This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/06/2023 at 06:15:37 (UTC).

BRIAN MILLS VS. FORD MOTOR COMPANY, ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 BRIAN MILLS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY,. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3925

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILLS, BRIAN AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE

FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A CORPORATION

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIAMSE, GABRIELLE M

Attorney at NEALE & FHIMA APC

9846 Research Drive

Irvine, CA 92618

Defendant Attorney

HUGRET, SPENCER P.

Attorney at GORDON REES SCULLY MANSUKHANI, LLP

275 Battery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

Complaint

CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100187530) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MILLS, BRIAN AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A CORPORATION DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-14-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-13-2023 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-22-2023

Civil Case Cover Sheet

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 100187530) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MILLS, BRIAN AN INDIVIDUAL

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Summons

SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 100187530) TO PLAINTIFF MILLS, BRIAN AN INDIVIDUAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100187985) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MILLS, BRIAN AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED JAN-12-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A CORPORATION

Answer (Original) (Answers)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210028172) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: Y0223228F007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210028172) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY; Fee: $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100187985) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MILLS, BRIAN AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED JAN-12-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 100187530) TO PLAINTIFF MILLS, BRIAN AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: H4823111F024

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 100187530) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MILLS, BRIAN AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100187530) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MILLS, BRIAN AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A CORPORATION DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-14-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-13-2023 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-22-2023; Fee: $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less