This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/09/2016 at 14:24:36 (UTC).

ANTIQUE & SALVAGE LIQUIDATORS, INC. VS. STATE OF CALIFORNIA et al

Case Summary

On 09/10/2009 ANTIQUE SALVAGE LIQUIDATORS, INC filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against STATE OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9804

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

ANTIQUE & SALVAGE LIQUIDATORS, INC.

AMI SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, INC.

Claimant

RED DOT TRADING CO. DBA HI-TEC RECYCLING

Defendants and Respondents

CALIFORNIA INTEGRATED WASTE MANAGEMENT BOARD

DEPARTMENT OF RESOURCES RECYCLING AND RECOVERY (CAL RECYCLE)

DOES 2-100

HUNTS, JEFF

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

DOES 1 THRU 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

FREDKIN, MARK B.

Attorney at MORGAN FRANICH FREDKIN & MARSH

99 Almaden Avenue, Suite 1000

San Jose, CA 95113

Claimant Attorney

STONE, BRET A

Attorney at PALADIN LAW GROUP LLP

1176 Boulevard Way

Walnut Creek, CA 94595

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GETZ, CHARLES WILLIAM

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

1515 Clay St, 20Th Fl

Oakland, CA 94612

LEVINSON, ELLYN SUE

Attorney at DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL

1515 Clay Street, 20Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANTIQUE & SALVAGE LIQUIDATORS, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIA CALIFORNIA INTEGRATED WASTE MANAGEMENT BOARD DOES 1 THRU 100

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PETITIONER ANTIQUE & SALVAGE LIQUIDATORS, INC. AMI SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, INC. SERVED SEP-15-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON RESPONDENT STATE OF CALIFORNIA

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PETITIONER

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PETITIONER ANTIQUE & SALVAGE LIQUIDATORS, INC. AMI SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, INC. SERVED SEP-22-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON RESPONDENT CALIFORNIA INTEGRATED WASTE MANAGEMENT BOARD

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANTIQUE & SALVAGE LIQUIDATORS, INC. AMI SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIA CALIFORNIA INTEGRATED WASTE MANAGEMENT BOARD DEPARTMENT OF RESOURCES RECYCLING AND RECOVERY (CAL RECYCLE) HUNTS, JEFF DOES 2-100

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED (FIRST AMENDED PETITION) TO PLAINTIFF ANTIQUE & SALVAGE LIQUIDATORS, INC.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/ PROHIBITION/ CERTIFICATION AS TO RESPONDENT/DEFENDANT, JEFF HUNTS

Order Setting Case Management Conference

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SENT BY COURT

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-25-2010 CONTINUED TO AUG-13-2010 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA INTEGRATED WASTE MANAGEMENT BOARD

Notice of Time and Place of Trial and Mandatory Settlement Conference

NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON FEB-25-2011 AT 3:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 611. NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR MAR-14-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON AUG-13-2010 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR MAR-14-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER OVERRULING DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

Notice of Rescheduled Mandatory Settlement Conference

SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR FEB-25-2011 CONTINUED TO JUL-01-2011 AT 11:00 AM IN 611. (206)

ORDER

ORDER AND STIPULATION CONTINUING HEARING DATE ON MOTIONS (NO S.A.S.E., COPY IN DEPT. 206'S OUTBOX)

Notice of Settlement Conference

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SENT BY COURT. (206)

