This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/11/2016 at 14:53:11 (UTC).

ANNETTE HORNSBY VS. NEW CENTURY MORTGAGE CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2012 ANNETTE HORNSBY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NEW CENTURY MORTGAGE CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0585

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

HORNSBY, ANNETTE

Vallejo, CA 94591

Defendants and Respondents

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE

FIRST AMERICAN LOAN STAR TRUSTEE SERVICES

NEW CENTURY MORTGAGE CORPORATION

LI, VICTOR

ALL PERSONS CLAIMING BY AND THROUGH, OR UNDER SUCH PERSONS, AND ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO NAMED AS DOES

JIANG, YAO LUN

LITTON LOAN SERVICING, LP (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS LITTON LOAN SERVICING)

LITTON LOAN SERVICING

FIRST AMERICAN TRUSTEE SERVICING SOLUTIONS, LLC FORMERLY FIRST AMERICAN LOANSTAR TRUSTEE SERVICING SOLUTIONS, LLC

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE FOR GSAMP TRUST 2004-NCI, MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2004-NC1 (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE)

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.

DOES 1-100

FIRST AMERICAN TRUSTEE SERVICING SOLUTIONS LLC, F.K.A. FIRST AMERICAN LOANSTAR TRUSTEE SERVICES LLC

DOES 1-99

Respondents and Defendants

LI, VICTOR

JIANG, YAO LUN

LITTON LOAN SERVICING, LP (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS LITTON LOAN SERVICING)

FIRST AMERICAN TRUSTEE SERVICING SOLUTIONS, LLC FORMERLY FIRST AMERICAN LOANSTAR TRUSTEE SERVICING SOLUTIONS, LLC

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE FOR GSAMP TRUST 2004-NCI, MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2004-NC1 (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

DOOLITTLE, WALLACE C.

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF WALLACE C. DOOLITTLE

1260 B St. Ste. 220

Hayward, CA 94541

Defendant Attorneys

LOWENTHAL, JEFFREY HOWARD

Attorney at STEYER LOWENTHAL BOODROOKAS ALVAREZ & SMITH LLP

One California Street, 3Rd Fl.

San Francisco, CA 94111

HOUSER, ERIC D

Attorney at HOUSER & ALLISON, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

9970 Research Drive

Irvine, CA 92618

WECHSLER, GLENN HARLAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES GLENN H WECHSLER

1646 North California Blvd, Ste 450

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

 

Court Documents

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO VACATE HEARING DATES FOR DEMURRER AND MOTION TO EXPUNGE THE LIS PENDENS BY DEFTS VICTOR LI AND YAO LUN JIANG AND REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF HORNSBY, ANNETTE (Fee:60.00)

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO FILE A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AND POS FILED BY PLAINTIFF HORNSBY, ANNETTE (Fee:60.00)

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HORNSBY, ANNETTE AS TO DEFENDANT DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE FOR GSAMP TRUST 2004-NCI, MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2004-NC1 (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE) DOES 1-100 FIRST AMERICAN TRUSTEE SERVICING SOLUTIONS, LLC FORMERLY FIRST AMERICAN LOANSTAR TRUSTEE SERVICING SOLUTIONS, LLC

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENNDED COMPLAINT AND MTN TO EXPUNGE NTC OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (LIS PENDENS) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HORNSBY, ANNETTE

RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONS TO CLERK'S/REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT

RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ADDITIONS TO CLERK'S/REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT, TRAN # W2814523R003, TAG # 032641 FILED BY RESPONDENT LITTON LOAN SERVICING, LP (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS LITTON LOAN SERVICING) DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE FOR GSAMP TRUST 2004-NCI, MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2004-NC1 (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE) (Fee:325.00)

Order Setting Case Management Conference from Order to Show Cause

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR APR-17-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE AND SERVE ORDERS RE: DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE. THE JAN-29-2013 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PLTF'S RESPONSE TO DEFS MTN AND NTC OF MTN TO COMPEL FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLTF ANNETTE HORNSBY, EXCUSABLE NEGLECT, MEMO OF PTS AND AUTH, DEC BY PLTF FILED BY PLAINTIFF HORNSBY, ANNETTE

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

MTN FOR RECONSIDERATION RE ORDER GRANTING MTN FOR SUMM JUDGMNT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HORNSBY, ANNETTE HEARING SET FOR JAN-09-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON EX PARTE APPLICATION AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF HORNSBY, ANNETTE

