This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/12/2016 at 03:32:27 (UTC).

BRAHMA SWAMI VS. UNIVERSAL PARAGON CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/24/2012 BRAHMA SWAMI filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PARAGON CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3698

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SWAMI, BRAHMA

San Francisco, CA 94133

Defendants and Cross Defendants

AMERICAN CONCRETE CUTTING, INC.

RECYCLED MATERIALS COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

UNIVERSAL PARAGON CORPORATION

BROWNFIELD PARTNERS LLC

AMERICAN DEMOLITION/CONCRETE CUTTING INC.

DOES 1 TO 40

RECYCLED MATERIALS COMPANY, INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS RECYCLED MATERIALS COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA)

AMERICAN CONCRETE CUTTING, INC. DBA AMERICAN DEMOLITION/CONCRETE CUTTING, INC

SUSTAINABLE STRATEGIES GROUP, LLC (FORMERLY KNOWN AS BROWNFIELD PARTNERS; DOE 1)

MOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE

ROES 1-100

ZOES 1 TO 100

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

AMERICAN DEMOLITION/CONCRETE CUTTING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GARCIA, ROBERT PAUL

CARTON, MARK

2184 Sutter St, #162

San Francisco, CA 94115

SUSSMAN, JORDAN

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

SAMONI, PAUL V.

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOHN A. BIARD

215 Lennon Lane, Ste. 200

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

KRMPOTIC, JOY STEPHANIE

Attorney at LOW, BALL & LYNCH

505 Montgomery Street, 7Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111-2584

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

KRMPOTIC, JOY STEPHANIE

Attorney at LOW, BALL & LYNCH

505 Montgomery Street, 7Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111-2584

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT RECYCLED MATERIALS COMPANY, INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS RECYCLED MATERIALS COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA) JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 15.0 DAYS

ANSWER

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT AMERICAN DEMOLITION/CONCRETE CUTTING INC.

ANSWER

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT UNIVERSAL PARAGON CORPORATION

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT PER ORDER DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1 TO BE BROWNFIELD PARTNERS LLC

ORDER

ORDER SHORTENING TIME RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL AND/OR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF SWAMI, BRAHMA

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL AND/OR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF SWAMI, BRAHMA

Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Continue Trial

OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 56686668) FILED BY DEFENDANT UNIVERSAL PARAGON CORPORATION RECYCLED MATERIALS COMPANY, INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS RECYCLED MATERIALS COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA) SUSTAINABLE STRATEGIES GROUP, LLC (FORMERLY KNOWN AS BROWNFIELD PARTNERS; DOE 1)

Notice of Entry of Order on Montion to Continue Trial Date

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 57281153)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT AMERICAN CONCRETE CUTTING, INC. DBA AMERICAN DEMOLITION/CONCRETE CUTTING, INC JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT RECYCLED MATERIALS COMPANY, INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS RECYCLED MATERIALS COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA) JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: SUSSMAN, JORDAN SUBSTITUTED FOR GARCIA, ROBERT PAUL AS ATTORNEY FOR SWAMI, BRAHMA

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR FEB-18-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON AUG-14-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

OBEJCTION TO NOTICE OPF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT AMERICAN CONCRETE CUTTING, INC. DBA AMERICAN DEMOLITION/CONCRETE CUTTING, INC

CROSS COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT AMERICAN DEMOLITION/CONCRETE CUTTING INC. AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT UNIVERSAL PARAGON CORPORATION RECYCLED MATERIALS COMPANY, INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS RECYCLED MATERIALS COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA) ROES 1-100

Order Setting Case Management Conference

REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR ON MAY-27-2014. ASSIGNED TO CASE MANAGEMENT DEPARTMENT 610 ON AUG-13-2014 AT 10:30 AM FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR THE STATUS ON THE NEWLY ADDED PARTY. ORDER ALLOWING AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE TRUE NAME FOR DOE DEFENDANT FILED 4/30/14. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. (206)

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY PLAINTIFF SWAMI, BRAHMA

Dismissal of Entire Action

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58016200)

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF OCT-27-2015 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58016200)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN DEMOLITION/CONCRETE CUTTING INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 57991997)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY RECYCLED MATERIALS COMPANY, INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED ALSO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY UNIVERSAL PARAGON CORPORATION ON JUNE 12, 2013. EACH SIDE SHALL BEAR ITS OWN FEES AND COSTS. (TRANSACTION ID # 57950002)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR AUG-11-2015 HELD AND SETTLED. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON OCT-27-2015 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (8.0)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR AUG-17-2015 - CASE SETTLED AT THE AUG-11-2015 MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR AUG-11-2015 AT 1:00 P.M. IN DEPT. 612, HAS BEEN MOVED TO DEPARTMENT 212.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR AUG-12-2015 AT 1:00 PM IN DEPT. 612 WITH CONFERENCE OFFICER SUSAN FEDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR JUL-22-2015 - NOT HELD AND REMOVED. (2.5)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR JUL-22-2015 AT 1:00 PM IN DEPT. 210 WITH CONFERENCE OFFICER SUSAN FEDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ANSWER TO COMPLAINT, SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT, CROOS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT RECYCLED MATERIALS COMPANY, INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS RECYCLED MATERIALS COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA) SERVED JAN-30-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION ON CROSS DEFENDANT AMERICAN CONCRETE CUTTING, INC. DBA AMERICAN DEMOLITION/CONCRETE CUTTING, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2013
  • JURY FEES DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT RECYCLED MATERIALS COMPANY, INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS RECYCLED MATERIALS COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA) (Fee:150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT RECYCLED MATERIALS COMPANY, INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS RECYCLED MATERIALS COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA) JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 15.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-23-2013 CONTINUED TO APR-24-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT RECYCLED MATERIALS COMPANY, INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS RECYCLED MATERIALS COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT RECYCLED MATERIALS COMPANY, INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS RECYCLED MATERIALS COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA) AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT AMERICAN CONCRETE CUTTING, INC. DBA AMERICAN DEMOLITION/CONCRETE CUTTING, INC ZOES 1 TO 100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT RECYCLED MATERIALS COMPANY, INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS RECYCLED MATERIALS COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA) (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SWAMI, BRAHMA JURY DEMANDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SWAMI, BRAHMA AS TO DEFENDANT UNIVERSAL PARAGON CORPORATION RECYCLED MATERIALS COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA AMERICAN CONCRETE CUTTING, INC. DOES 1 TO 40 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-23-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-23-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-08-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less