This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 04:44:29 (UTC).

BRIANNA MANNION et al VS. JOHN E. WAI et al

Case Summary

On 01/16/2013 BRIANNA MANNION filed a Property - Wrongful Eviction lawsuit against JOHN E WAI. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8021

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Wrongful Eviction

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LARIMER, TRAVIS

MANNION, BRIANNA

Defendants

MEDEIROS, SOFIA SUCCESSOR CO-TRUSTEE OF THE REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST OF ATHENA TSOUGARAKIS

NAGER, PERRI SUCCESSOR CO-TRUSTEE OF THE REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST OF ATHENA TSOUGARAKIS

TSOUGARAKIS, ATHENA

WAI, JOHN E

WAI, JOHN E.

WAI,, JOHN E INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE JOHN E WAI 1981 LIVING TRUST

DOES 1 TO 50

Other

HARKINS, WILLIAM

San Francisco, CA 94102

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WIEDERHOLD, MARY CATHERINE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MARY CATHERINE WIEDERHOLD

1458 Sutter Street

San Francisco, CA 94109

Defendant Attorneys

SINGER, JR., EDWARD C.

HERRIN, MICHON

Attorney at BLEDSOE, CATHCART, DIESTEL, PEDERSEN & TREPPA LLP

601 California St Ste 1600

San Francisco, CA 94108

ANGSTADT TODD A

ANGSTADT, TODD A

Attorney at PHILLIPS, SPALLAS & ANGSTADT LLP

505 Sansome St Ste 600

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

WRONGFUL EVICTION, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MANNION, BRIANNA LARIMER, TRAVIS AS TO DEFENDANT WAI, JOHN E. WAI, JOHN E MEDEIROS, SOFIA SUCCESSOR CO-TRUSTEE OF THE REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST OF ATHENA TSOUGARAKIS NAGER, PERRI SUCCESSOR CO-TRUSTEE OF THE REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST OF ATHENA TSOUGARAKIS TSOUGARAKIS, ATHENA DOES 1 TO 50 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-19-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-18-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-04-2013 (Fee:450.00)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WAI,, JOHN E INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE JOHN E WAI 1981 LIVING TRUST (Fee:450.00)

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MANNION, BRIANNA LARIMER, TRAVIS AS TO DEFENDANT WAI, JOHN E MEDEIROS, SOFIA SUCCESSOR CO-TRUSTEE OF THE REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST OF ATHENA TSOUGARAKIS NAGER, PERRI SUCCESSOR CO-TRUSTEE OF THE REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST OF ATHENA TSOUGARAKIS TSOUGARAKIS, ATHENA WAI,, JOHN E INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE JOHN E WAI 1981 LIVING TRUST

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: HERRIN, MICHON SUBSTITUTED FOR SINGER, JR., EDWARD C. AS ATTORNEY FOR NAGER, PERRI SUCCESSOR CO-TRUSTEE OF THE REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST OF ATHENA TSOUGARAKIS

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY ANGSTADT, TODD A

MINUTE ORDER RE:

MINUTE ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SPECIAL INTERROGATORY NUMBER ONE

ORDER

ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS DESCRIBED IN DEPOSITION TO WILLIAM HARKINS

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO PLAINTIFF MANNION, BRIANNA LARIMER, TRAVIS

Case Ordered Off Calendar

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF DEC-16-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MANNION, BRIANNA LARIMER, TRAVIS SERVED JAN-19-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT MEDEIROS, SOFIA SUCCESSOR CO-TRUSTEE OF THE REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST OF ATHENA TSOUGARAKIS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MANNION, BRIANNA LARIMER, TRAVIS SERVED JAN-19-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT TSOUGARAKIS, ATHENA

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT WAI,, JOHN E INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE JOHN E WAI 1981 LIVING TRUST JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

ORDER

ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF BRADLEY J. JAMESON IN SUPPORT OF OPPOS TO PLTFF'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA FILED BY DEFENDANT WAI,, JOHN E INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE JOHN E WAI 1981 LIVING TRUST

