Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:48:41 (UTC).

BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC VS. ELHAM ELAHI et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ELHAM ELAHI. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8458

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

ELAHI, ELHAM

DOES 1 TO 5, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIELE, KENNETH J.

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF KENNETH J. MIELE

8581 Santa Monica Blvd. #17

Los Angeles, CA 90069

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $4,426.41 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $1,590.09 INTEREST, $190.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 100012429) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CLERKS JUDGMENT - GENERAL

UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT ELAHI, ELHAM $6,951.47 PRINCIPAL, $1,025.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $2,270.18 INTEREST, $345.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $10,591.65, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

Memorandum of Costs

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $4,426.41 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $1,669.12 INTEREST, $217.95 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 100015031) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED JUN-17-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT ELAHI, ELHAM

Memorandum of Costs

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $2,985.75 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $.00 INTEREST, $180.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 100007877) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $345.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT ELAHI, ELHAM

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RE: ASSIGNMENT OF ACCOUNT, ACCOUNT BALANCE, ATTORNEY FEES, INTEREST AND COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

COMPLAINT

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT AND DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP 395(B) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT ELAHI, ELHAM DOES 1 TO 5, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-05-2013 (Fee:225.00)

DECLARATION

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 5, INCLUSIVE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2016
  • EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT ELAHI, ELHAM (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $4,426.41 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $1,669.12 INTEREST, $217.95 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 100015031) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $4,426.41 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $1,590.09 INTEREST, $190.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 100012429) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $2,985.75 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $.00 INTEREST, $180.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 100007877) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • CRC 3.740 REVIEW - JUDGMENT ON FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT ELAHI, ELHAM (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $4,426.41 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $236.63 INTEREST, $85.00 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT ELAHI, ELHAM (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $66.74 INTEREST, $.00 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT ELAHI, ELHAM $6,951.47 PRINCIPAL, $1,025.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $2,270.18 INTEREST, $345.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $10,591.65, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RE: ASSIGNMENT OF ACCOUNT, ACCOUNT BALANCE, ATTORNEY FEES, INTEREST AND COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 5, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $345.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT ELAHI, ELHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT ELAHI, ELHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • CRC 3.740 REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED JUN-17-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT ELAHI, ELHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT AND DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP 395(B) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT ELAHI, ELHAM DOES 1 TO 5, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-05-2013 (Fee:225.00)

    Read MoreRead Less