This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 12:41:16 (UTC).

ATOMIC COMMUNICATIONS LLC VS. EMERGENSEE U, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 04/23/2013 ATOMIC COMMUNICATIONS LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EMERGENSEE U, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0838

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ATOMIC COMMUNICATIONS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

EMERGENSEE U, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

EMERGENSEE U, INC.

DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINSON, SCOTT E.

Defendant Attorney

FRENZEN, AMY P.

 

Court Documents

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEP-25-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF ATOMIC COMMUNICATIONS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT EMERGENSEE U, INC. (Fee:450.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ATOMIC COMMUNICATIONS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED MAY-03-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT EMERGENSEE U, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ATOMIC COMMUNICATIONS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT EMERGENSEE U, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-25-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-24-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-10-2013 (Fee:450.00)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEP-25-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF ATOMIC COMMUNICATIONS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT EMERGENSEE U, INC. (Fee:450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ATOMIC COMMUNICATIONS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED MAY-03-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT EMERGENSEE U, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ATOMIC COMMUNICATIONS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT EMERGENSEE U, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-25-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-24-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-10-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less