This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 01/18/2023 at 07:49:03 (UTC).

AUSTIN PACE VS. HD SUPPLY, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/09/2022 AUSTIN PACE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HD SUPPLY, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SAMUEL K. FENG, ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO and VEDICA PURI. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8594

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

SAMUEL K. FENG

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

VEDICA PURI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACE, AUSTIN

Claimant

AMERICAN BOTTLING COMPANY, AS ADMINISTERED BY SEDGWICK

Defendants

DOES 1 - 5

HD SUPPLY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEUNG, HANNA

Attorney at HANNA LEUNG PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

1933 Ocean Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94127

Claimant Attorney

SUTHERLAND, JAMES B

Attorney at MULLEN & FILIPPI, LLP

111 Santa Rosa Ave Ste 200

Santa Rosa, CA 95404

Defendant Attorney

SCHELEY, PAUL CHRISTIAN

Attorney at CLAPP, MORONEY, VUCINICH, BEEMAN & SCHELEY

1730 S. El Camino Real, Suite 500

San Mateo, CA 94402

 

Court Documents

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR NOV-06-2023 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JAN-18-2023 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100186788) FILED BY DEFENDANT HD SUPPLY, INC. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

Notice of Change of Address

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 100186787) FILED BY ATTORNEY SCHELEY, PAUL CHRISTIAN

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

AMENDED ORDER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-30-2022 CONTINUED TO JAN-18-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PER 8-11-22 ORDER OR FOR TRIAL SETTING. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-30-2022 CONTINUED TO JAN-11-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEP-28-2022 CONTINUED TO NOV-30-2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

HD Supply, Inc. Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 68042946) FILED BY DEFENDANT HD SUPPLY, INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF AUSTIN PACE'S MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-10-2022 CONTINUED TO SEP-28-2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Austin Pace v. HD Supply, Inc., et al

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67866371) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PACE, AUSTIN ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 2.0 DAYS

HD Supply Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67823942) FILED BY DEFENDANT HD SUPPLY, INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

NOTICE OF LIEN CLAIM PURSUANT TO LABOR CODE ??3853 (Notices)

NOTICE OF LIEN (TRANSACTION ID # 210010255) FILED BY CLAIMANT AMERICAN BOTTLING COMPANY, AS ADMINISTERED BY SEDGWICK

PLAINTIFF AUSTIN PACE?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPOR

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67753807) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PACE, AUSTIN

"PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF AUSTIN PACE?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTI

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 67753807) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PACE, AUSTIN

"DECLARATION OF HANNA LEUNG IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING LE

DECLARATION OF HANNA LEUNG IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67753807) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PACE, AUSTIN

"PLAINTIFF AUSTIN PACE?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTIN

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67753807) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PACE, AUSTIN HEARING SET FOR AUG-05-2022 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302

Defendant Answer to Plaintiff Unverified Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67498737) FILED BY DEFENDANT HD SUPPLY, INC.

Austin Pace v. HD Supply, Inc. DOES 1-5

SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 67381642) TO PLAINTIFF PACE, AUSTIN

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR JURY; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Jan-05-2023 Set For Trial On Nov-06-23 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 206; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Nov-10-2022 Continued To Jan-18-23 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR NOV-06-2023 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JAN-18-2023 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100186788) FILED BY DEFENDANT HD SUPPLY, INC. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 100186787) FILED BY ATTORNEY SCHELEY, PAUL CHRISTIAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Nov-09-2022 Continued To Jan-11-23 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED ORDER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-30-2022 CONTINUED TO JAN-18-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PER 8-11-22 ORDER OR FOR TRIAL SETTING. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-30-2022 CONTINUED TO JAN-11-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Sep-08-2022 Continued To Nov-30-22 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67753807) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PACE, AUSTIN HEARING SET FOR AUG-05-2022 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302; Fee: $60.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • FinancialPayment: JURY FEES; Amount: $150; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: R5222425J016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: R5222425F015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketJURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 67498737) DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT HD SUPPLY, INC.; Fee: $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67498737) FILED BY DEFENDANT HD SUPPLY, INC.; Fee: $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 67381642) TO PLAINTIFF PACE, AUSTIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: C7122309F031

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67381642) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PACE, AUSTIN AS TO DEFENDANT HD SUPPLY, INC. DOES 1 - 5 NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-10-2022 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-09-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-18-2022; Fee: $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 67381642) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PACE, AUSTIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******8594
Case Title:AUSTIN PACE VS. HD SUPPLY, INC. ET AL
Court Date:AUG-05-2022 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order Granting Leave To File Amended Complaint"
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Friday, August 5, 2022, Line 8,PLAINTIFF AUSTIN PACE'S Motion For Order Granting Leave To File Amended Complaint.Grant. No opposition filed. For the 9:30 a.m. Law & Motion calendar, all attorneys and parties may appear in Department 302 remotely. Remote hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear remotely at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link, or dial the corresponding phone number.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The text of the email shall include the name and contact information, including email address, of the attorney or party who will appear at the hearing. Counsel for the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the tentative ruling is not contested.The court no longer provides a court reporter in the Law & Motion Department. Parties may retain their own reporter, who may appear in the courtroom or remotely. A retained reporter must be a California certified court reporter (CSR), for only a CSR's transcript may be used in California courts. If a CSR is being retained, include in your email all of the following: their name, CSR and telephone numbers, and their individual work email address. = (302/VP)