This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 09/23/2022 at 03:23:42 (UTC).

ANYRIDE, INC. VS. MYSTRO, INC. F/K/A ANYRIDE WILL DO, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 ANYRIDE, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MYSTRO, INC F/K/A ANYRIDE WILL DO, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SAMUEL K. FENG and RICHARD B. ULMER. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5689

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

SAMUEL K. FENG

RICHARD B. ULMER

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

ANYRIDE, INC.

DOES 1-100

MORAN, PETER

Cross Defendants and Defendants

DOES 1-100

FEIGELSON, DOUG

MYSTRO, INC. F/K/A ANYRIDE WILL DO, INC.

MYSTRO INC.

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

FEIGELSON, DOUG

MYSTRO INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

BRITTAIN,ESQ, CODY A.

Attorney at STRUCTURE LAW GROUP, LLP

1754 Technology Drive

San Jose, CA 95110

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

SCHWARTZ, AMANDA

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

One Market Plaza, Spear Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

ORDER

ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MYSTRO, INC. AND DOUG FEIGELSON'S MOTION TO STRIKE ALLEGATIONS REGARDING LIQUIDATED DAMAGES

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

ORDER

ORDER OVERRULING DEFENDANTS MYSTRO, INC. AND DOUG FEIGELSON'S DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Complaint

CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 200040357) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANYRIDE, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT MYSTRO, INC. F/K/A ANYRIDE WILL DO, INC. FEIGELSON, DOUG DOES 1-100 NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-02-2022 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-30-2021 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-07-2022

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 100172565): SCHWARTZ, AMANDA SUBSTITUTED FOR SNYDER, TOBIAS G. AS ATTORNEY FOR FEIGELSON, DOUG FEIGELSON, DOUG

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 100172565): SCHWARTZ, AMANDA SUBSTITUTED FOR SNYDER, TOBIAS G. AS ATTORNEY FOR FEIGELSON, DOUG FEIGELSON, DOUG

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY CIVIL (MYSTRO INC.)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 100172565): SCHWARTZ, AMANDA SUBSTITUTED FOR SNYDER, TOBIAS G. AS ATTORNEY FOR MYSTRO INC. MYSTRO INC.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-27-2022 CONTINUED TO NOV-23-2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

PLAINTIFFS MYSTRO INC AND DOUG FEIGELSONS CASE MANAGEMENT STATAMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100168514) FILED BY DEFENDANT FEIGELSON, DOUG MYSTRO INC. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 14.0 DAYS

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL OF CROSS-DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67758384) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT ANYRIDE, INC. MORAN, PETER

ANYRIDE, INC. AND PETER MORAN?S ANSWER TO MYSTRO, INC. AND DOUG FEIGEL

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT OF MYSTRO, INC AND DOUG FEIGELSON (TRANSACTION ID # 67758384) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT ANYRIDE, INC. MORAN, PETER

Proof of Service (Proof of Service)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 210008719) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT ANYRIDE, INC. MORAN, PETER

DECLARATION OF MARK R. FIGUEIREDO IN SUPPORT OF CROSSDEFENDANTS??? MOT

DECLARATION OF MARK R. FIGUEIREDO IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ANTI-SLAPP MOTION AGAINST THE CROSS-COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210008719) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT ANYRIDE, INC. MORAN, PETER

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF CROSSDEFENDANTS???

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANTS' ANTI-SLAPP MOTION AGAINST THE CROSS-COMPLAINT (MEMOS) (TRANSACTION ID # 210008719) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT ANYRIDE, INC. MORAN, PETER

CROSS-DEFENDANTS??? NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ANTISLAPP MOTION A

CROSS-DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ANTI-SLAPP MOTION AGAINST THE CROSS-COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210008719) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT ANYRIDE, INC. MORAN, PETER HEARING SET FOR OCT-06-2022 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302

Proof of Service (Proof of Service)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER CONT CMC (TRANSACTION ID # 210008311) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANYRIDE, INC.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-15-2022 CONTINUED TO JUL-27-2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR CROSS COMPLAINANT(S) TO BRING CROSS COMPLAINT(S) AT ISSUE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service)

PROOF OF SERVICE (PROOF OF SERVICE) (TRANSACTION ID # 210007805) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANYRIDE, INC.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF STIPULATED ORDER (Notices)

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF STIPULATED ORDER (NOTICES) (TRANSACTION ID # 210007805) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANYRIDE, INC.

