This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 06/15/2022 at 21:36:54 (UTC).

AYSE NAZ ERKAN, AN INDIVIDUAL VS. ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/14/2022 AYSE NAZ ERKAN, AN INDIVIDUAL filed an Other lawsuit against ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAMUEL K. FENG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0149

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

SAMUEL K. FENG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AYSE NAZ ERKAN, AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE

HEMAL DOSHI, AN INDIVIDUAL

ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOSRATI, OMID

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF OMID NOSRATI

1801 Century Park East, Suite 840

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR MONETARY AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES

OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100166883) FILED BY PLAINTIFF AYSE NAZ ERKAN, AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION HEMAL DOSHI, AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR NOV-16-2022 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-15-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON OCT-24-2022

Civil Case Cover Sheet

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 100166883) FILED BY PLAINTIFF AYSE NAZ ERKAN, AN INDIVIDUAL

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Summons

SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 100166883) TO PLAINTIFF AYSE NAZ ERKAN, AN INDIVIDUAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 100166883) TO PLAINTIFF AYSE NAZ ERKAN, AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: C7122615F006

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 100166883) FILED BY PLAINTIFF AYSE NAZ ERKAN, AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100166883) FILED BY PLAINTIFF AYSE NAZ ERKAN, AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION HEMAL DOSHI, AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR NOV-16-2022 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-15-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON OCT-24-2022; Fee: $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******0149
Case Title:AYSE NAZ ERKAN, AN INDIVIDUAL VS. ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION ET AL
Court Date:OCT-17-2022 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay Civil Proceedings
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Monday, October 17, 2022, Line 8,DEFENDANT'S ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC. and HEMAL DOSHI'S Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay Civil Proceedings.*THE COURT'S FULL AND COMPLETE TENTATIVE RULING HAS BEEN EMAILED TO ALL COUNSEL*Defendants' motion to compel arbitration is granted. For the 9:30 a.m. Law & Motion calendar, all attorneys and parties may appear in Department 302 remotely. Remote hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear remotely at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link, or dial the corresponding phone number.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The text of the email shall include the name and contact information, including email address, of the attorney or party who will appear at the hearing. Counsel for the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the tentative ruling is not contested.The court no longer provides a court reporter in the Law & Motion Department. Parties may retain their own reporter, who may appear in the courtroom or remotely. A retained reporter must be a California certified court reporter (CSR), for only a CSR's transcript may be used in California courts. If a CSR is being retained, include in your email all of the following: their name, CSR and telephone numbers, and their individual work email address. = (302/RBU)



Case Number:*******0149
Case Title:AYSE NAZ ERKAN, AN INDIVIDUAL VS. ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION ET AL
Court Date:SEP-29-2022 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay Civil Proceedings
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Thursday, September 29, 2022, Line 14,DEFENDANT'S ROBINHOOD MARKETS, INC. and HEMAL DOSHI'S Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay Civil Proceedings.Defendants' unopposed "motion to compel arbitration and stay civil proceedings" is granted.For the 9:30 a.m. Law & Motion calendar, all attorneys and parties may appear in Department 302 remotely. Remote hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear remotely at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link, or dial the corresponding phone number.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The text of the email shall include the name and contact information, including email address, of the attorney or party who will appear at the hearing. Counsel for the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order which states that the motion was not opposed and must email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing.The court no longer provides a court reporter in the Law & Motion Department. Parties may retain their own reporter, who may appear in the courtroom or remotely. A retained reporter must be a California certified court reporter (CSR), for only a CSR's transcript may be used in California courts. If a CSR is being retained, include in your email all of the following: their name, CSR and telephone numbers, and their individual work email address. = (302/RBU)



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Robinhood Markets, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nosrati, Omid