This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 10/31/2019 at 01:38:53 (UTC).

AZITA ALIZADEH VS. KOBRA ALIZADEH ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/30/2019 AZITA ALIZADEH filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against KOBRA ALIZADEH. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRETT L. WONG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0383

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

GARRETT L. WONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALIZADEH, AZITA

Defendants

T.D. SERVICE COMPANY

ALIZADEH, KOBRA

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

CENTRAL PACIFIC PANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERNARD, WILLIAM E

Attorney at LAW OFFICES

1624 Santa Clara Drive, Ste 210

Roseville, CA 95661

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALIZADEH, AZITA AS TO DEFENDANT ALIZADEH, KOBRA WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. T.D. SERVICE COMPANY CENTRAL PACIFIC PANK SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-01-2020 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-30-2019 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-09-2020

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2019
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W0919A30F008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALIZADEH, AZITA AS TO DEFENDANT ALIZADEH, KOBRA WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. T.D. SERVICE COMPANY CENTRAL PACIFIC PANK SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-01-2020 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-30-2019 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-09-2020 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******0383
Case Title:AZITA ALIZADEH VS. KOBRA ALIZADEH ET AL
Court Date:JUL-06-2020 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion For Order Of Publication Of Summons
Rulings:Set for hearing on Monday, July 06, 2020, Line 3,PLAINTIFF AZITA ALIZADEH'sf Motion For Order Of Publication Of Summons.Off calendar. Matter to be re-set in department 206 before the Presiding Judge per SF Local Rule 3.1(C). =(302/EPS)


Case Number:*******0383
Case Title:AZITA ALIZADEH VS. KOBRA ALIZADEH ET AL
Court Date:JUL-23-2020 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion For An Order For Entry Of Judgment On Stipulation
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Jul 23, 2020 line 5.PLAINTIFF AZITA ALIZADEH Notice Of Motion For An Order For Entry Of Judgment On StipulationDue to COVID-19 pandemic telephonic appearances are encouraged. If you appear in-person for your case notify the department by 5:00 p.m. one day before the hearing at Department501ContestTR@sftc.org. Department will follow social distancing guidelines and you will be required to wear a mask or a face covering. By 8:00 a.m. on the date of the hearing moving and opposing parties to submit electronic copies of their respective proposed orders (note: prevailing party to prepare an order repeating the tentative ruling verbatim in addition to any other proposed orders) in an editable format to Dept501Orders@sftc.org, so that the judge can modify it prior to signing, if needed. All communications shall include in the subject line the case name, number and hearing date. (e.g. "Smith v. Jones; CGC-18-555555; June 1, 2020"). All communications sent to the Court must be copied to the opposing party/counsel for whom e-mail addresses are known. The e-mail address provided herein shall only be used for the purposes indicated above. No unauthorized communications will be considered or responded to. Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Judgement per Stipulation is GRANTED. Non-opposition filed. A single judgement may be obtained including parties to this stipulation at the conclusion of this litigation. = (501/CFH)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD SERVICE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William E Bernard