This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 09/01/2019 at 11:43:09 (UTC).

ASFAW BEDADA VS. YELLOW CAB COOPERATIVE, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/13/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by ASFAW BEDADA against YELLOW CAB COOPERATIVE, INC in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4257

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

TERI L. JACKSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEDADA, ASFAW

Defendants

EAN HOLDINGS, LLC.

SINGH, RANJIT

ITALIA, RUSTOM K.

DOES 1 TO 50

YELLOW CAB COOPERATIVE, INC.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE EACH PARTY TO BEAR OWN COSTS AND FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 100061461)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100045730) AS TO DEFENDANT ITALIA, RUSTOM K.

Continued Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF FEB-05-2019 CONTINUED TO MAR-19-2019 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR FEB-05-2019 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. THE OCT-31-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-18-2018 CONTINUED TO AUG-29-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-29-2018 CONTINUED TO OCT-31-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100044591) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BEDADA, ASFAW ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE/ CONDITIONAL (TRANSACTION ID # 100047075) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BEDADA, ASFAW

Case Ordered Off Calendar

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAR-19-2019 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice of Stay of Proceedings

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS REGARDING BANKRUPTCY (TRANSACTION ID # 62327796) FILED BY DEFENDANT YELLOW CAB COOPERATIVE, INC. SINGH, RANJIT

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BEDADA, ASFAW AS TO DEFENDANT YELLOW CAB COOPERATIVE, INC. SINGH, RANJIT ITALIA, RUSTOM K. EAN HOLDINGS, LLC. DOES 1 TO 50 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Payment Type : IFP ; Receipt Number : W1518213F003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAR-19-2019 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE EACH PARTY TO BEAR OWN COSTS AND FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 100061461)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF FEB-05-2019 CONTINUED TO MAR-19-2019 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR FEB-05-2019 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. THE OCT-31-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE/ CONDITIONAL (TRANSACTION ID # 100047075) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BEDADA, ASFAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100045730) AS TO DEFENDANT ITALIA, RUSTOM K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-29-2018 CONTINUED TO OCT-31-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS REGARDING BANKRUPTCY (TRANSACTION ID # 62327796) FILED BY DEFENDANT YELLOW CAB COOPERATIVE, INC. SINGH, RANJIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100044591) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BEDADA, ASFAW ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-18-2018 CONTINUED TO AUG-29-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BEDADA, ASFAW ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BEDADA, ASFAW AS TO DEFENDANT YELLOW CAB COOPERATIVE, INC. SINGH, RANJIT ITALIA, RUSTOM K. EAN HOLDINGS, LLC. DOES 1 TO 50 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018 (Fee:$IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less