This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 05/12/2023 at 12:08:51 (UTC).

BRYAN RISSE VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 08/31/2009 BRYAN RISSE filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS BP AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HAROLD E. KAHN and JAMES J. MCBRIDE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5329

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

HAROLD E. KAHN

JAMES J. MCBRIDE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RISSE, BRYAN

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 8500

SILVER LINE PRODUCTS, INC.

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

EMSCO ASBESTOS COMPANY

BUCYRUS INTERNATIONAL, INC.

PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

ADVOCATE MINES LIMITED

DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION

GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC SUED AS AND FKA GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

DANA COMPANIES, LLC (FKA DANA CORPORATION)

STUART-WESTERN, INC.

BRASSBESTOS BRAKE LINING COMPANY

T.W. SMITH COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

U.S. SPRING & BUMPER COMPANY

AMERICAN CONFERENCE OF GOVERNMENTAL INDUSTRIAL HYGIENIST, INC.

CAMELLIA VALLEY SUPPLY, INC.

MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC.

STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC.

LEAR SIEGLER DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS CORP.

46 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Defendant Attorneys

BASSI, MARTE JOSEPH

GRANIEZ, JOHN A.

BIDERMAN, DAVID T.

BLACKARD, EUGENE CHARLES

Other Attorneys

POND, FRANK D

JACKSON, GABRIEL ANNE

FONG, CAMILLE KAMEE

OBERG, LISA L

KAHN, RUTH DEBRA

DUFFY, JOSEPH

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

LEE, BARRY WILLIAM

PATERSON, NAIRI

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

KUPPENBENDER, JAMES C

JUDIN, JENNIFER

SHARP, GARY D

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED (TRANSACTION ID # 33388723) AS TO DEFENDANT BLACK SWAN MANUFACTURING CO.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 27887282) FILED BY DEFENDANT FAMILIAN CORPORATION

Metropolitan Life Insurance Companys Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint for Personal Injury - Asbestos

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27695430) FILED BY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Fee:370.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 28671600), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF RISSE, BRYAN SERVED OCT-05-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CAMELLIA VALLEY SUPPLY, INC.

OBJECTION TO JUDGE PRO TEMPORE ACTING AS JUDGE AT TRIAL

OBJECTION TO JUDGE PRO TEMPORE ACTING AS JUDGE AT TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 32080749) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENUINE PARTS COMPANY

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, CERTAINTEED CORPORATION, TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR PERSONAL INJURY

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27525020) FILED BY DEFENDANT CERTAINTEED CORPORATION (Fee:370.00)

Answer to Complaint-Asbestos

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27817666) FILED BY DEFENDANT T.W. SMITH COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Fee:370.00)

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED (TRANSACTION ID # 28671600) AS TO DEFENDANT CAMELLIA VALLEY SUPPLY, INC.

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD. TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27989507) FILED BY DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD. (Fee:370.00)

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 44294360) AS TO DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2011
  • HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR JURY ASBESTOS Off Calendar Apr-28-2011 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 220; Judge Name: HAROLD E. KAHN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • DocketREMOVED FROM MASTER JURY ASBESTOS CALENDAR SET FOR MAY-16-2011. DISMISSAL FILED 2/1/11. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2011
  • DocketMINI-MINUTES FOR APR-19-2011 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 220

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2011
  • DocketASBESTOS LAW AND MOTION, 220, DEFENDANT DAP, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: THE CORRECT HEARING DATE WAS MAY 5, BUT THE MOTION IS OFF CALENDAR AT THE MOVING PARTY'S REQUEST. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN, MATTER NOT REPORTED. (220)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2011
  • HearingMatter(s): MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Off Calendar Apr-19-2011 Off Calendar MINI MINUTES: No appearance and tentative ruling adopted: Defendant DAP, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment: the correct hearing date was May 5, but the motion is off calendar at the moving party's request. Judge: Harold Kahn, Matter not reported = (220\/HEK); Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 220; Judge Name: HAROLD E. KAHN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2011
  • DocketMINI-MINUTES FOR APR-14-2011 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 220

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2011
  • DocketASBESTOS LAW AND MOTION, 220, DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS LTD.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS OFF CALENDAR. THE COMPLAINT WAS DISMISSED ON FEBRUARY 1. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN, REPORTER: LAVENA WARD, CSR # 7077

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2011
  • HearingMatter(s): MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Off Calendar Apr-07-2011 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 220; Judge Name: HAROLD E. KAHN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2011
  • HearingMatter(s): MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Off Calendar Apr-14-2011 Off Calendar MINI MINUTES: No appearance and tentative ruling adopted: Defendant Calaveras Asbestos Ltd.'s motion for summary judgment is off calendar. The complaint was dismissed on February 1. Judge: Harold Kahn, Reporter: LaVena Ward, CSR # 7077 = (220\/HEK); Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 220; Judge Name: HAROLD E. KAHN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
99 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27689806) FILED BY DEFENDANT DAP, INC.; Fee: $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27660243) FILED BY DEFENDANT ITT CORPORATION FKA ITT INDUSTRIES, INC.; Fee: $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $370; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: R0209A20F004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27607152) FILED BY DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.; Fee: $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2009
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $370; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: B7409A15F004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27525020) FILED BY DEFENDANT CERTAINTEED CORPORATION; Fee: $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2009
  • DocketPRELIMINARY FACT SHEET/NEW FILING/ASBESTOS LITIGATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF RISSE, BRYAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2009
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $370; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: W1009831F034

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF RISSE, BRYAN AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I, J, N ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS DOES 1 TO 8500 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-19-2010; Fee: $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less