This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 07/07/2023 at 04:07:03 (UTC).

ANTHONY JON MARTINELLI VS. KEVIN MILDENBERGER ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/12/2022 ANTHONY JON MARTINELLI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KEVIN MILDENBERGER. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2267

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINELLI, ANTHONY JON

Defendants

CANUS CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA GENERAL STOCK CORPORATION

DOES 1-25, INCLUSIVE

MILDENBERGER, KEVIN , AN INDIVIDUAL

CANUS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANCHEZ, DREW M.

Defendant Attorney

GRUCCIO, RICHARD V

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100181683), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINELLI, ANTHONY JON SERVED NOV-03-2022, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE NOV-04-2022 AS TO DEFENDANT CANUS CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA GENERAL STOCK CORPORATION

Defendant Canus Corporations Answer to Plaintiff Anthony Jon Martinell

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68833127) FILED BY DEFENDANT CANUS CORPORATION

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100197531) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINELLI, ANTHONY JON SERVED APR-13-2023, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT MILDENBERGER, KEVIN , AN INDIVIDUAL

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUN-06-2023 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) KEVIN MILDENBERGER. THE APR-26-2023 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-15-2023 CONTINUED TO APR-26-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Complaint

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100179027) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINELLI, ANTHONY JON AS TO DEFENDANT MILDENBERGER, KEVIN , AN INDIVIDUAL CANUS CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA GENERAL STOCK CORPORATION DOES 1-25, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-15-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-12-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-21-2023

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

ORDER GRANTING WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 AS TO PLAINTIFF MARTINELLI, ANTHONY JON

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUN-03-2024 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUL-05-2023 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice of Change of Address and Request to Update Proof of Service

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 70215125) FILED BY ATTORNEY GRUCCIO, RICHARD V

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100203086) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINELLI, ANTHONY JON JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 70149515) FILED BY DEFENDANT MILDENBERGER, KEVIN , AN INDIVIDUAL CANUS CORPORATION JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

Order Setting Case Management Conference from Order to Show Cause

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR JUL-05-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR THE SUBMISSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS. THE JUN-06-2023 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Defendant Kevin Mildenbergers Answer to Plaintiff Anthony Jon Martinel

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 69981934) FILED BY DEFENDANT MILDENBERGER, KEVIN , AN INDIVIDUAL

Plaintiffs Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100196865) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINELLI, ANTHONY JON JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

Defendant Canus Corporations Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 69710680) FILED BY DEFENDANT CANUS CORPORATION JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

Plaintiffs Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100191107) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINELLI, ANTHONY JON JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 69160404) FILED BY DEFENDANT CANUS CORPORATION JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney Within Firm

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM (TRANSACTION ID # 69004134) FILED BY DEFENDANT CANUS CORPORATION

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/03/2024

HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR JURY; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Jun-21-2023 Set For Trial On Jun-03-24 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 206; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUN-03-2024 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUL-05-2023 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 70215125) FILED BY ATTORNEY GRUCCIO, RICHARD V

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100203086) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINELLI, ANTHONY JON JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 70149515) FILED BY DEFENDANT MILDENBERGER, KEVIN , AN INDIVIDUAL CANUS CORPORATION JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023

HearingMatter(s): ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar May-12-2023 Continued To Jul-05-23 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR JUL-05-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR THE SUBMISSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS. THE JUN-06-2023 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023

FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: Y0223509F005

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 69981934) FILED BY DEFENDANT MILDENBERGER, KEVIN , AN INDIVIDUAL; Fee: $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
01/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAMENDED CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET (TRANSACTION ID # 100188110) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINELLI, ANTHONY JON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68833127) FILED BY DEFENDANT CANUS CORPORATION; Fee: $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100181683), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINELLI, ANTHONY JON SERVED NOV-03-2022, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE NOV-04-2022 AS TO DEFENDANT CANUS CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA GENERAL STOCK CORPORATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 100179422) TO PLAINTIFF MARTINELLI, ANTHONY JON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2022

FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Payment Type: IFP; Receipt Number: R5222A13F003

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2022

DocketREQUEST PENDING TO WAIVE COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (SEALED DOCUMENT) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINELLI, ANTHONY JON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 100179027) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINELLI, ANTHONY JON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100179027) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTINELLI, ANTHONY JON AS TO DEFENDANT MILDENBERGER, KEVIN , AN INDIVIDUAL CANUS CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA GENERAL STOCK CORPORATION DOES 1-25, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-15-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-12-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-21-2023; Fee: IFP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketORDER GRANTING WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 AS TO PLAINTIFF MARTINELLI, ANTHONY JON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less