This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 22:35:52 (UTC).

BARRIE MARKER VS. EVOLVELECTRIC, A BUSINESS ENTITY et al*****CASE TRANSFERRED TO MARIN COUNTY*****

Case Summary

On 09/12/2013 BARRIE MARKER filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against EVOLVELECTRIC, A BUSINESS ENTITY CASE TRANSFERRED TO MARIN COUNTY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4206

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARKER, BARRIE AN INDIVIDAUAL

Defendants

ATWATER, STEPHEN AN INDIVIDUAL

DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE

EVOL VELECTRIC, A BUSINESS ENTITY

EVOLVELECTRIC, A BUSINESS ENTITY

HB & HH MANAGEMENT INC. DBA EVOLVELECTRIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JUSTICE, MICHAEL L.

21800 Oxnard St.,Suite 790

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Defendant Attorney

WOOD, GREGORY J.

Attorney at WOOD ROBBINS, LLP

One Post Street, Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARKER, BARRIE AN INDIVIDAUAL AS TO DEFENDANT EVOLVELECTRIC, A BUSINESS ENTITY ATWATER, STEPHEN AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-19-2014 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-12-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-27-2014 (Fee:450.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARKER, BARRIE AN INDIVIDAUAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARKER, BARRIE AN INDIVIDAUAL SERVED SEP-26-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT EVOLVELECTRIC, A BUSINESS ENTITY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARKER, BARRIE AN INDIVIDAUAL SERVED SEP-26-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ATWATER, STEPHEN AN INDIVIDUAL

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ATWATER, STEPHEN AN INDIVIDUAL HB & HH MANAGEMENT INC. DBA EVOLVELECTRIC (Fee:900.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARKER, BARRIE AN INDIVIDAUAL JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 9.0 DAYS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT ATWATER, STEPHEN AN INDIVIDUAL HB & HH MANAGEMENT INC. DBA EVOLVELECTRIC ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF FEB-19-2014 CONTINUED TO APR-23-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF TRANSFER. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE

ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO MARIN COUNTY (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARKER, BARRIE AN INDIVIDAUAL JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 9.0 DAYS

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-23-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR, CASE TRANSFERRED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

TRANSFER RECEIPT RECEIVED FROM MARIN COUNTY WITH NEW CASE NUMBER

TRANSFER RECEIPT RECEIVED FROM MARIN COUNTY WITH NEW CASE NUMBER CIV1401418

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSFER RECEIPT RECEIVED FROM MARIN COUNTY WITH NEW CASE NUMBER CIV1401418

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-23-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR, CASE TRANSFERRED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • TRANSFER ORDER; FEES PAID, TRANSFERRED TO MARIN COUNTY BY CERT. MAIL NO. 7002 0860 0000 9071 9913 FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARKER, BARRIE AN INDIVIDAUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • CHANGE OF VENUE SPLIT PAYMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARKER, BARRIE AN INDIVIDAUAL (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • CHANGE OF VENUE SPLIT PAYMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT ATWATER, STEPHEN AN INDIVIDUAL HB & HH MANAGEMENT INC. DBA EVOLVELECTRIC (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARKER, BARRIE AN INDIVIDAUAL JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 9.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO MARIN COUNTY (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • STIPULATION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE TO MARIN COUNTY FILED BY DEFENDANT ATWATER, STEPHEN AN INDIVIDUAL HB & HH MANAGEMENT INC. DBA EVOLVELECTRIC (Fee:20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF FEB-19-2014 CONTINUED TO APR-23-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF TRANSFER. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT ATWATER, STEPHEN AN INDIVIDUAL HB & HH MANAGEMENT INC. DBA EVOLVELECTRIC ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARKER, BARRIE AN INDIVIDAUAL JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 9.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ATWATER, STEPHEN AN INDIVIDUAL HB & HH MANAGEMENT INC. DBA EVOLVELECTRIC (Fee:900.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARKER, BARRIE AN INDIVIDAUAL SERVED SEP-26-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ATWATER, STEPHEN AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARKER, BARRIE AN INDIVIDAUAL SERVED SEP-26-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT EVOLVELECTRIC, A BUSINESS ENTITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARKER, BARRIE AN INDIVIDAUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARKER, BARRIE AN INDIVIDAUAL AS TO DEFENDANT EVOLVELECTRIC, A BUSINESS ENTITY ATWATER, STEPHEN AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-19-2014 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-12-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-27-2014 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less