138 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • DocketAPPEAL RECORD CERTIFIED TO THE COURT OF APPEAL - 5 VOLS CT, NO RT (APPEAL FILED 3/28/14, A141450 DIV 5)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • DocketCOSTS OF PREPARATION ON APPEAL DEPOSITED BY RESPONDENT FIRST AMERICAN TRUSTEE SERVICING SOLUTIONS, LLC FORMERLY FIRST AMERICAN LOANSTAR TRUSTEE SERVICING SOLUTIONS, LLC (Fee:1180.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ESTIMATE OF COST OF APPEAL RECORD SENT TO RESPONDENT, ESTIMATED COST $1,180.00 [FIRST AMERICAN TRUSTEE SERVICING SOLUTIONS ETAL]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • DocketCOSTS OF PREPARATION ON APPEAL DEPOSITED BY APPELLANT HORNSBY, ANNETTE (Fee:2260.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-16-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR, JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ESTIMATE OF COST OF APPEAL RECORD SENT TO RESPONDENT, ESTIMATED COST $1,180.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ESTIMATE OF COST OF APPEAL RECORD SENT TO APPELLANT, ESTIMATED COST $2,260.00 [2360 - 100]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE MISSING DOCUMENT DATED 06/13/14, STEYER LOWENTHAL'S RESPONSES LETTER DATE 06/16/14 FILED BY DEFENDANT LI, VICTOR JIANG, YAO LUN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE MISSING DOCUMENTS [RESPONDENT VICTOR LI]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
270 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF HORNSBY, ANNETTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-10-2012 CONTINUED TO DEC-12-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF HORNSBY, ANNETTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPOS OF COMPLT, TRO, DECL, P&A FILED BY PLAINTIFF HORNSBY, ANNETTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPOS OF COMPLAINT, DECL, P&A FILED BY PLAINTIFF HORNSBY, ANNETTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF HORNSBY, ANNETTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF OPPPOS TO OSC FILED BY PLAINTIFF HORNSBY, ANNETTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF PLTF IN SUPPORT OF APPLCIATION FOR TRO FILED BY PLAINTIFF HORNSBY, ANNETTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HORNSBY, ANNETTE AS TO DEFENDANT NEW CENTURY MORTGAGE CORPORATION LITTON LOAN SERVICING DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC. FIRST AMERICAN LOAN STAR TRUSTEE SERVICES ALL PERSONS CLAIMING BY AND THROUGH, OR UNDER SUCH PERSONS, AND ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO NAMED AS DOES 1 TO 20 NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-10-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-06-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-25-2012 (Fee:410.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

O 0 3 N

Jeffrey H. Lowenthal (State Bar No. 111763)

Edward Egan Smith (State Bar No. 169792)

STEYER LOWENTHAL BOODROOKAS ALVAREZ & SMITH LLP

One California Street, Third Floor

San Francisco, California 94111

Telephone: (415) 421-3400

Facsimile: (415) 421-2234

E-mail: jlowenthal @steyerlaw.com R A esmith@steyerlaw.com

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

ANNETTE HORNSBY, | Case No. CGC 1 Plaintiff,

[PROP ORDER SUSTAINING

V. DE R TO SECOND AMENDED

LAINT BY VICTOR LI AND YAO LUN DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST | JIANG COMPANY AS TRUSTEE FOR GSAMP

TRUST 2004-NC1, MORTGAGE PASS-

THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES Date: ~ March 19, 2014 2004-NC1; FIRST AMERICAN Time: 9:30 am. TRUSTEE SERVICING SOLUTIONS, Dept: 501

LLC FORMERLY FIRST AMERICAN LOANSTAR TRUSTEE SERVICING

SOLUTIONS, LLC; VICTOR LI, and

DOES 1-99,

Defendants.

14148952 - OLDR.LIJIANG

14148952 - OLDR.LIJIANG The demurrer of defendants Victor Li and Yao Lun Jiang ("Defendants"), named herein as DOE and DOE 2, respectively, to Plaintiff Annette Hornsby's Second Amended Complaint came on for hearing on March 19, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. in Department 501 of the above-entitled Court. Having considered the moving and opposition papers on file herein, and the arguments of i counsel, and good cause appearing therefor,

The demurrer of defendants Victor Li and Yao Lun Jiang ("Defendants"), named herein as DOE and DOE 2, respectively, to Plaintiff Annette Hornsby's Second Amended Complaint came on for hearing on March 19, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. in Department 501 of the above-entitled Court. Having considered the moving and opposition papers on file herein, and the arguments of i counsel, and good cause appearing therefor,

IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows:

Defendants' Demurrer To Second Amended Complaint SUSTAINED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND.

