This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/14/2016 at 08:39:11 (UTC).

ARON MIZRAHI VS. ISA J MUHAWIEH

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 ARON MIZRAHI filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against ISA J MUHAWIEH. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3069

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIZRAHI, ARON

San Francisco, CA 94115

Defendant and Appellant

MUHAWIEH, ISA J D.B.A. (THE TRAFTON GROUP )

San Francisco, CA 94114

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

DANFOURA, SAMER

Attorney at DANFOURA LAW OFFICES

1303 9Th Ave

San Francisco, CA 94122

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM

THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF MIZRAHI, ARON RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT MUHAWIEH, ISA J D.B.A. (THE TRAFTON GROUP ) $1,000.00 PRINCIPAL, $30.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $1,030.00 STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED

Notice of Time and Place of Hearing on Appeal

SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE HEARING SET FOR MAY-09-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 525

Order to Dismiss Small Claims Appeal

SMALL CLAIM APPEAL CALENDAR OF MAY-09-2013 DISMISSED - SETTLED. JUDGE PRO TEM SHARON O'GRADY, NOT REPORTED, CLERK J. KONG, D525.

Transfer of Record Notice

CASE_TRANSFERRED TO SUPERIOR COURT, RECORD TRANSFERRED

NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY DEFENDANT MUHAWIEH, ISA J D.B.A. (THE TRAFTON GROUP ) MAILED TO PLAINTIFF MIZRAHI, ARON (Fee:75.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF - FEE FOR SERVICE $ 0.00 SERVED FEB-08-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT MUHAWIEH, ISA J D.B.A. (THE TRAFTON GROUP )

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $1,000.00 FILED BY MIZRAHI, ARON AS TO DEFENDANT MUHAWIEH, ISA J D.B.A. (THE TRAFTON GROUP ) ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAR-04-2013 AT 05:30 PM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:30.00)

Transmittal Receipt

TRANSMITTAL RECEIPT FILED NO EXHIBITS TRANSFERRED TO SMALL CLAIM APPEALS

Notice of Entry of Judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

STIPULATION TO USE JUDGE PRO TEM AND ORDER

STIPULATION TO USE JUDGE PRO TEM AND ORDER FILED BY MUHAWIEH, ISA J D.B.A. (THE TRAFTON GROUP )

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, AS TO DEFENDANT MUHAWIEH, ISA J D.B.A. (THE TRAFTON GROUP )

ORDER

ORDER DISMISSING SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, AS TO DEFENDANT MUHAWIEH, ISA J D.B.A. (THE TRAFTON GROUP )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • RECORD REMANDED TO SMALL CLAIMS (NO EXHIBITS RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS DIVISION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DISMISSING SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIM APPEAL CALENDAR OF MAY-09-2013 DISMISSED - SETTLED. JUDGE PRO TEM SHARON O'GRADY, NOT REPORTED, CLERK J. KONG, D525.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION TO USE JUDGE PRO TEM AND ORDER FILED BY MUHAWIEH, ISA J D.B.A. (THE TRAFTON GROUP )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR MAY-09-2013 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 525

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE HEARING SET FOR MAY-09-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 525

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSMITTAL RECEIPT FILED NO EXHIBITS TRANSFERRED TO SMALL CLAIM APPEALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: DANFOURA, SAMER SUBSTITUTED FOR PRO PER AS ATTORNEY FOR MUHAWIEH, ISA J D.B.A. (THE TRAFTON GROUP )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE_TRANSFERRED TO SUPERIOR COURT, RECORD TRANSFERRED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY DEFENDANT MUHAWIEH, ISA J D.B.A. (THE TRAFTON GROUP ) MAILED TO PLAINTIFF MIZRAHI, ARON (Fee:75.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF MIZRAHI, ARON RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT MUHAWIEH, ISA J D.B.A. (THE TRAFTON GROUP ) $1,000.00 PRINCIPAL, $30.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $1,030.00 STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF MAR-04-2013 - JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS CALENDAR OF MAR-04-2013 - TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF MAR-04-2013 BY DONALD S. MITCHELL. APPEARANCES BY BOTH PARTIES. PLAINTIFF WAS REPRESENTED BY ISA MUHAWIEH--OWNER. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • DECLARATION OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CORPORATION PURSUANT TO CCP 116.540 (B)-(H) FILED BY DEFENDANT MUHAWIEH, ISA J D.B.A. (THE TRAFTON GROUP )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF - FEE FOR SERVICE $ 0.00 SERVED FEB-08-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT MUHAWIEH, ISA J D.B.A. (THE TRAFTON GROUP )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $1,000.00 FILED BY MIZRAHI, ARON AS TO DEFENDANT MUHAWIEH, ISA J D.B.A. (THE TRAFTON GROUP ) ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAR-04-2013 AT 05:30 PM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less