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

MTN FOR OSC RE CONTEMPT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MANNION, BRIANNA LARIMER, TRAVIS HEARING SET FOR MAR-03-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:60.00)

REPLY

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR FURTHER SANCTIONS AND FOR OSC RE CONTEMPT; DECLARATIONS OF MARY CATHERINE WIEDERHOLD FILED BY PLAINTIFF MANNION, BRIANNA LARIMER, TRAVIS

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS' MAY 14, 2014 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY FILED BY PLAINTIFF MANNION, BRIANNA LARIMER, TRAVIS

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MANNION, BRIANNA LARIMER, TRAVIS

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF DEC-16-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO PLAINTIFF MANNION, BRIANNA LARIMER, TRAVIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR SEP-15-2014 - CASE SETTLED PER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED ON 8/27/14. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON DEC-16-2014 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MANNION, BRIANNA LARIMER, TRAVIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS' MAY 14, 2014 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY FILED BY PLAINTIFF MANNION, BRIANNA LARIMER, TRAVIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY OTHER HARKINS, WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR FURTHER SANCTIONS AND FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING CONTEMPT AGAINST DEPONENT WILLIAM HARKINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER MOTION, PLAINTIFFS BRIANNA MANNION'S AND TRAVIS LARIMER'S MOTION FOR OCS RE: CONTEMPT IS DENIED. ALL DOCUMENTS HAVE BEEN PRODUCED AS OF THE DATE OF THE HEARING. DOCUMENTS ON FILE ARE NOT REDACTED. NO SANCTIONS. PREVAILING PARTY TO PREPARE ORDER IN COMPLIANCE WITH CRC 3.1312. JUDGE: RONALD EVANS QUIDACHAY; CLERK L. FONG; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (D501)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2014
  • MINI MINUTES FOR MAR-17-2014 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 501

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER MOTION 501, PLAINTIFF BRIANNA MANNION AND TRAVIS LARIMER'S MOTION FOR OSC RE CONTEMPT IS CONTINUED TO MARCH 17, 2014 ON COURT'S OWN MOTION. JUDGE: JAMES A. ROBERTSON II, CLERK: M. GOODMAN, NOT REPORTED. (D501)

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2013
  • NOTICE OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF MANNION, BRIANNA LARIMER, TRAVIS HEARING SET FOR JUN-11-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MEDEIROS, SOFIA SUCCESSOR CO-TRUSTEE OF THE REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST OF ATHENA TSOUGARAKIS NAGER, PERRI SUCCESSOR CO-TRUSTEE OF THE REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST OF ATHENA TSOUGARAKIS TSOUGARAKIS, ATHENA (Fee:1350.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WAI,, JOHN E INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE JOHN E WAI 1981 LIVING TRUST (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MANNION, BRIANNA LARIMER, TRAVIS SERVED JAN-18-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT WAI, JOHN E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MANNION, BRIANNA LARIMER, TRAVIS SERVED JAN-18-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT WAI, JOHN E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MANNION, BRIANNA LARIMER, TRAVIS SERVED JAN-19-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT TSOUGARAKIS, ATHENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MANNION, BRIANNA LARIMER, TRAVIS SERVED JAN-19-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT MEDEIROS, SOFIA SUCCESSOR CO-TRUSTEE OF THE REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST OF ATHENA TSOUGARAKIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • JURY FEES DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF LARIMER, TRAVIS (Fee:150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WRONGFUL EVICTION, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MANNION, BRIANNA LARIMER, TRAVIS AS TO DEFENDANT WAI, JOHN E. WAI, JOHN E MEDEIROS, SOFIA SUCCESSOR CO-TRUSTEE OF THE REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST OF ATHENA TSOUGARAKIS NAGER, PERRI SUCCESSOR CO-TRUSTEE OF THE REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST OF ATHENA TSOUGARAKIS TSOUGARAKIS, ATHENA DOES 1 TO 50 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-19-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-18-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-04-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less