Dated:

RONALD E. QUIDAGCHAY

1414895.2 - OLDR.LIJIANG 1

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******0585
Case Title:ANNETTE HORNSBY VS. NEW CENTURY MORTGAGE CORPORATION et al
Court Date:JAN-21-2014 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion To Expunge Notice Of Pendency Of Action (Lis Pendens)
Rulings:Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Tuesday, January 21, 2014, line 13.DEFENDANT VICTOR LI, YAO JIANG Notice Of Motion To Expunge Notice Of Pendency Of Action (Lis Pendens).Continued to February 11, 2014 per Court's January 16, 2014 order. = (501/REQ)


Case Number:*******0585
Case Title:ANNETTE HORNSBY VS. NEW CENTURY MORTGAGE CORPORATION et al
Court Date:JAN-16-2014 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion To Expunge Notice Of Pendency Of Action (Lis Pendens)
Rulings:Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Wednesday, January 16, 2014, line 3. (part 2 of 3)DEFENDANT VICTOR LI, YAO JIANG Notice Of Motion To Expunge Notice Of Pendency Of Action (Lis Pendens):Hearing Required re CCP1005. = (501/REQ)


Case Number:*******0585
Case Title:ANNETTE HORNSBY VS. NEW CENTURY MORTGAGE CORPORATION et al
Court Date:JAN-09-2014 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Plaintiff'S Motion For Reconsideration Re Order Granting Summary Judgment To Defendant Deutsche Bank
Rulings:Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Thursday, January 09, 2014 line 3(part 3 of 3).Plaintiff'S Motion For Reconsideration Re Order Granting Summary Judgment To Defendant Deutsche Bank.DENIED. Motion is untimely per CCP 1005 and judgment has been entered on December 19, 2013. = (501/REQ)


Case Number:*******0585
Case Title:ANNETTE HORNSBY VS. NEW CENTURY MORTGAGE CORPORATION et al
Court Date:DEC-19-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Ntc Of Mtn For Terminating And Monetary Sanctions For Pltf'S Failure To Obey Court Order To Provide Discovery
Rulings:Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Thursday, December 19, 2013, line 3. DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TRUSTEE SERVICING SOLUTIONS Notice Of Motion For Terminating And Monetary Sanctions For Plaintiff'S Failure To Obey Court Order To Provide Discovery.GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Motion for terminating sanctions is DENIED. Monetary sanctions of $1,156 are granted to be paid within 10 days of notice of entry of order. Plaintiff shall provide discovery responses no later than December 30, 2013. Defendant to prepare order and serve it by overnight mail no later than December 20, 2013. = (501/REQ)


Case Number:*******0585
Case Title:ANNETTE HORNSBY VS. NEW CENTURY MORTGAGE CORPORATION et al
Court Date:DEC-04-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Ntc Of Mtn For Terminating And Monetary Sanctions For Pltf'S Failure To Obey Court Order To Provide Discovery
Rulings:Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Wednesday, December 04, 2013, line 3. DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TRUSTEE SERVICING SOLUTIONS Ntc Of Mtn For Terminating And Monetary Sanctions For Pltf'S Failure To Obey Court Order To Provide Discovery.Continued to December 19, 2013 to be heard with other pending motion. = (501/REQ)


Case Number:*******0585
Case Title:ANNETTE HORNSBY VS. NEW CENTURY MORTGAGE CORPORATION et al
Court Date:SEP-24-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn For Leave To File 2nd Amended Compl; Memo Of Pts And Auth In Support Of Mtn
Rulings:Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Tuesday, September 24, 2013, line 1. PLAINTIFF ANNETTE HORNSBY's Motion For Leave To File 2nd Amended ComplaintGRANTED. Plaintiff may file Second Amended Complaint naming only Victor Li as Doe defendant. Plaintiff shall file her Second Amended Complaint no later than September 27, 2013 by 4 p.m. = (501/HMD)


