This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 09/01/2019 at 11:38:08 (UTC).

BEVERLY COLE-HARROP ET AL VS. SAN FRANCISCO HEALTH CARE AND REHAB, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/09/2018 a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice case was filed by BEVERLY COLE-HARROP against SAN FRANCISCO HEALTH CARE AND REHAB, INC in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4254

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

TERI L. JACKSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COLE-HARROP, BEVERLY

HARROP, THOMAS

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 50

SAN FRANCISCO HEALTH CARE AND REHAB, INC.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100049725)

Notice of Change of Attorney Within Handling Firm

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY WITHIN HANDLING FIRM (TRANSACTION ID # 100046864) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO HEALTH CARE AND REHAB, INC.

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR APR-08-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. (610)

Objection to CMC Order

OBJECTION TO CMC ORDER OF JUNE 28, 2018 (TRANSACTION ID # 100041370) FILED BY PLAINTIFF COLE-HARROP, BEVERLY HARROP, THOMAS

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR FEB-25-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUL-11-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

case management statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100040710) FILED BY PLAINTIFF COLE-HARROP, BEVERLY HARROP, THOMAS JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62163411) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO HEALTH CARE AND REHAB, INC. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

Defendant San Francisco Health Care and Rehab Inc. Answer to Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61949580) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO HEALTH CARE AND REHAB, INC.

COMPLAINT

MALPRACTICE - MEDICAL/DENTAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COLE-HARROP, BEVERLY HARROP, THOMAS AS TO DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO HEALTH CARE AND REHAB, INC. DOES 1 TO 50 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-11-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-10-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-18-2018

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2018
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : CREDIT CARD ; Receipt Number : W1618703J008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B5218430F016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1018209F032

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR APR-08-2019 VACATED. DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED 10/3/18. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • CASE NOT ASSIGNED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100049725)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY WITHIN HANDLING FIRM (TRANSACTION ID # 100046864) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO HEALTH CARE AND REHAB, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • REVIEW FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR APR-08-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. (610)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • OBJECTION HEARING OF JUL-11-2018 HELD. JUDGE: ANGELA BRADSTREET; CLERK: GINA GONZALES; PROCEEDINGS NOT REPORTED. (610)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR OBJECTION HEARING HEARING SET FOR JUL-11-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • JURY FEES DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF COLE-HARROP, BEVERLY (Fee:$150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO CMC ORDER OF JUNE 28, 2018 (TRANSACTION ID # 100041370) FILED BY PLAINTIFF COLE-HARROP, BEVERLY HARROP, THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR FEB-25-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUL-11-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100040710) FILED BY PLAINTIFF COLE-HARROP, BEVERLY HARROP, THOMAS JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62163411) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO HEALTH CARE AND REHAB, INC. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61949580) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO HEALTH CARE AND REHAB, INC. (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MALPRACTICE - MEDICAL/DENTAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COLE-HARROP, BEVERLY HARROP, THOMAS AS TO DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO HEALTH CARE AND REHAB, INC. DOES 1 TO 50 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-11-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-10-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-18-2018 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less