Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:49:25 (UTC).

BRANDI TUCKER et al VS. ORGANON USA, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 BRANDI TUCKER filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against ORGANON USA, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8469

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALLEN, CHRISTY

BABERS, JENNIFER

BEST, TOUMAE

BUCHWALD, WENDY

DELLARIPA, PATRICIA

GRAVINA, DEIDRA

HETHERINGTON, MICHELLE

HYATT, MYKI

LEAMAN, JESSICA

RUDOLPH, BRITTANY

SMITH, DONNA

TUCKER, BRANDI

VARGO, SHANNON

WESTER, MICHELLE

YOUNG, SHANNON

Defendants

AZKO NOBEL NV

MCKESSON CORPORATION

MERCK & CO

MERCK & COMPANY INC.

ORGANON BIOSCIENCES NV

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOODPASTOR, CHRISTOPHER V.

Attorney at WATTS GUERRA CRAFT

5250 Prue Road, Ste 525

San Antonio, TX 78240

Defendant Attorneys

BRAZIL, ANTHONY G.

Attorney at MORRIS POLICH & PURDY LLP

1055 West Seventh Street, 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

YOO, THOMAS J

Attorney at REED SMITH LLP

355 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALLEN, CHRISTY BABERS, JENNIFER SERVED FEB-11-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ORGANON USA, INC.

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALLEN, CHRISTY BABERS, JENNIFER SERVED FEB-11-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT MERCK & COMPANY INC.

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MCKESSON CORPORATION (Fee:450.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALLEN, CHRISTY BABERS, JENNIFER SERVED FEB-05-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT MCKESSON CORPORATION

COMPLAINT

PRODUCTS LIABILITY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TUCKER, BRANDI LEAMAN, JESSICA DELLARIPA, PATRICIA YOUNG, SHANNON ALLEN, CHRISTY HETHERINGTON, MICHELLE SMITH, DONNA GRAVINA, DEIDRA BABERS, JENNIFER WESTER, MICHELLE BEST, TOUMAE BUCHWALD, WENDY RUDOLPH, BRITTANY HYATT, MYKI VARGO, SHANNON AS TO DEFENDANT ORGANON USA, INC. ORGANON INTERNATIONAL, INC. ORGANON PHARMACEUTICAL USA, INC. ORGANON BIOSCIENCES NV AZKO NOBEL NV SCHERING-PLOUGH CORPORATION MERCK & COMPANY INC. MCKESSON CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 100 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-10-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2013 (Fee:450.00)

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-10-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALLEN, CHRISTY SERVED FEB-11-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SCHERING-PLOUGH CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALLEN, CHRISTY BABERS, JENNIFER SERVED FEB-11-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ORGANON INTERNATIONAL, INC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-10-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED BY DEFENDANT ORGANON USA, INC. ORGANON INTERNATIONAL, INC. ORGNANON PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC. LLC (F/K/A ORGNANON PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC.) MERCK & CO (Fee:1800.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALLEN, CHRISTY SERVED FEB-11-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SCHERING-PLOUGH CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALLEN, CHRISTY BABERS, JENNIFER SERVED FEB-11-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT MERCK & COMPANY INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALLEN, CHRISTY BABERS, JENNIFER SERVED FEB-11-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ORGANON INTERNATIONAL, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALLEN, CHRISTY BABERS, JENNIFER SERVED FEB-11-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ORGANON USA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MCKESSON CORPORATION (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALLEN, CHRISTY BABERS, JENNIFER SERVED FEB-05-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT MCKESSON CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PRODUCTS LIABILITY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TUCKER, BRANDI LEAMAN, JESSICA DELLARIPA, PATRICIA YOUNG, SHANNON ALLEN, CHRISTY HETHERINGTON, MICHELLE SMITH, DONNA GRAVINA, DEIDRA BABERS, JENNIFER WESTER, MICHELLE BEST, TOUMAE BUCHWALD, WENDY RUDOLPH, BRITTANY HYATT, MYKI VARGO, SHANNON AS TO DEFENDANT ORGANON USA, INC. ORGANON INTERNATIONAL, INC. ORGANON PHARMACEUTICAL USA, INC. ORGANON BIOSCIENCES NV AZKO NOBEL NV SCHERING-PLOUGH CORPORATION MERCK & COMPANY INC. MCKESSON CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 100 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-10-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less