This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 10/07/2019 at 01:35:33 (UTC).

BRUNILDA MCGRATH VS. CREATIVE ARTS AGENCY ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/03/2019 BRUNILDA MCGRATH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CREATIVE ARTS AGENCY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRETT L. WONG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9764

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

GARRETT L. WONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCGRATH, BRUNILDA

Defendants

CAD INDUSTRIES A CORPORATION

GOLDEN GATE WARRIORS, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

JP MORGAN CHASE & CO., A CORPORATION

MOOR & SOUTH PIER MANAGEMENT CO, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

CREATIVE ARTS AGENCY A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HALAVANAU, GENE V.

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF GENE HALAVANAU

150 Post Street, Suite 600

San Francisco, CA 94108

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MCGRATH, BRUNILDA AS TO DEFENDANT CREATIVE ARTS AGENCY A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY CAD INDUSTRIES A CORPORATION MOOR & SOUTH PIER MANAGEMENT CO, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP GOLDEN GATE WARRIORS, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY JP MORGAN CHASE & CO., A CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-04-2020 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-02-2019 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-10-2020

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $600; Payment Type : CREDIT CARD ; Receipt Number : R7719A03F005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DEMAND FOR JURY FILED BY PLAINTIFF MCGRATH, BRUNILDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MCGRATH, BRUNILDA AS TO DEFENDANT CREATIVE ARTS AGENCY A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY CAD INDUSTRIES A CORPORATION MOOR & SOUTH PIER MANAGEMENT CO, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP GOLDEN GATE WARRIORS, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY JP MORGAN CHASE & CO., A CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-04-2020 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-02-2019 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-10-2020 (Fee:$600.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******9764
Case Title:BRUNILDA MCGRATH VS. CREATIVE ARTS AGENCY ET AL
Court Date:MAR-10-2022 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Defendants The Golden State Warriorss And Jp Morgan Chases Notice Of Motion And Motion For Determination Of Good Faith Settlement (Motions)
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Thursday, March 10, 2022, Line 5DEFENDANTS GOLDEN STATE WARRIORS, LLC, and JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.'S Motion For Determination Of Good Faith Settlement.Golden State Warriors LLC and JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s unopposed motion for determination of good faith settlement is granted.Effective Monday, January 3, 2022, for the 9:30 a.m. Law & Motion calendar, all attorneys and parties may appear in Department 302 remotely. Remote hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear remotely at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link, or dial the corresponding phone number.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The text of the email shall include the name and contact information, including email address, of the attorney or party who will appear at the hearing. Counsel for the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the tentative ruling is not contested. = (302/RBU)


Case Number:*******9764
Case Title:BRUNILDA MCGRATH VS. CREATIVE ARTS AGENCY ET AL
Court Date:MAR-09-2022 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Motion For Determination Of Good Faith Settlement
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Wednesday, March 9, 2022, Line 5DEFENDANTS GOLDEN STATE WARRIORS, LLC. and JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.'S, Motion For Determination Of Good Faith Settlement.Off calendar per notice of withdrawal.Effective Monday, January 3, 2022, for the 9:30 a.m. Law & Motion calendar, all attorneys and parties may appear in Department 302 remotely. Remote hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear remotely at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link, or dial the corresponding phone number.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The text of the email shall include the name and contact information, including email address, of the attorney or party who will appear at the hearing. = (302/RBU)


Case Number:*******9764
Case Title:BRUNILDA MCGRATH VS. CREATIVE ARTS AGENCY ET AL
Court Date:FEB-10-2022 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Motion To Compel Caa Sports Llcs Responses To Form Interrogatories, Set One, Special Interrogatories, Set One And Two, And Request For Production Of Documents, Set One, With Request For Sanctions
Rulings:Discovery Calendar for Thursday, February 10, 2022, Line 2,PLAINTIFF BRUNILDA MCGRATH's Motion To Compel CAA Sports LLC's Responses To Form Interrogatories, Set One, Special Interrogatories, Set One And Two, And Request For Production Of Documents, Set One, With Request For Sanctions:Pro Tem Judge William Lynn, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling:Plaintiff's motion to compel responses to Form Interrogatories, Set One, Special Interrogatories, Sets One and Two, and Request for Production of Documents, Set One, from Defendant CAA Sports LLC is granted as requested - no opposition filed. CAA Sports LLC is ordered to provide code-compliant responses to Plaintiff's Form Interrogatories, Set One, Special Interrogatories, Sets One and Two, and Request for Production of Documents, Set One, without objections, within 30 days of service of notice of entry of the order. Plaintiff's request for sanctions is also granted. Defendant CAA Sports LLC is ordered to pay sanctions in the amount of $1,500 to Plaintiff within 30 days of service of notice of entry of the order. For the 9:00a.m. Discovery calendar, all attorneys and parties are required to appear remotely. Hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link (DISCOVERY, DEPT 301 @ 9:00AM), or dial the corresponding phone number.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to williamclynn@gmail.com with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. If parties have arranged for a court reporter to appear, please include the following in your email: (1) ensure that they are California Certified Shorthand Reporters; (2) the reporter's full contact information [name, CSR number, personal work email, and phone number]. If the reporter is not a California Certified Shorthand Reporter, the transcript cannot be certified for use in California courts. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem hearing the motion and the Pro Tem will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must e-mail it to the Judge Pro Tem. =(302/JPT)


Case Number:*******9764
Case Title:BRUNILDA MCGRATH VS. CREATIVE ARTS AGENCY ET AL
Court Date:MAR-30-2021 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Moor And South Pier Management Co.S Notice Of Motion And Motion For Leave To File Cross-Complaint; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities; Declaration Of Barbara E. Kennedy In Support Thereof
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Tuesday, March 30, 2021, Line 7, DEFENDANT MOOR & SOUTH PIER MANAGEMENT CO.'S Notice Of Motion And Motion For Leave To File Cross-Complaint:Grant. No opposition filed. If any party contests the tentative ruling, the motion will be continued to April 14, 2021 for further hearing. As a result of the COVID-19 emergency, all attorneys and parties are required to appear remotely. Hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link, or dial the corresponding phone number.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The text of the email shall include the name and contact information, including email address, of the attorney or party who will appear at the hearing. If the tentative is uncontested, then the movant is required to prepare a proposed order granting the motion and must email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing. =(302/EPS)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase & Co., is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Halavanau, Gene V.