This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 09/15/2019 at 19:12:05 (UTC).

ANITA B. YOUNGBLOOD DDS VS. MICHAEL CRESCI et al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2010 ANITA B YOUNGBLOOD DDS filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against MICHAEL CRESCI. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KATHERINE FEINSTEIN, CYNTHIA M. LEE, ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH, ARLENE T. BORICK, TOMAR MASON, DONALD SULLIVAN, RONALD E. QUIDACHAY and PAUL H. ALVARADO. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3694

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

KATHERINE FEINSTEIN

CYNTHIA M. LEE

ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH

ARLENE T. BORICK

TOMAR MASON

DONALD SULLIVAN

RONALD E. QUIDACHAY

PAUL H. ALVARADO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YOUNGBLOOD DDS, ANITA B. ,AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

BUTLER, JAMES P. PRESIDENT, CLUB ACQUISITION COMPANY

R-MAC & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION

WOLTHUIS, FRANK H. , AN INDIVIDUAL

BUTLER, JAMES PATRICK , AN INDIVIDUAL

CRESCI, MICHAEL ,AN INDIVIDUAL

CLASSIC PACIFIC MI CASITA, LLC, A CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 20

CONTRUCTORA MI CASITA, A CORPORATION

RESORT FUNDING LLC, A CORPORATION

CLUB ACQUISITION COMPANY, A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AGUILAR, RAUL VALADEZ

Attorney at AGUILAR LAW OFFICES, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

2333 Learned Avenue

Stockton, CA 95205

Defendant Attorney

EHRLICH, JOSEPH J.

Attorney at PICILLO CARUSO POPE EDELL PICINI

425 California Street, Suite 2025

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

FRAUD, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF YOUNGBLOOD DDS, ANITA B. ,AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT CRESCI, MICHAEL ,AN INDIVIDUAL R-MAC & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION RESORT FUNDING LLC, A CORPORATION BUTLER, JAMES PATRICK , AN INDIVIDUAL WOLTHUIS, FRANK H. , AN INDIVIDUAL CLUB ACQUISITION COMPANY, A CORPORATION CONTRUCTORA MI CASITA, A CORPORATION CLASSIC PACIFIC MI CASITA, LLC, A CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 20 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-18-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-16-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-03-2011 (Fee:370.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF YOUNGBLOOD DDS, ANITA B. ,AN INDIVIDUAL JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

ORDER

ORDER ON MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM DEFAULT

RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC. 683.110 C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF YOUNGBLOOD DDS, ANITA B. ,AN INDIVIDUAL RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT CRESCI, MICHAEL ,AN INDIVIDUAL R-MAC & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION BUTLER, JAMES PATRICK , AN INDIVIDUAL WOLTHUIS, FRANK H. , AN INDIVIDUAL CLUB ACQUISITION COMPANY, A CORPORATION $309,886.93 PRINCIPAL, $123,954.76 INTEREST, $30.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $433,871.69, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT ALL FURTHER PROCESSING TO BE DONE BY DEFAULT SECTION

Memorandum, of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Dec

COST BILL, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $123,954.76 INTEREST, $.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 100023123) FILED BY PLAINTIFF YOUNGBLOOD DDS, ANITA B. ,AN INDIVIDUAL

Notice of Renewal of Judgment

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100023123)

Application For and Renewal of Judgment

APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100023123) FILED BY PLAINTIFF YOUNGBLOOD DDS, ANITA B. ,AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT CRESCI, MICHAEL ,AN INDIVIDUAL R-MAC & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION BUTLER, JAMES PATRICK , AN INDIVIDUAL WOLTHUIS, FRANK H. , AN INDIVIDUAL CLUB ACQUISITION COMPANY, A CORPORATION NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

*** ERROR - MISSING DATA - OrderTitle ***'

REQUEST FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT REJECTED, E-FILING REJECT, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF YOUNGBLOOD DDS, ANITA B. ,AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT CRESCI, MICHAEL ,AN INDIVIDUAL R-MAC & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION BUTLER, JAMES PATRICK , AN INDIVIDUAL WOLTHUIS, FRANK H. , AN INDIVIDUAL CLUB ACQUISITION COMPANY, A CORPORATION

*** ERROR - MISSING DATA - OrderTitle ***'

REQUEST FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT REJECTED, E-FILING REJECT, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF YOUNGBLOOD DDS, ANITA B. ,AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT CRESCI, MICHAEL ,AN INDIVIDUAL R-MAC & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION WOLTHUIS, FRANK H. , AN INDIVIDUAL CLUB ACQUISITION COMPANY, A CORPORATION BUTLER, JAMES P. PRESIDENT, CLUB ACQUISITION COMPANY

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF YOUNGBLOOD DDS, ANITA B. ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED OCT-12-2010, MAIL ON DEFENDANT BUTLER, JAMES PATRICK , AN INDIVIDUAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF YOUNGBLOOD DDS, ANITA B. ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED OCT-01-2010, MAIL ON DEFENDANT WOLTHUIS, FRANK H. , AN INDIVIDUAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF YOUNGBLOOD DDS, ANITA B. ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED OCT-01-2010, MAIL ON DEFENDANT CLUB ACQUISITION COMPANY, A CORPORATION

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT RESORT FUNDING LLC, A CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF YOUNGBLOOD DDS, ANITA B. ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED SEP-24-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT CRESCI, MICHAEL ,AN INDIVIDUAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF YOUNGBLOOD DDS, ANITA B. ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED SEP-22-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT R-MAC & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF FEB-18-2011 CONTINUED TO APR-15-2011 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-15-2011 CONTINUED TO JUN-17-2011 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2017
  • Payment : RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT; Amount : $30; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R6017922R006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • Payment : ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT; Amount : $25; Payment Type : CASH ; Receipt Number : W2114313A001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2013
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $900; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1713A11F011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : R1613604R002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : R1613604M001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : R1613315R012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : R1613315M011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2010
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $370; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W3210917F009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC. 683.110 C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF YOUNGBLOOD DDS, ANITA B. ,AN INDIVIDUAL RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT CRESCI, MICHAEL ,AN INDIVIDUAL R-MAC & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION BUTLER, JAMES PATRICK , AN INDIVIDUAL WOLTHUIS, FRANK H. , AN INDIVIDUAL CLUB ACQUISITION COMPANY, A CORPORATION $309,886.93 PRINCIPAL, $123,954.76 INTEREST, $30.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $433,871.69, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT ALL FURTHER PROCESSING TO BE DONE BY DEFAULT SECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COST BILL, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $123,954.76 INTEREST, $.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 100023123) FILED BY PLAINTIFF YOUNGBLOOD DDS, ANITA B. ,AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF YOUNGBLOOD DDS, ANITA B. ,AN INDIVIDUAL JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF FEB-18-2011 CONTINUED TO APR-15-2011 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF YOUNGBLOOD DDS, ANITA B. ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED SEP-22-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT R-MAC & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF YOUNGBLOOD DDS, ANITA B. ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED SEP-24-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT CRESCI, MICHAEL ,AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT RESORT FUNDING LLC, A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF YOUNGBLOOD DDS, ANITA B. ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED OCT-01-2010, MAIL AS TO DEFENDANT CLUB ACQUISITION COMPANY, A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF YOUNGBLOOD DDS, ANITA B. ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED OCT-01-2010, MAIL AS TO DEFENDANT WOLTHUIS, FRANK H. , AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF YOUNGBLOOD DDS, ANITA B. ,AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED OCT-12-2010, MAIL AS TO DEFENDANT BUTLER, JAMES PATRICK , AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • FRAUD, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF YOUNGBLOOD DDS, ANITA B. ,AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT CRESCI, MICHAEL ,AN INDIVIDUAL R-MAC & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION RESORT FUNDING LLC, A CORPORATION BUTLER, JAMES PATRICK , AN INDIVIDUAL WOLTHUIS, FRANK H. , AN INDIVIDUAL CLUB ACQUISITION COMPANY, A CORPORATION CONTRUCTORA MI CASITA, A CORPORATION CLASSIC PACIFIC MI CASITA, LLC, A CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 20 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-18-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-16-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-03-2011 (Fee:$370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******3694
Case Title:ANITA B. YOUNGBLOOD DDS VS. MICHAEL CRESCI et al
Court Date:DEC-06-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SET ASIDE/VACATE JUDGMENT
Rulings:Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Friday, December 06, 2013, line 1. DEFENDANT MICHAEL CRESCI, R-MAC & ASSOCIATES, INC.'s MOTION FOR SET ASIDE/VACATE JUDGMENTDenied. Moving party failed to show diligence is seeking setting aside the default and default judgment (CCP 473(b)) and failed to show reasonable reliance per Fasuyi.= (501/REQ)


Case Number:*******3694
Case Title:ANITA B. YOUNGBLOOD DDS VS. MICHAEL CRESCI et al
Court Date:NOV-07-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SET ASIDE/VACATE JUDGMENT
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Thursday, November 7, 2013, Line 2, DEFENDANTs MICHAEL CRESCI and R-MAC & ASSOCIATES, INC.'s MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE JUDGMENT.Continued to December 6, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. to be heard in Department 501, the real property/housing court. =(302/EHG)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EHRLICH JOSEPH J.