This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 11/13/2017 at 10:12:15 (UTC).

ANNETTE HORNSBY VS. COMMON INTEREST MANAGEMENT et al

Case Summary

On 05/08/2012 ANNETTE HORNSBY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against COMMON INTEREST MANAGEMENT. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KATHERINE FEINSTEIN, CYNTHIA M. LEE, JAMES J. MCBRIDE, LILLIAN K. SING, RICHARD B. ULMER, JOHN K. STEWART and MARLA J. MILLER. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0590

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

KATHERINE FEINSTEIN

CYNTHIA M. LEE

JAMES J. MCBRIDE

LILLIAN K. SING

RICHARD B. ULMER

JOHN K. STEWART

MARLA J. MILLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HORNSBY, ANNETTE2319 BENNINGTON DRIVEVALLEJO, CA 94591

HORNSBY, ANNETTE

Vallejo, CA 94591

Defendants

COMMON INTEREST MANAGEMENT

DOES 1 TO 100

JOHN STEWART MANAGEMENT COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROONEY, MICHAEL P.

Attorney at MICHAEL PATRICK ROONEY

580 California Street, 16Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant Attorney

CHEN, DAVID W.

Attorney at STRATMAN, PATTERSON & HUNTER

Po Box 258829

Oklahoma City, OK 73125-8829

 

Court Documents

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR NOV-20-2012 CONTINUED TO FEB-26-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE NOV-20-2012 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE LIST; PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST; PROOF OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL SERVICE SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HORNSBY, ANNETTE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

NOTICE

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION; PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF HORNSBY, ANNETTE

Defendant, Common Interest Management, John Stewart Management Companys Motion in Limine to Exclude Claim For General Damages in Breach of Contract Claim

MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE CLAIM FOR GENERAL DAMAGES IN BREACH OF CONTRACT CLAIM (TRANSACTION ID # 56049971) FILED BY DEFENDANT COMMON INTEREST MANAGEMENT JOHN STEWART MANAGEMENT COMPANY

Motion in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs Lay Witness Opinion Testimony - Renewed Motion

MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFFS LAY WITNESS OPINION TESTIMONY - RENEWED MOTION (TRANSACTION ID # 56112798) FILED BY DEFENDANT COMMON INTEREST MANAGEMENT JOHN STEWART MANAGEMENT COMPANY

Order Setting Mandatory Settlement Conference

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR JUL-15-2014 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT. 212 WITH CONFERENCE OFFICER BARRI BONAPART.

Memorandum of Costs

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS, $18,020.00 TOTAL COSTS, MATURE DATE NOV-24-2014,, (TRANSACTION ID # 56284058) FILED BY DEFENDANT COMMON INTEREST MANAGEMENT JOHN STEWART MANAGEMENT COMPANY

Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Harm and or Damages to Persons Other Than Plantiff

MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF HARM AND OR DAMAGES TO PERSONS OTHER THAN PLANTIFF (TRANSACTION ID # 56050000) FILED BY DEFENDANT COMMON INTEREST MANAGEMENT JOHN STEWART MANAGEMENT COMPANY

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2014
  • DocketPayment : SUBSEQUENT JURY FEE; Amount : $400; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W3614A10J002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • DocketPayment : SUBSEQUENT JURY FEE; Amount : $400; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W3614A10J001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • DocketPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B4914625M004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • DocketPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1714122M016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • DocketPayment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : R8013411J002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • DocketPayment : MOTION; Payment Type : NO FEE; Receipt Number : W2112C21M027

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • DocketPayment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2112C21R026

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • DocketPayment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $900; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2112C21F025

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • DocketPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $410; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2012508F003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING COSTS TO PREVAILING PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
100 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2013
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR JAN-29-2013 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY DEFENDANT COMMON INTEREST MANAGEMENT JOHN STEWART MANAGEMENT COMPANY HEARING SET FOR JAN-29-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • DocketCOURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY DEFENDANT COMMON INTEREST MANAGEMENT JOHN STEWART MANAGEMENT COMPANY (Fee:$30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • DocketDEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY DEFENDANT COMMON INTEREST MANAGEMENT JOHN STEWART MANAGEMENT COMPANY HEARING SET FOR JAN-29-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:$900.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR NOV-20-2012 CONTINUED TO FEB-26-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE NOV-20-2012 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPOSNE TO OSC FILED BY PLAINTIFF HORNSBY, ANNETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF HORNSBY, ANNETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR NOV-20-2012 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 2:00 PM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE OCT-10-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HORNSBY, ANNETTE AS TO DEFENDANT COMMON INTEREST MANAGEMENT JOHN STEWART MANAGEMENT COMPANY DOES 1 TO 100 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-10-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-09-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-25-2012 (Fee:$410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

DAVID W. CHEN, ESQ. — State Bar No. 184071

STRATMAN, PATTERSON & HUNTER ELECTRONICALLY Mailing Address | o |

P.O. Box 258829, Oklahoma City, OK 73125-8829 ~ FILED Physical Address Superior Court of California,

1503 14th Street. Suwited00 CountyofSanFrancisco Oakland, CA 94612-1913 SEP 17 2014 Phone: (510) 457-3440 Clerk of the Court Fax: (510) 238-8968 BY: ALISON AGBAY

' Deputy Clerk Attomey for Defendants,

COMMON INTEREST MANAGEMENT, JOHN STEWART MANAGEMENT COMPANY

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

ANNETTE HORNSBY, Case No.: CGC-12-520590

UNLIMITED JURISDICTION

Plaintiff,

MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE

VS. EVIDENCE OF SUBSEQUENT

COMPLAINTS AND/OR INCIDENTS

COMMON INTEREST MANAGEMENT, JOHN | INVOLVING THE PREMISES STEWART MANAGEMENT COMPANY, ET AL., . Motion #5

Defendants. Trial Date: September 22, 2014 Time: 9:30 a.m. Dept. 206

TO THE COURT AND ALL INTERESTED PARTIES:

Defendants, COMMON INTEREST MANAGEMENT, JOHN STEWART MANAGEMENT COMPANY, move the court, in limine, as follows:

That there bé no mention or introduction of any complaints to the defendants, or continued problems with leaks and/or mold at the premises, which occurred after plaintiff lost title to her property via foreclosure on December 2009. Plaintiff’s investment unit at 950 Harrison Street, SF was foreclosed based on her failure to pay the mortgage by New Century Mortgage Corporation and/or Deutsche Bank around December 2009.

Deposition of Annette Hornsby (Page 109:5 to 109:10)

STEWART MANAGEMENT COMPANY

Re: Hornsby v. Common Interest Management. et a. Case Number: CGC-12-520590

SERVICE LIST

| Mmhael PatanRooney

Michael Rooney Law Office

580 California Street, 16th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Attorney for Plaintiff, ANNETTE HORNSBY Phone: (415) 533-0282

Fax:

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******0590
Case Title:ANNETTE HORNSBY VS. COMMON INTEREST MANAGEMENT et al
Court Date:JAN-29-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Tuesday, January 29, 2013, Line 8, DEFENDANTS COMMON INTEREST MANAGEMENT & JOHN STEWART MANAGEMENT COMPANY'S MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT.Granted with 20 days leave to amend. No opposition filed. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order with the name and address of the prevailing party's counsel or the prevailing party if pro per in the top left of the first page of proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/MJM)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMON INTEREST MANAGAMENT SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where THE JOHN STEWART COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROONEY, MICHAEL PATRICK