Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 05/20/2016 at 09:00:19 (UTC).

BERNAL HEIGHTS COOPERATIVE, INC. VS. HARVEST ON GEARY, INC., DBA HARVEST CANNABIS CO., ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/06/2016 BERNAL HEIGHTS COOPERATIVE, INC filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against HARVEST ON GEARY, INC , DBA HARVEST CANNABIS CO . This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1316

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BERNAL HEIGHTS COOPERATIVE, INC.

Defendants

DOES 1-10

HARVEST ON GEARY, INC., DBA HARVEST CANNABIS CO., DBA HARVEST CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMPICH, WILLIAM MORRIS

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF WILLIAM M. SIMPICH

1736 Franklin St., 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 946123423

Defendant Attorney

WYKOWSKI, HENRY GEORGE

Attorney at HENRY G. WYKOWSKI & ASSOCIATES

235 Montgomery St., Suite 657

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BERNAL HEIGHTS COOPERATIVE, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT HARVEST ON GEARY, INC., DBA HARVEST CANNABIS CO., DBA HARVEST CO. DOES 1-10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-07-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-06-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-15-2016 (Fee:450.00)

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHORTEN TIME FOR HEARING ON A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF BERNAL HEIGHTS COOPERATIVE, INC. (Fee:60.00)

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY PLAINTIFF BERNAL HEIGHTS COOPERATIVE, INC.

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY PLAINTIFF BERNAL HEIGHTS COOPERATIVE, INC.

ORDER

ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION - (HEARING: 4/27/2016; OPPOSITION: 4/20/2016; REPLY: 4/22/2016)

Reply Brief

REPLY REPLY BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 58911617) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BERNAL HEIGHTS COOPERATIVE, INC.

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100018420) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARVEST ON GEARY, INC., DBA HARVEST CANNABIS CO., DBA HARVEST CO.

Defendant Harvest on Gearys Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Op

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (TRANSACTION ID # 100018420) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARVEST ON GEARY, INC., DBA HARVEST CANNABIS CO., DBA HARVEST CO. (Fee:450.00)

Declaration of Stephen Sukman in Opposition to Order to Show Cause reg

DECLARATION OF STEPHEN SUKMAN IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (TRANSACTION ID # 100018420) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARVEST ON GEARY, INC., DBA HARVEST CANNABIS CO., DBA HARVEST CO.

ORDER

ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (ATTORNEY HENRY WYKOWSKI IS TO PROVIDE NOTICE TO OPPOSING COUNSEL)

Defendant Harvest on Geary, Inc.s Notice of Hearing on demurrer

NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEMURRER (TRANSACTION ID # 100019090) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARVEST ON GEARY, INC., DBA HARVEST CANNABIS CO., DBA HARVEST CO.

Defendant Harvest on Geary Inc.s Demurrer

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100019090) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARVEST ON GEARY, INC., DBA HARVEST CANNABIS CO., DBA HARVEST CO. HEARING SET FOR JUN-03-2016 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

Defendant Harvest on Geary, Inc.s Memorandum of Points and Authorities

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER (TRANSACTION ID # 100019090) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARVEST ON GEARY, INC., DBA HARVEST CANNABIS CO., DBA HARVEST CO.

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100019090) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARVEST ON GEARY, INC., DBA HARVEST CANNABIS CO., DBA HARVEST CO.

Defendant Harvest on Geary, Inc.s notice of motion and special motion

NOTICE OF MOTION AND SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO C.C.P SECTION 425.16 (TRANSACTION ID # 100019343) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARVEST ON GEARY, INC., DBA HARVEST CANNABIS CO., DBA HARVEST CO. HEARING SET FOR JUN-03-2016 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

Defendant Harvest On Geary Inc.s memorandum of points and authorities

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO C.C.P SECTION 425.16 (TRANSACTION ID # 100019343) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARVEST ON GEARY, INC., DBA HARVEST CANNABIS CO., DBA HARVEST CO.

Defendant Harvest on Geary Incs Declaration of andrew scher in support

DECLARATION OF ANDREW SCHER IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO C.C.P SECTION 425.16 (TRANSACTION ID # 100019343) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARVEST ON GEARY, INC., DBA HARVEST CANNABIS CO., DBA HARVEST CO.

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100019343) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARVEST ON GEARY, INC., DBA HARVEST CANNABIS CO., DBA HARVEST CO.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2016
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR (TRANSACTION ID # 100019343) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARVEST ON GEARY, INC., DBA HARVEST CANNABIS CO., DBA HARVEST CO. (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100019343) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARVEST ON GEARY, INC., DBA HARVEST CANNABIS CO., DBA HARVEST CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 425.16 (TRANSACTION ID # 100019343) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARVEST ON GEARY, INC., DBA HARVEST CANNABIS CO., DBA HARVEST CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF ANDREW SCHER IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO C.C.P SECTION 425.16 (TRANSACTION ID # 100019343) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARVEST ON GEARY, INC., DBA HARVEST CANNABIS CO., DBA HARVEST CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO C.C.P SECTION 425.16 (TRANSACTION ID # 100019343) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARVEST ON GEARY, INC., DBA HARVEST CANNABIS CO., DBA HARVEST CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO C.C.P SECTION 425.16 (TRANSACTION ID # 100019343) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARVEST ON GEARY, INC., DBA HARVEST CANNABIS CO., DBA HARVEST CO. HEARING SET FOR JUN-03-2016 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100019090) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARVEST ON GEARY, INC., DBA HARVEST CANNABIS CO., DBA HARVEST CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR (TRANSACTION ID # 100019090) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARVEST ON GEARY, INC., DBA HARVEST CANNABIS CO., DBA HARVEST CO. (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER (TRANSACTION ID # 100019090) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARVEST ON GEARY, INC., DBA HARVEST CANNABIS CO., DBA HARVEST CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100019090) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARVEST ON GEARY, INC., DBA HARVEST CANNABIS CO., DBA HARVEST CO. HEARING SET FOR JUN-03-2016 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (TRANSACTION ID # 100018420) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARVEST ON GEARY, INC., DBA HARVEST CANNABIS CO., DBA HARVEST CO. (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100018420) FILED BY DEFENDANT HARVEST ON GEARY, INC., DBA HARVEST CANNABIS CO., DBA HARVEST CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING SET FOR APR-27-2016 AT 02:00 PM IN DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY REPLY BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 58911617) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BERNAL HEIGHTS COOPERATIVE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION - (HEARING: 4/27/2016; OPPOSITION: 4/20/2016; REPLY: 4/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY PLAINTIFF BERNAL HEIGHTS COOPERATIVE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY PLAINTIFF BERNAL HEIGHTS COOPERATIVE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHORTEN TIME FOR HEARING ON A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF BERNAL HEIGHTS COOPERATIVE, INC. (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BERNAL HEIGHTS COOPERATIVE, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT HARVEST ON GEARY, INC., DBA HARVEST CANNABIS CO., DBA HARVEST CO. DOES 1-10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-07-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-06-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-15-2016 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WYKOWSKI HENRY