This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 12/31/2021 at 21:47:49 (UTC).

ARTERRA MISSION BAY, LLC VS. BOVIS LEND LEASE, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/14/2018 ARTERRA MISSION BAY, LLC filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against BOVIS LEND LEASE, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO, GARRETT L. WONG, RICHARD B. ULMER and HAROLD E. KAHN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9761

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

GARRETT L. WONG

RICHARD B. ULMER

HAROLD E. KAHN

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants, Plaintiffs and Defendants

ARTERRA MISSION BAY, LLC A LIMITED LIAIBLITY COMPANY

QUANEX BUILDING PRODUCTS CORPORATION

LENDLEASE (US) CONSTRUCTION, INC. F/K/A BOVIS LEND LEASE, INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS BOVIS LEND LEASE, INC.)

VICTAULIC COMPANY

NIBCO, INC. WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS CAL NIBCO, AN INDIANA CORPORATION

ARTERRA OWNERS ASSOCIATION

VITRUM INDUSTRIES, LTD.

LENDLEASE (US) CONSTRUCTION, INC. FKA BOVIS LEND LEASE, INC., A FLORIDA CORPORATION

NIBCO INC. AKA CAL NIBCO

ROES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

ACCO ENGINEERED SYSTEMS

Defendants, Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

DOES 1 TO 400 INCLUSIVE

QUANEX BUILDING PRODUCTS CORPORATION

LENDLEASE (US) CONSTRUCTION, INC. F/K/A BOVIS LEND LEASE, INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS BOVIS LEND LEASE, INC.)

VITRUM INDUSTRIES, LTD.

VICTAULIC COMPANY

QUANEX BUILDING PRODUCTS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

LENDLEASE (US) CONSTRUCTION, INC. FKA BOVIS LEND LEASE, INC., A FLORIDA CORPORATION

BOVIS LEND LEASE, INC. A FLORIDA CORPORATION

NIBCO, INC. WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS CAL NIBCO, AN INDIANA CORPORATION

DOES 1 THROUGH 200, AND 205 THROUGH 400, INCLUSIVE

NIBCO INC. AKA CAL NIBCO

ARTERRA OWNERS ASSOCIATION

JAMS, INC. , A DELAWARE CORPORATION

VITRUM INDUSTRIES, LTD., A CANADIAN BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN

VICTAULIC COMPANY, A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION

Cross Plaintiffs, Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Defendants

LENDLEASE (US) CONSTRUCTION, INC. F/K/A BOVIS LEND LEASE, INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS BOVIS LEND LEASE, INC.)

ARTERRA OWNERS ASSOCIATION A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION

Defendant, Other and Plaintiff

ARTERRA OWNERS ASSOCIATION

122 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant, Plaintiff, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ALLEN, SEAN D

GUNBY, III, MATTHEW JAMES

BERN, MARTIN D

MACDONALD, MATTHEW ALEXANDER

GILLISPIE, KEVIN J

NORMANDIN, TOM RODDY

RUBINO, MICHAEL C.

FINN, RICHARD JOSEPH

JAEGER, MICHAEL

Plaintiff, Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Other Attorney

RUBINO, MICHAEL C.

Other Attorneys

BLAKE, ALBERT PORTER

CHEN, ALEXANDER J.

KRAMER, JEFFREY S.

LAMARRA, KEITH N.

LIFTER, JILL JAYE

NAKAGAWA, EDSIN S

RESURRECCION, TREVOR O.

SHAMBAUGH, CYNTHIA

STONE, COLETTE F.

SWEENEY, JOSEPH MICHAEL

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Answer to Lendlease Cross-Complaint

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT OF LENDLEASE, INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 64753929) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT INLAND MASONRY INC.

Answer to Lendlease Cross-Complaint

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT OF LENDLEASE, INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 64753812) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT EUROPEAN PAVING DESIGNS, INC.

ORDER AFTER NOVEMBER 30, 2021 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION 67136023)

ORDER AFTER NOVEMBER 30, 2021 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION 67136023)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67100727) FILED BY DEFENDANT VITRUM INDUSTRIES, LTD.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67100727) FILED BY DEFENDANT VITRUM INDUSTRIES, LTD.

