This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/14/2016 at 02:43:05 (UTC).

BRIAN GARRETT VS. ORIENT BANCORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 10/30/2013 BRIAN GARRETT filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ORIENT BANCORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5153

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARRETT, BRIAN

Defendants

BANK OF THE ORIENT

DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE

ORIENT BANCORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PALEFSKY, CLIFF MICHAEL

Attorney at MCGUINN HILLSMAN & PALEFSKY

535 Pacific Ave

San Francisco, CA 94133

Defendant Attorney

FISH, JOHN C

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON ET AL

650 California St 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94108

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARRETT, BRIAN AS TO DEFENDANT ORIENT BANCORPORATION BANK OF THE ORIENT DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-02-2014 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-30-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-10-2014 (Fee:450.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARRETT, BRIAN SERVED OCT-31-2013, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE NOV-04-2013 ON DEFENDANT ORIENT BANCORPORATION

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY DEFENDANT ORIENT BANCORPORATION BANK OF THE ORIENT

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-02-2014 CONTINUED TO OCT-01-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARRETT, BRIAN JURY DEMANDED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ; POS FILED BY DEFENDANT ORIENT BANCORPORATION JURY DEMANDED

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-01-2014 CONTINUED TO APR-01-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 15067147) FILED BY DEFENDANT ORIENT BANCORPORATION BANK OF THE ORIENT JURY DEMANDED

Proof of Service-Civil

PROOF OF SERVICE-CIVIL; (TRANSACTION ID # 15067147) FILED BY DEFENDANT ORIENT BANCORPORATION BANK OF THE ORIENT

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 15070131) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARRETT, BRIAN JURY DEMANDED

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-01-2015 CONTINUED TO OCT-07-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Dismissal to Entire Action

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100001854)

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-07-2015 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-07-2015 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100001854)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-01-2015 CONTINUED TO OCT-07-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 15070131) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARRETT, BRIAN JURY DEMANDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE-CIVIL; (TRANSACTION ID # 15067147) FILED BY DEFENDANT ORIENT BANCORPORATION BANK OF THE ORIENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 15067147) FILED BY DEFENDANT ORIENT BANCORPORATION BANK OF THE ORIENT JURY DEMANDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-01-2014 CONTINUED TO APR-01-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ; POS FILED BY DEFENDANT ORIENT BANCORPORATION JURY DEMANDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARRETT, BRIAN JURY DEMANDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • JURY FEES DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF GARRETT, BRIAN (Fee:150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2014
  • AMENDED NOTICE OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; POS FILED BY DEFENDANT ORIENT BANCORPORATION BANK OF THE ORIENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANTS ORIENT BANCORPORATION, BANK OF THE ORIENT'S PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS CONTINUED FROM JAN-28-2014 TO FEB-28-2014, 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 302 ON AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY DEFENDANT ORIENT BANCORPORATION BANK OF THE ORIENT (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT ORIENT BANCORPORATION BANK OF THE ORIENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT ORIENT BANCORPORATION BANK OF THE ORIENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • NTC OF PETITION AND PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS, PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT ORIENT BANCORPORATION BANK OF THE ORIENT HEARING SET FOR JAN-28-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:900.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARRETT, BRIAN SERVED OCT-31-2013, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE NOV-04-2013 ON DEFENDANT ORIENT BANCORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GARRETT, BRIAN AS TO DEFENDANT ORIENT BANCORPORATION BANK OF THE ORIENT DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-02-2014 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-30-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-10-2014 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less