MINUTES FOR APR-27-2011 11:00 AM

MINUTES FOR APR-27-2011 11:00 AM FOR DEPT 501

Order for Single Assignment

SINGLE ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE TOMAR MASON FOR ALL PURPOSES. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR MAY-16-2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 606. JUL-18-2011 MASTER CALENDAR COURT IS OFF CALENDAR. MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-01-11 IN DEPT. 611 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. (206)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2012
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR JAN-07-2013 VACATED. DISMISSAL FILED ON 9/25/12. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2012
  • JURY FEES OF 150.00 FOR TRANSACTION W2111623J022 FORFEITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND RELEASE FILED AT INSISTENCE OF LITIGANT ( NOT ORGINAL SIGNATURES) FILED BY DEFENDANT DEPARTMENT OF RESOURCES RECYCLING AND RECOVERY (CAL RECYCLE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PETITIONER ANTIQUE & SALVAGE LIQUIDATORS, INC. AMI SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JAN-07-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUN-22-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANTIQUE & SALVAGE LIQUIDATORS, INC. AMI SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, INC. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR SETTING OF TRIAL DATE HEARING SET FOR JUN-22-2012 AT 02:00 PM IN DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - EX PARTE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND SET MATTER FOR FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER THEREON.

    Read MoreRead Less
106 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2009
  • MINI-MINUTES FOR DEC-17-2009 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2009
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA INTEGRATED WASTE MANAGEMENT BOARD DEMURRER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/ PROHIBITION/ CERTIFICATION CONTINUED FROM DEC-17-2009 TO LAW AND MOTION AT JAN-28-2010, 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 302. NO APPEARANCES ON THIS MATTER. THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING AS FOLLOWS: CONTINUED TO 1/28/10 PURSUANT TO STIPULATION. JUDGE: CHARLOTTE WALTER WOOLARD, REPORTER: TAMRA KEEN, CSR #5404

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2009
  • CORRECTED NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING, PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY RESPONDENT CALIFORNIA INTEGRATED WASTE MANAGEMENT BOARD HEARING SET FOR JAN-28-2010 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2009
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING FILED BY RESPONDENT CALIFORNIA INTEGRATED WASTE MANAGEMENT BOARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2009
  • STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEMURRER FILED BY CALIFORNIA INTEGRATED WASTE MANAGEMENT BOARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2009
  • DEMURRER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/ PROHIBITION/ CERTIFICATION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO STRIKE; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA INTEGRATED WASTE MANAGEMENT BOARD HEARING SET FOR DEC-17-2009 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PETITIONER ANTIQUE & SALVAGE LIQUIDATORS, INC. AMI SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, INC. SERVED SEP-22-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON RESPONDENT CALIFORNIA INTEGRATED WASTE MANAGEMENT BOARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PETITIONER ANTIQUE & SALVAGE LIQUIDATORS, INC. AMI SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, INC. SERVED SEP-15-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON RESPONDENT STATE OF CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2009
  • PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/ PROHIBITION/ CERTIFICATION FILED BY PETITIONER ANTIQUE & SALVAGE LIQUIDATORS, INC. AMI SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, INC. AS TO RESPONDENT STATE OF CALIFORNIA CALIFORNIA INTEGRATED WASTE MANAGEMENT BOARD DOES 1 THRU 100 JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ANTIQUE & SALVAGE LIQUIDATORS, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIA CALIFORNIA INTEGRATED WASTE MANAGEMENT BOARD DOES 1 THRU 100

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******9804
Case Title:ANTIQUE & SALVAGE LIQUIDATORS, INC. VS. STATE OF CALIFORNIA et al
Court Date:FEB-15-2011 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Discovery
Rulings:Set for hearing on Tuesday, February 15, 2011, line 5, DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA INTEGRATED WASTE MANAGEMENT BOARD'S Motion To Compel Discovery. OFF CALENDAR PER MOVING PARTY. =(302/LMG)


Case Number:*******9804
Case Title:ANTIQUE & SALVAGE LIQUIDATORS, INC. VS. STATE OF CALIFORNIA et al
Court Date:APR-12-2011 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn To Bifuricate/Sever Trial
Rulings:Set for hearing on Tuesday, April 12, 2011, line 10, DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA INTEGRATED WASTE MANAGEMENT BOARD'S Motion To Bifuricate/Sever Trial. Hearing required. =(302/LMG)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANTIQUE & SALVAGE LIQUIDATORS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMI SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRET A. STONE