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): Cross-Defendants' Notice Of Motion And Motion For Anti-Slapp Motion Against The Cross-Complaint; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 302; Judge Name: RICHARD B. ULMER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): Cross-Defendants' Notice Of Motion And Motion For Anti-Slapp Motion Against The Cross-Complaint Off Calendar Sep-13-2022 Continued To Nov-10-22 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 302; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 302; Judge Name: RICHARD B. ULMER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketLAW & MOTION, DEPT. 302, HEARING ON CROSS-DEFENDANTS' ANTI-SLAPP MOTION AGAINST THE CROSS-COMPLAINT IS CONTINUED FROM OCT-06-2022 TO NOV-10-2022 AT 9:30 A.M. IN DEPT. 302 PER THE AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES (PER EMAIL DATED SEP-13-2022). (302)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 100172565): SCHWARTZ, AMANDA SUBSTITUTED FOR SNYDER, TOBIAS G. AS ATTORNEY FOR FEIGELSON, DOUG FEIGELSON, DOUG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 100172565): SCHWARTZ, AMANDA SUBSTITUTED FOR SNYDER, TOBIAS G. AS ATTORNEY FOR MYSTRO INC. MYSTRO INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Jul-06-2022 Continued To Nov-23-22 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-27-2022 CONTINUED TO NOV-23-2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100168514) FILED BY DEFENDANT FEIGELSON, DOUG MYSTRO INC. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 14.0 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL OF CROSS-DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67758384) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT ANYRIDE, INC. MORAN, PETER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT TO DEC-29-2021; STIPULATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $870; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: W2221B24F005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL OF DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ENTER STIPULATION TO CHANGE TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT DECLARATION OF TOBIAS G. SNYDER; AND STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CHANGE TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. (TRANSACTION ID # 100148015) FILED BY DEFENDANT FEIGELSON, DOUG MYSTRO INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ENTER STIPULATION TO CHANGE TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100148015) FILED BY DEFENDANT FEIGELSON, DOUG MYSTRO INC.; Fee: $870.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 200043962), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANYRIDE, INC. SERVED NOV-03-2021, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT MYSTRO, INC. F/K/A ANYRIDE WILL DO, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 200040357) TO PLAINTIFF ANYRIDE, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: H2521A30F004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 200040357) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANYRIDE, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 200040357) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANYRIDE, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT MYSTRO, INC. F/K/A ANYRIDE WILL DO, INC. FEIGELSON, DOUG DOES 1-100 NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-02-2022 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-30-2021 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-07-2022; Fee: $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******5689
Case Title:ANYRIDE, INC. VS. MYSTRO, INC. F/K/A ANYRIDE WILL DO, INC. ET AL
Court Date:NOV-10-2022 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Cross-Defendants' Notice Of Motion And Motion For Anti-Slapp Motion Against The Cross-Complaint
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Thursday, November 10, 2022, Line 10,CROSS DEFENDANT'S ANYRIDE, INC. and PETER MORAN'S Motion For Anti-Slapp Motion Against The Cross-Complaint.Off calendar. Purusant to the court's order of October 21, 2022, this case is stayed through November 25, 2022. If the parties wish to re-set this anti-SLAPP motion to strike, they may contact courtroom 302's calendar clerk to have the matter put back on calendar.For the 9:30 a.m. Law & Motion calendar, all attorneys and parties may appear in Department 302 remotely. Remote hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear remotely at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link, or dial the corresponding phone number.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The text of the email shall include the name and contact information, including email address, of the attorney or party who will appear at the hearing. The court no longer provides a court reporter in the Law & Motion Department. Parties may retain their own reporter, who may appear in the courtroom or remotely. A retained reporter must be a California certified court reporter (CSR), for only a CSR's transcript may be used in California courts. If a CSR is being retained, include in your email all of the following: their name, CSR and telephone numbers, and their individual work email address. = (302/RBU)


Case Number:*******5689
Case Title:ANYRIDE, INC. VS. MYSTRO, INC. F/K/A ANYRIDE WILL DO, INC. ET AL
Court Date:MAR-01-2022 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION TO STRIKE Amended COMPLAINT
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Tuesday, March 1, 2022, Line 12 2. DEFENDANTS DOUG FEIGELSON and MYSTRO INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE Amended COMPLAINT.Defendant's motion to strike is denied. Defendants agreed to a liquidated damages provision in a settlement agreement that they now seek to repudiate. Whether the provision is reasonable is for factual development in discovery.Effective Monday, January 3, 2022, for the 9:30 a.m. Law & Motion calendar, all attorneys and parties may appear in Department 302 remotely. Remote hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear remotely at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link, or dial the corresponding phone number.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The text of the email shall include the name and contact information, including email address, of the attorney or party who will appear at the hearing. Counsel for the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the tentative ruling is not contested. = (302/RBU)