Case Number:*******0585
Case Title:ANNETTE HORNSBY VS. NEW CENTURY MORTGAGE CORPORATION et al
Court Date:SEP-18-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn For Leave To File 2nd Amended Compl; Memo Of Pts And Auth In Support Of Mtn
Rulings:Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Wednesday, September 18, 2013, line 2. PLAINTIFF ANNETTE HORNSBY's Motion For Leave To File 2nd Amended ComplaintContinued to September 24, 2013. Moving party is ordered to comply with SFLR 2.6B and provide courtesy copies of the moving papers to Department 501 no later than September 17, 2013 with a cover letter reflecting new hearing date. = (501/PJB)


Case Number:*******0585
Case Title:ANNETTE HORNSBY VS. NEW CENTURY MORTGAGE CORPORATION et al
Court Date:SEP-17-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn To Compel Discovery Responses From Pltf And Req. For Monetary Sanctions Agains Pltf In The Amount Of $1187.50
Rulings:Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Tuesday, September 17, 2013, line 4. -DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TRUSTEE'S Motion To Compel Discovery Responses From Plaintiff And Request For Monetary Sanctions Agains Plaintiff In The Amount Of $1187.50.Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses from Plaintiff and Request for Monetary Sanctions is GRANTED as follows: (1) Requests for Admissions are deemed admitted; (2) Plaintiff shall provide responses to Special Interrogatories -Set One, and Form Interrogatories-Set One, without objections to be received by Defendant's Counsel no later than September 30, 2013; (3) Plaintiff shall pay Defendant's counsel $470 within 10 days of Notice of Entry of this Order. = (501/PJB)


Case Number:*******0585
Case Title:ANNETTE HORNSBY VS. NEW CENTURY MORTGAGE CORPORATION et al
Court Date:AUG-07-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn For Leave To File Second Amended Complaint
Rulings:Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Wednesday, August 7, line 3. PLAINTIFF ANNETTE HORNSBY's Motion For Leave To File Second Amended ComplaintDENIED. Untimely per CCP 1005. No OST on file. = (501/REQ)


Case Number:*******0585
Case Title:ANNETTE HORNSBY VS. NEW CENTURY MORTGAGE CORPORATION et al
Court Date:APR-23-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION TO STRIKE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Rulings:Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Tuesday, April 23, 2013, line 1 - DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TRUSTEE SERVICING SOLUTIONS MOTION TO STRIKE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT.First American Trustee Servicing Solutions' Motion to Strike First Amended Complaint. Hearing Required. =(501/EHG)


Case Number:*******0585
Case Title:ANNETTE HORNSBY VS. NEW CENTURY MORTGAGE CORPORATION et al
Court Date:APR-02-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Rulings:Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Tuesday, April 2, 2013, line 3: DEFENDANTS DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., AND LITTON LOAN SERVICING, LP'S DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINTContinued to April 23, 2013 to be heard with other pending motions. = (501/REQ)


Case Number:*******0585
Case Title:ANNETTE HORNSBY VS. NEW CENTURY MORTGAGE CORPORATION et al
Court Date:MAR-20-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Rulings:Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Wednesday, March 20, 2013, line 2. DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TRUSTEE SERVICING SOLUTIONS' DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT.Continued to April 23, 2013. Moving party to provide copy of reply; opposing pary to provide copy of opposition with cover letter reflecting new date no later than April 5, 2013. = (501/REQ)


Case Number:*******0585
Case Title:ANNETTE HORNSBY VS. NEW CENTURY MORTGAGE CORPORATION et al
Court Date:JAN-08-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Rulings:Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Tuesday, January 08, 2013, line 2 - DEFENDANT MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.,and LITTON LOAN SERVICING, LP's DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT.Sustain with leave to amend no opposition. =(501/REQ)


Case Number:*******0585
Case Title:ANNETTE HORNSBY VS. NEW CENTURY MORTGAGE CORPORATION et al
Court Date:DEC-14-2012 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Friday, December 14, 2012, Line 13, DEFENDANTS MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., LITTON LOAN SERVICING, LP, DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT.Transferred to Department 501, the Housing Court, to be heard on January 8, 2013. MERS is to provide courtesy copies of its moving papers and the operative complaint per Local Rule 2.6B and 2.6C to Department 501, with a cover letter stating the new hearing date, no later than December 14, 2012 at 4:00 pm. = (302/MJM)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST AMERICAN LOANSTAR TRUSTEE SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where NEW CENTURY MORTGAGE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRST AMERICAN TRUSTEE SERVICING SOLU- is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant