Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:50:02 (UTC).

BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. VS. CASSANDRA Y. PIERCE et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CASSANDRA Y PIERCE. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8478

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

Defendants

PIERCE, CASSANDRA Y.

DOES 1 TO 5 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIELE, KENNETH J.

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF KENNETH J. MIELE

8581 Santa Monica Blvd. #17

Los Angeles, CA 90069

 

Court Documents

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 5 INCLUSIVE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. SERVED FEB-27-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT PIERCE, CASSANDRA Y.

EXECUTION FOR MONEY/POSSESSION/SALE RETURN

RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT PIERCE, CASSANDRA Y.

memo of costs

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $1,065.09 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $2,054.67 INTEREST, $213.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 15099021) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

memo of costs

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $1,338.01 INTEREST, $319.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 15203011) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

COST BILL

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $998.07 INTEREST, $118.00 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

DECLARATION OF VENUE

EXECUTION FOR MONEY/POSSESSION/SALE RETURN

RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, PARTIALLY SATISFIED IN THE SUM OF $1,065.09 AS TO DEFENDANT PIERCE, CASSANDRA Y.

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RE: ASSIGNMENT OF ACCOUNT, ACCOUNT BALANCE, ATTORNEY FEES, INTEREST, AND COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

COMPLAINT

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT PIERCE, CASSANDRA Y. DOES 1 TO 5 INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-05-2013 (Fee:225.00)

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $285.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT PIERCE, CASSANDRA Y.

COST BILL

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $56.32 INTEREST, $.00 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

CLERKS JUDGMENT - GENERAL

UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT PIERCE, CASSANDRA Y. $7,903.15 PRINCIPAL, $1,125.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $2,106.78 INTEREST, $285.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $11,419.93, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, PARTIALLY SATISFIED IN THE SUM OF $1,065.09 AS TO DEFENDANT PIERCE, CASSANDRA Y.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT PIERCE, CASSANDRA Y.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $1,338.01 INTEREST, $319.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 15203011) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT PIERCE, CASSANDRA Y. (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $1,065.09 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $2,054.67 INTEREST, $213.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 15099021) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT PIERCE, CASSANDRA Y. (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $998.07 INTEREST, $118.00 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT PIERCE, CASSANDRA Y.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • CRC 3.740 REVIEW - JUDGMENT ON FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT PIERCE, CASSANDRA Y. (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $56.32 INTEREST, $.00 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT PIERCE, CASSANDRA Y. $7,903.15 PRINCIPAL, $1,125.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $2,106.78 INTEREST, $285.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $11,419.93, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RE: ASSIGNMENT OF ACCOUNT, ACCOUNT BALANCE, ATTORNEY FEES, INTEREST, AND COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 5 INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $285.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT PIERCE, CASSANDRA Y.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT PIERCE, CASSANDRA Y.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. SERVED FEB-27-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT PIERCE, CASSANDRA Y.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BH FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT PIERCE, CASSANDRA Y. DOES 1 TO 5 INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-05-2013 (Fee:225.00)

    Read MoreRead Less