFF CACH, LLC AS TO DEFENDANT HARRIS, CHARLES E AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-05-2013 (Fee:225.00)

    Read MoreRead Less