Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:50:10 (UTC).

BRYAN ZIMMERMAN et al VS. WONDERBAR LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 BRYAN ZIMMERMAN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against WONDERBAR LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8480

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BENETT, TEDDI

JUSTIN, BRIAN

LEEB, ANNA

SCHIARETTI, JOSHUA

SOSA, AUDRAY

YEE, LAUREN

ZIMMERMAN, BRYAN

Defendants

SIEGAN, JAY

WONDERBAR LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA RED DEVIL LOUNGE

DOES 1 THRU 10, INCL.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOMMERS, STEPHEN A.

Attorney at SOMMERS EMPLOYMENT LAW GROUP, P.C.

201 Mission Street, 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Defendant Attorney

REESE, KEVIN D

Attorney at OLGETREE, DEAKINS, NASH, SMOAK & STEWART, P.C.STEUART TOWER, STE 1300

One Market Plaza

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZIMMERMAN, BRYAN SCHIARETTI, JOSHUA LEEB, ANNA BENETT, TEDDI JUSTIN, BRIAN YEE, LAUREN SOSA, AUDRAY AS TO DEFENDANT WONDERBAR LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA RED DEVIL LOUNGE SIEGAN, JAY DOES 1 THRU 10, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-10-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2013 (Fee:450.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WONDERBAR LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA RED DEVIL LOUNGE SIEGAN, JAY (Fee:900.00)

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

STATEMENT OF NON OPPOS. TO PLTF'S MTN FOR LEAVE TO AMEND FILED BY DEFENDANT WONDERBAR LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA RED DEVIL LOUNGE SIEGAN, JAY

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION TO DEFTS MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZIMMERMAN, BRYAN SCHIARETTI, JOSHUA LEEB, ANNA BENETT, TEDDI JUSTIN, BRIAN YEE, LAUREN SOSA, AUDRAY

DECLARATION

DECLARATION OF ASHLEY A. ERNST FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZIMMERMAN, BRYAN SCHIARETTI, JOSHUA LEEB, ANNA BENETT, TEDDI JUSTIN, BRIAN YEE, LAUREN SOSA, AUDRAY

ORDER

ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER RE:PLAINTIFFS' PROPOUNDED DISCOVERY AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

ORDER

ORDER AND STIPULATION FOR MOTION TO BE HEARD BY A MEMBER OF THE CA BAR SERVING AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZIMMERMAN, BRYAN

Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR FEB-23-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. THE JUL-10-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Dismissing Case Pursuant to CRC 3.1385

CASE DISMISSED BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING FEB-23-2016 AT 10:30 AM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE DISMISSED BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING FEB-23-2016 AT 10:30 AM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • MINI MINUTES FOR FEB-23-2016 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR FEB-23-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. THE JUL-10-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZIMMERMAN, BRYAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER AND STIPULATION FOR MOTION TO BE HEARD BY A MEMBER OF THE CA BAR SERVING AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • DISCOVERY 302, WONDERBAR LLC AND JAY SIEGAN'S MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S PROPOUNDED DISCOVERY AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS - DUPLICATE ENTRY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • DISCOVERY 302, DEFENDANTS WONDERBAR LLC AND JAY SIEGAN'S MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S PROPOUNDED DISCOVERY IS GRANTED IN PART. EACH PARTY'S REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IS DENIED. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS.) ORDER SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE PRO TEM: ERNEST HALPERIN; CLERK L. FONG; NOT REPORTED. (302/JPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR APR-16-2013 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR APR-16-2013 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER RE:PLAINTIFFS' PROPOUNDED DISCOVERY AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2013
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT WONDERBAR LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA RED DEVIL LOUNGE SIEGAN, JAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • NOTICE OF MOITON AND MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER RE PLTF'S PROPOUNDED DISCOVERY AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS, PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT WONDERBAR LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA RED DEVIL LOUNGE SIEGAN, JAY HEARING SET FOR APR-16-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZIMMERMAN, BRYAN SCHIARETTI, JOSHUA LEEB, ANNA BENETT, TEDDI JUSTIN, BRIAN YEE, LAUREN SOSA, AUDRAY (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE 1ST AMENDED COMPLT, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZIMMERMAN, BRYAN SCHIARETTI, JOSHUA LEEB, ANNA BENETT, TEDDI JUSTIN, BRIAN YEE, LAUREN SOSA, AUDRAY HEARING SET FOR APR-12-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZIMMERMAN, BRYAN SCHIARETTI, JOSHUA LEEB, ANNA BENETT, TEDDI JUSTIN, BRIAN YEE, LAUREN SOSA, AUDRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZIMMERMAN, BRYAN SCHIARETTI, JOSHUA LEEB, ANNA BENETT, TEDDI JUSTIN, BRIAN YEE, LAUREN SOSA, AUDRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR TRO FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZIMMERMAN, BRYAN SCHIARETTI, JOSHUA LEEB, ANNA BENETT, TEDDI JUSTIN, BRIAN YEE, LAUREN SOSA, AUDRAY (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WONDERBAR LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA RED DEVIL LOUNGE SIEGAN, JAY (Fee:900.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZIMMERMAN, BRYAN SCHIARETTI, JOSHUA LEEB, ANNA BENETT, TEDDI JUSTIN, BRIAN YEE, LAUREN SOSA, AUDRAY AS TO DEFENDANT WONDERBAR LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA RED DEVIL LOUNGE SIEGAN, JAY DOES 1 THRU 10, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-10-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less