This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 05/13/2020 at 15:19:59 (UTC).

BLUECREW, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS. LYFT, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/25/2020 BLUECREW, INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LYFT, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRETT L. WONG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3929

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

GARRETT L. WONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BLUECREW, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Defendant

LYFT, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASHMAN, ADAM S.

Attorney at SINGER\/BEA LLP

601 Montgomery Street,, Ste 1950

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BLUECREW, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT LYFT, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-26-2020 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-26-2020 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-03-2020

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, SIGNED APR-20-2020, SERVED MAR-31-2020 (TRANSACTION ID # 65607935) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BLUECREW, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT LYFT, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2020
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: GARRETT L. WONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, SIGNED APR-20-2020, SERVED MAR-31-2020 (TRANSACTION ID # 65607935) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BLUECREW, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT LYFT, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1020327F020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BLUECREW, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT LYFT, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-26-2020 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-26-2020 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-03-2020 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLUECREW LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Lyft, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cashman, Adam Seth