This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 09/13/2019 at 13:05:23 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA,N.A. VS. GINA L. ROSALES

Case Summary

On 02/08/2018 a Contract - Debt Collection case was filed by BANK OF AMERICA,N A against GINA L ROSALES in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4195

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA,N.A.

Defendant

ROSALES, GINA L.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BANK OF AMERICA,N.A. AS TO DEFENDANT ROSALES, GINA L. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-07-2018

Proof of Service

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100034010), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BANK OF AMERICA,N.A. SERVED FEB-21-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT ROSALES, GINA L.

Dismissal to Entire Action

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100035855)

Answer

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100034071) FILED BY DEFENDANT ROSALES, GINA L.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2018
  • Payment : FIRST PAPER RESPONSE/PLEADING $2,500 - $10,000; Amount : $225; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R7818402F005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Payment : COMPLAINT/PETITION/FIRST PAPER; Amount : $225; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : Y0218208F004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • CRC 3.740 REVIEW - DISMISSAL ON FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100035855)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100034071) FILED BY DEFENDANT ROSALES, GINA L. (Fee:$225.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100034010), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BANK OF AMERICA,N.A. SERVED FEB-21-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT ROSALES, GINA L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BANK OF AMERICA,N.A. AS TO DEFENDANT ROSALES, GINA L. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-07-2018 (Fee:$225.00)

    Read MoreRead Less