This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 09/09/2021 at 21:46:24 (UTC).

BROADBAND ITV, INC VS. ORRICK, HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE LLP ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 BROADBAND ITV, INC filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against ORRICK, HERRINGTON SUTCLIFFE LLP. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAMUEL K. FENG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4526

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

SAMUEL K. FENG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROADBAND ITV, INC

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 2

ORRICK, HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DENLINGER, JUSTIN D

Attorney at PARKER MILLS, LLP

800 W. 6Th Street, Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

PARKER, DAVID B

Attorney at PARKER MILLS, LLP

800 W. 6Th Street, Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant Attorneys

ALLEN, SYDNEY

Attorney at LONG & LEVIT LLP

465 California Street, Suite 500

San Francisco, CA 94104

MCMONIGLE, JOSEPH PATRICK

Attorney at LONG & LEVIT LLP.

465 California Street, Ste 500

San Francisco, CA 94104

SULLIVAN, JOHN B.

Attorney at LONG &LEVIT LLP

465 California St. Ste 500

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE, COMPLAINT TRANSFERRED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY (21STCV16407) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BROADBAND ITV, INC AS TO DEFENDANT ORRICK, HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE LLP DOES 1 TO 2 NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-09-2022 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-08-2021 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-18-2022

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

REGISTER OF ACTIONS - TRANSFERRED FROM LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

REGISTER OF ACTIONS - TRANSFERRED FROM LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT (CASE NO. 21STCV16407) - FILINGS FROM APRIL 30, 2021 THROUGH JULY 19, 2021 - SEE SCANNED DOCUMENTS

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON MAY 20, 2021 FILED BY PLAINTIFF BROADBAND ITV, INC AS TO DEFENDANT ORRICK, HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE LLP

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE: BUSINESS/MAIL ON MAY 6, 2021 FILED BY PLAINTIFF BROADBAND ITV, INC AS TO DEFENDANT ORRICK, HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE LLP

ORDER

ORDER - STIPULATION TO CHANGE VENUE AND ORDER

Notice of Filing and Transmittal

NOTICE OF FILING AND TRANSMITTAL (TRANSFERRED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY - CASE NO. 21STCV16407)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AND TRANSMITTAL (TRANSFERRED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY - CASE NO. 21STCV16407)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - STIPULATION TO CHANGE VENUE AND ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE: BUSINESS/MAIL ON MAY 6, 2021 FILED BY PLAINTIFF BROADBAND ITV, INC AS TO DEFENDANT ORRICK, HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON MAY 20, 2021 FILED BY PLAINTIFF BROADBAND ITV, INC AS TO DEFENDANT ORRICK, HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREGISTER OF ACTIONS - TRANSFERRED FROM LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT (CASE NO. 21STCV16407) - FILINGS FROM APRIL 30, 2021 THROUGH JULY 19, 2021 - SEE SCANNED DOCUMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketFILING FEES OF $435 WAS SPLIT EQUALLY/PAID BY PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $435; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : S0221909F001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE, COMPLAINT TRANSFERRED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY (21STCV16407) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BROADBAND ITV, INC AS TO DEFENDANT ORRICK, HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE LLP DOES 1 TO 2 NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-09-2022 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-08-2021 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-18-2022 (Fee:$435.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Broadband ITV, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ORRICK HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph P. McMonigle

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SULLIVAN, JOHN BRENDAN