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 66265749), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ARTERRA MISSION BAY, LLC A LIMITED LIAIBLITY COMPANY SERVED JAN-11-2021, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT HANSEN INTERNATIONAL CORP. DBA HANSEN ARCHITECTURAL,

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 66265749), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ARTERRA MISSION BAY, LLC A LIMITED LIAIBLITY COMPANY SERVED JAN-11-2021, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT HANSEN INTERNATIONAL CORP. DBA HANSEN ARCHITECTURAL, AN OREGON CORPORATION

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 66166197) AS TO DEFENDANT INLAND MASONRY INC.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 66166197) AS TO DEFENDANT INLAND MASONRY INC.

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 66053219) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT VITRUM INDUSTRIES, LTD.

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 66053219) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT VITRUM INDUSTRIES, LTD.

ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64719767) FILED BY DEFENDANT GONSALVES & SANTUCCI INC. DBA CONCO

ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64719767) FILED BY DEFENDANT GONSALVES & SANTUCCI INC. DBA CONCO

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT OF LENDLEASE (US) CONSTRUCTION INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 64719599) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT PROGRESS GLASS CO., INC.

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT OF LENDLEASE (US) CONSTRUCTION INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 64719599) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT PROGRESS GLASS CO., INC.

MINUTES FOR NOV-30-2021 9:15 AM

MINUTES FOR NOV-30-2021 9:15 AM

MINUTES FOR AUG-02-2021 11:00 AM

MINUTES FOR AUG-02-2021 11:00 AM

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY (TRANSACTION ID # 66772899) FILED BY DEFENDANT LENDLEASE (US) CONSTRUCTION, INC. F/K/A BOVIS LEND LEASE, INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS BOVIS LEND LEASE, INC.)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY (TRANSACTION ID # 66772899) FILED BY DEFENDANT LENDLEASE (US) CONSTRUCTION, INC. F/K/A BOVIS LEND LEASE, INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS BOVIS LEND LEASE, INC.)

MINUTES FOR JUL-14-2021 9:15 AM

MINUTES FOR JUL-14-2021 9:15 AM

JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT OF PLAINTIFF ARTERRA MISSION BAY, LLC, AND DEFENDANTS ARTERRA OWNERS ASSOCIATION, AND LENDLEASE (US) CONSTRUCTION, INC. FKA BOVIS LEND LEASE, INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 66763874)

JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT OF PLAINTIFF ARTERRA MISSION BAY, LLC, AND DEFENDANTS ARTERRA OWNERS ASSOCIATION, AND LENDLEASE (US) CONSTRUCTION, INC. FKA BOVIS LEND LEASE, INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 66763874)

JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT OF PLAINTIFF ARTERRA MISSION BAY, LLC, AND DEFENDANTS ARTERRA OWNERS ASSOCIATION, AND LENDLEASE (US) CONSTRUCTION, INC. FKA BOVIS LEND LEASE, INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 66763796)

JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT OF PLAINTIFF ARTERRA MISSION BAY, LLC, AND DEFENDANTS ARTERRA OWNERS ASSOCIATION, AND LENDLEASE (US) CONSTRUCTION, INC. FKA BOVIS LEND LEASE, INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 66763796)

JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT OF PLAINTIFF ARTERRA MISSION BAY, LLC, AND DEFENDANTS ARTERRA OWNERS ASSOCIATION, AND LENDLEASE (US) CONSTRUCTION, INC. FKA BOVIS LEND LEASE, INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 66763778)

JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT OF PLAINTIFF ARTERRA MISSION BAY, LLC, AND DEFENDANTS ARTERRA OWNERS ASSOCIATION, AND LENDLEASE (US) CONSTRUCTION, INC. FKA BOVIS LEND LEASE, INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 66763778)

NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM (TRANSACTION ID # 66483935) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ARTERRA MISSION BAY, LLC A LIMITED LIAIBLITY COMPANY

NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM (TRANSACTION ID # 66483935) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ARTERRA MISSION BAY, LLC A LIMITED LIAIBLITY COMPANY

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM (TRANSACTION ID # 100127785) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ARTERRA MISSION BAY, LLC A LIMITED LIAIBLITY COMPANY

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM (TRANSACTION ID # 100127785) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ARTERRA MISSION BAY, LLC A LIMITED LIAIBLITY COMPANY

274 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketORDER AFTER DECEMBER 29, 2021 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketORDER GENERAL ORDER RE CASE REASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - TRIAL COURTS; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 304; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER AFTER NOVEMBER 30, 2021 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION 67136023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VIA COURTCALL OF NOV-30-2021 HELD AND CONTINUED TO DEC-29-2021 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 304 FOR STATUS REGADING FAILURE TO SIGN THE FINAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. ONLY PLAINTIFF AND THE PARTIES WHO HAVE NOT SIGNED THE FINAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ARE REQUIRED TO ATTEND. JUDGE: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO. CLERK: L. BARENG. PROCEEDINGS NOT REPORTED. (D304)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FOR NOV-30-2021 9:15 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - TRIAL COURTS Off Calendar Nov-30-2021 Continued To Dec-29-21 At 10:00 A.M. In Dept 304; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 304; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67100727) FILED BY DEFENDANT VITRUM INDUSTRIES, LTD.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketREFUND FROM THE ELIMINATION OF LOCAL SURHARGES (GC 70625) OF $15.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER AFTER AUGUST 2, 2021 TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION 66815956)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
367 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION IN SUPPORT OF ARTERRA MISSION BAY, LLCS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY ARBITRATION AND FOR CONSOLIDATION (TRANSACTION ID # 100055243) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ARTERRA MISSION BAY, LLC A LIMITED LIAIBLITY COMPANY HEARING SET FOR JAN-15-2019 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:$60.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketCOURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR (TRANSACTION ID # 100055237) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ARTERRA MISSION BAY, LLC A LIMITED LIAIBLITY COMPANY (Fee:$30.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF ALEXIS J. SCHULER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JOINDER OF ARTERRA OWNERS ASSOCIATION (TRANSACTION ID # 100055237) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ARTERRA MISSION BAY, LLC A LIMITED LIAIBLITY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JOINDER OF ARTERRA OWNERS ASSOCIATION (TRANSACTION ID # 100055237) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ARTERRA MISSION BAY, LLC A LIMITED LIAIBLITY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR JOINDER OF ADDITIONAL PARTIES ARTERRA OWNERS ASSOCIATION (TRANSACTION ID # 100055237) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ARTERRA MISSION BAY, LLC A LIMITED LIAIBLITY COMPANY HEARING SET FOR JAN-15-2019 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:$60.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100054387), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ARTERRA MISSION BAY, LLC A LIMITED LIAIBLITY COMPANY SERVED NOV-16-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT BOVIS LEND LEASE, INC. A FLORIDA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING COMPLEX DESIGNATION FOR FAILURE TO FILE APPLICATION REQUESTING DESIGNATION. (MO)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $1450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W0918914F014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSTRUCTION, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ARTERRA MISSION BAY, LLC A LIMITED LIAIBLITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT BOVIS LEND LEASE, INC. A FLORIDA CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 400 INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-13-2019 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-13-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-22-2019 (Fee:$1450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******9761
Case Title:ARTERRA MISSION BAY, LLC VS. BOVIS LEND LEASE, INC. ET AL
Court Date:FEB-19-2019 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR JOINDER OF ADDITIONAL PARTIES
Rulings:Set for hearing on Tuesday, February 19, 2019, Line 11, PLAINTIFF ARTERRA MISSION BAY, LLC's MOTION FOR JOINDER OF ADDITIONAL PARTIESArterra's motion for joinder is DENIED. Arterra fails to show that the Association is a necessary party under CCP 389 such that the court cannot render a fair adjudication in its absence in this indemnity action. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. Counsel for the Association is required to prepare a proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring it to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the tentative ruling is not contested. =302/rbu