This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 01/05/2018 at 13:50:37 (UTC).

BOB KURSAR VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 12/31/2007 BOB KURSAR filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS BP AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PETER J. BUSCH, CYNTHIA M. LEE, TERI L. JACKSON, GARRETT L. WONG, JAMES J. MCBRIDE, DAVID BALLATI, PANG LY, EVERETT HEWLETT, JOHN K. STEWART and RONALD E. QUIDACHAY. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4491

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

PETER J. BUSCH

CYNTHIA M. LEE

TERI L. JACKSON

GARRETT L. WONG

JAMES J. MCBRIDE

DAVID BALLATI

PANG LY

EVERETT HEWLETT

JOHN K. STEWART

RONALD E. QUIDACHAY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KURSAR, BLANKA

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

J.T. THORPE & SON, INC.

NATIONAL STEEL AND SHIPBUILDING COMPANY

PLANT PRODUCTS & SUPPLY COMPANY

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

POLAR TANKERS, INC.

SUN SHIP, LLC

RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION

KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

M. SLAYEN AND ASSOCIATES, INC.

DOES 1-8500

CBS CORPORATION, DELAWARE CORPORATION, FKA VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD.

CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY

C.H. MURPHY/CLARK-ULLMAN, INC.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC., FORMERLY KNOWN AS KAISER CEMENT CORPORATION

31 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON & PURCELL LLP

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O.Box 6169

Novoto, CA 94948-6169

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

BARRY, NELSON CLYDE

Attorney at BISHOP, BARRY, HOWE, HANEY & RYDER

2000 Powell Street, Suite 1425

Emeryville, CA 94608

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

1255 Powell St

Emeryville, CA 94608-2604

ROBINSON, RALPH WELLS

Attorney at WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER LLP

525 Market Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2725

CAMPAGNE, INGRID A.

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Flr

San Francisco, CA 94111

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Other Attorneys

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

DUFFY, JOSEPH

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105-1126

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

ROME, HENRY DAVID

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Road, Suite 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

KELLY, DANIEL J.

Attorney at HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP

71 Stevenson St., 2Oth Flr

Sf, CA 94105-2981

PFALZER, THOMAS E

Attorney at MCNAMARA, DODGE, NEY, BEATTY, SLATTERY, PFALZER, BORGES & BROTHERS LLP

1211 Newell Avenue, P.O. Box 5288

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

KRAFT, ROBERT S

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

HUGG, FRANK BOWEN

5810 Telegraph Ave.

Oakland, CA 94609

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery St., 9Th Flr.

San Francisco, CA 94111-2612

DUMONT, RICHARD DANA

Attorney at VASQUEZ & ESTRADACOURTHOUSE SQUARE

1000 Fourth St, Suite 700

San Rafael, CA 94901

CALLE, INGRID K

Attorney at TROPIO & MORLAN

21700 Oxnard St.,, Ste 1700

Woodland Hills,, CA 91367

13 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

EXHIBITS H-K IN SUPPORT OF DECLARATION OF D. PAUL BIRD II IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

EXHIBITS H-K IN SUPPORT OF DECLARATION OF D. PAUL BIRD II IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES (TRANSACTION ID # 26060296) FILED BY DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED (TRANSACTION ID # 26208237) AS TO DEFENDANT S.J. VILICICH CORPORATION

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY ONLY.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED. EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS. (TRANSACTION ID # 26579152) AS TO DEFENDANT CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY AS SUCCESSOR TO POLAR TANKERS, INC.

Declaration of Rose Marie Tantillo in Support of Defendant Lamons Gasket Companys Motion for Summary Judgment

DECLARATION OF ROSE MARIE TANTILLO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 26049439) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

Statement of Damages

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (TRANSACTION ID # 26208237) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KURSAR, BOB AS TO DEFENDANT S.J. VILICICH CORPORATION

DEFENDANT NATIONAL STEEL AND SHIPBUILDING COMPANYS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS PROFFERED EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO NASSCOS SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION

EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS PROFFERED EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO NASSCOS SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION (TRANSACTION ID # 27159688) FILED BY DEFENDANT NATIONAL STEEL AND SHIPBUILDING COMPANY

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 59083753)

Request for Dismissal as to Del Monte Foods Corporation et al

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27160898) AS TO DEFENDANT DEL MONTE FOODS CORPORATION, NAMED AND SERVED HEREIN AS DEL MONTE FOODS COMPANY, ON BEHALF OF STAR-KIST FOODS, INC., FORMERLY KNOWN AS FRENCH SARDINE

PLAINTIFFS? RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT NATIONAL STEEL & SHIPBUILDING?S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT NATIONAL STEEL SHIPBUILDINGS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS (TRANSACTION ID # 27042912) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KURSAR, BOB KURSAR, BLANKA

289 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2009
  • DocketPayment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B1409715M001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2009
  • DocketPayment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Payment Type : NO FEE; Receipt Number : W5509714M003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2009
  • DocketPayment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount : $200; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B7409713M004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2009
  • DocketPayment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount : $200; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B7409713M003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2009
  • DocketPayment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount : $200; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : W5509713M004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2009
  • DocketPayment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount : $200; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : W5509713M003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2009
  • DocketPayment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount : $200; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B7409710M002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2009
  • DocketPayment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount : $200; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B7409710M001

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2009
  • DocketPayment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount : $200; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R0809710M008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2009
  • DocketPayment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $365; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B5209702F006

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
404 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18902108) FILED BY DEFENDANT HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC., FORMERLY KNOWN AS KAISER CEMENT CORPORATION (Fee:$335.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNORTHROP GRUMMAN SHIP SYSTEMS, INC.S OBJECTION TO ASSIGNMENT TO COMMISSIONER FOR TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 18879644) FILED BY DEFENDANT NORTHROP GRUMMAN SHIP SYSTEMS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18879644) FILED BY DEFENDANT NORTHROP GRUMMAN SHIP SYSTEMS, INC. (Fee:$335.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEF. GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATIONS OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER-ASBESTOS. (TRANSACTION ID # 18846946) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 18846946) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18846946) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION (Fee:$335.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18789662) FILED BY DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION (Fee:$335.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2007
  • DocketPRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF KURSAR, BOB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KURSAR, BOB AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, D, E, H, I ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS DOES 1-8500 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-18-2008 (Fee:$335.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUN SHIP, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where POLAR TANKERS, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where PLANT PRODUCTS & SUPPLY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONAL STEEL AND SHIPBUILDING COMPANY is a litigant