This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 11:44:13 (UTC).

ANNETTE YIP VS. AAA FLAG & BANNER MFG. CO., INC. et al

Case Summary

On 04/05/2013 ANNETTE YIP filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AAA FLAG BANNER MFG CO , INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0391

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YIP, ANNETTE

Defendants

AAA FLAG & BANNER MFG. CO., INC.

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZINN, CARTER M.

Attorney at THE ZINN LAW FIRM

55 Francisco St.

San Francisco, CA 94133

Defendant Attorney

CAULFIELD, BARBARA AN E

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DENNIS P. ISAAC

Two Rincon Center, 121 Spear St, Ste 410

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT AAA FLAG & BANNER MFG. CO., INC. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 2.0 DAYS

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUN-02-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON OCT-09-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT AAA FLAG & BANNER MFG. CO., INC.

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF YIP, ANNETTE AS TO DEFENDANT AAA FLAG & BANNER MFG. CO., INC. DOES 1 TO 100 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-04-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-04-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-20-2013 (Fee:450.00)

Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR OCT-21-2014 NOT HELD AND REMOVED. CASE SETTLED PRIOR TO CONFERENCE. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON DEC-30-2014 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (1.0)

ORDER

ORDER RE THE PARTIES' STIPULATED, JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE

Continued Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF DEC-30-2014 CONTINUED TO FEB-10-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT AAA FLAG & BANNER MFG. CO., INC. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF YIP, ANNETTE

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF FEB-10-2015 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION; (TRANSACTION ID # 14355068) FILED BY PLAINTIFF YIP, ANNETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 14355068)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF DEC-30-2014 CONTINUED TO FEB-10-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR OCT-21-2014 NOT HELD AND REMOVED. CASE SETTLED PRIOR TO CONFERENCE. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON DEC-30-2014 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (1.0)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR NOV-10-2014 - CASE SETTLED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF YIP, ANNETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT AAA FLAG & BANNER MFG. CO., INC. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 2.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF YIP, ANNETTE SERVED AUG-20-2014, MAIL ON DEFENDANT AAA FLAG & BANNER MFG. CO., INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF YIP, ANNETTE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2013
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANT AAA FLAG & BANNER MFG. CO., INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT IS DENIED. PARAGRAPHS 16-17 SUFFICIENTLY ALLEGE THAT DEFENDANT ACTED WITH A CONSCIOUS DISREGARD FOR THE SAFETY OF OTHERS. PARAGRAPH 6 SUFFICIENTLY PLEADS RATIFICATION. DEFENDANT'S MOTION RAISES FACTUAL ISSUES. ORDER SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE: ERNEST GOLDSMITH, CLERK: LESLEY FISCELLA, REPORTER: ANTHONY VAUGHN #6185.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR JUN-14-2013 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, NO APPEARANCE ON THIS MATTER. RULING: THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING. DEFENDANT AAA FLAG & BANNER MFG. CO., INC'S MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT IS CONTINUED TO JULY 18, 2013 TO GIVE AAA FLAG & BANNER MFG. CO., INC. THE OPPORTUNITY TO COMPLY WITH LOCAL RULE 2.6B AND 2.6C. AAA FLAG & BANNER MFG. CO., INC. MUST DELIVER COURTESY COPIES OF THE MOVING PAPERS AND THE OPERATIVE PLEADING TO DEPARTMENT 302, WITH A COVER LETTER STATING THE NEW HEARING DATE, NO LATER THAN JUNE 14, 2013 AT 4:00 PM OR THE MOTION WILL BE DENIED. ANY EXHIBIT MUST BE SEPARATED BY AN EXHIBIT TAB PER CRC 3.1110(F). THE COURT HAS COURTESY COPIES OF THE OPPOSITION PAPERS. JUDGE: MARLA J. MILLER, CLERK: LESLEY FISCELLA, REPORTER: ANTHONY VAUGHN #6185.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • POS OF OPPOS. TO MTN TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF YIP, ANNETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • OPPOSITION TO MTN TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF YIP, ANNETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY DEFENDANT AAA FLAG & BANNER MFG. CO., INC. (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT AAA FLAG & BANNER MFG. CO., INC. HEARING SET FOR JUN-14-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF YIP, ANNETTE SERVED APR-17-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT AAA FLAG & BANNER MFG. CO., INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF YIP, ANNETTE AS TO DEFENDANT AAA FLAG & BANNER MFG. CO., INC. DOES 1 TO 100 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-04-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-04-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-20-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******0391
Case Title:ANNETTE YIP VS. AAA FLAG & BANNER MFG. CO., INC. et al
Court Date:JUL-18-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT
Rulings:Matter on Calendar for Thursday, July 18, 2013, Line 19, DEFENDANT AAA FLAG & BANNER MFG. CO., INC.'s MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT.The motion is denied. Paragraphs 16-17 sufficiently allege that defendant acted with a conscious disregard for the safety of others. Paragraph 6 sufficiently pleads ratification. Defendant's motion raises factual issues. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order with the name and address of the prevailing party's counsel or the prevailing party if pro per in the top left of the first page of proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/EHG)


Case Number:*******0391
Case Title:ANNETTE YIP VS. AAA FLAG & BANNER MFG. CO., INC. et al
Court Date:JUN-14-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT
Rulings:Set for hearing on Friday, June 14, 2013, Line 18, DEFENDANT AAA FLAG & BANNER MFG. CO., INC'S MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINTContinued to July 18, 2013 to give AAA Flag & Banner Mfg. Co., Inc. the opportunity to comply with Local Rule 2.6B and 2.6C. AAA Flag & Banner Mfg. Co., Inc. must deliver courtesy copies of the moving papers and the operative pleading to Department 302, with a cover letter stating the new hearing date, no later than June 14, 2013 at 4:00 pm or the motion will be denied. Any exhibit must be separated by an exhibit tab per CRC 3.1110(f). The court has courtesy copies of the opposition papers. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. =302/MJM


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AAA FLAG & BANNER MFG. CO. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Caulfield, Barbara A.